Terry Branson v. Emily Johnson Piper, et al
Defendant / Appellee: David Bornus, Emily Johnson Piper, Jane Doe, Kent Johansen, Brian Ninneman, Paul Mayfield, Scott Benoit, Sarah Harrick, Lucinda Jesson, Meg McCauley, Susan Persons, Shelby Richardson, Dr. Elizabeth Peterson, Jannine Hebert, Skye Renee Davis, Peter Puffer, Nancy Johnston, Terry Kniesel, Jamie Houlk, Susan Johnson, Katherine Lockie, Allison Collins, Tom Lundquist, Jamie Wuori, Jessica Unklehauser, Courtney Jo Menten, Cal R. Ludeman, Joseph Mullen, Joanne Christensen, Dr. Crystal Leal, Jackie Warman, Steve Sayovitz, Dennis L. Benson, John Doe, whose true names are unknown and Kevin Moser
Plaintiff / Appellant: Terry Lee Branson
Case Number: 19-1956
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Boese for Appellees Scott Benoit, Mr. Dennis L. Benson, David Bornus, Joanne Christensen, Allison Collins, Sarah Harrick, Ms. Jannine Hebert, Jamie Houlk, Kent Johansen, Susan Johnson, Ms. Nancy Johnston, Mr. Terry Kniesel, Crystal Leal, Katherine Lockie, Paul Mayfield, Meg McCauley, Courtney Jo Menten, Kevin Moser, Joseph Mullen, Brian Ninneman, Elizabeth Peterson, Mr. Peter Puffer, Ms. Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, Steve Sayovitz, Jackie Warman, Jamie Wuori, Ms. Lucinda Jesson, Cal R. Ludeman and Tom Lundquist w/service 06/28/2019 [4802974] [19-1956] (BLB) [Entered: 06/28/2019 10:44 AM]
June 27, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Appellants in 19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992 w/service by USCA8 06/27/2019. Length: 41 pages, 5 copies received Brief of Appellees due on 07/29/2019 [4802463] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992]--[Edited to indicate 5 copies rec'd 06/27/2019 by HAG] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:14 AM]
June 27, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Appellants' motion for appointment of counsel has been considered by the court, and the motion [ # 4797177-2 ] is denied. While this motion was pending before the court, the appellants filed a joint brief of 41 pages. While the brief is overlength, under the circumstances the filing of a consolidated brief by all appellants warrants an expansion of the page limits, and the clerk is directed to file the brief. Appellants are cautioned, however, that they must seek advance permission to file an overlength reply brief if they cannot file a reply brief which complies with the 15-page limit for reply briefs. Appellees' brief is due July 29, 2019. Adp June 2019 [4802441] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 09:56 AM]
June 26, 2019 Tendered Overlength Brief submitted by appellants received from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 [4802250] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:52 PM]
June 18, 2019 LETTER from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 regarding prison mail and docketing of cases. w/service 07/01/2019 [4803829] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] *These matter has been addressed.* (MDS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:44 PM]
June 13, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellants Terry Lee Branson (19-1956), Kenneth Hand (19-1962), Peter Lonergan (19-1964), Randy Hammermeister (19-1970), Brad Stevens (19-1973), Steven Hogy (19-1976), Peter Allan, Sr. (19-1987), Bradley Foster (19-1990), Kevin Karsjens (19-1992) w/service 06/03/2019. [4797177] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:16 AM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Original file of originating court shall serve as record on appeal. Appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. Clerk of originating court is requested to forward the file forthwith, together with any exhibits and documents maintained in paper format.. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Terry Lee Branson, Kenneth Donald Hand, Peter Gerard Lonergan, Randy Earl Hammermeister, Brad Ronald Stevens, Steven Merrill Hogy, Peter Allan Sr., Bradley Wayne Foster and Kevin Scott Karsjens due 06/24/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4787965] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:05 PM]
May 9, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 1/4/19, Order Adopting R&R 3/25/19, and Judgment 3/27/19 [4786193] [19-1956] (MMH) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:28 PM]
May 9, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4786182] [19-1956] (MMH) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terry Branson v. Emily Johnson Piper, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Bornus
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emily Johnson Piper
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kent Johansen
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brian Ninneman
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Mayfield
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Benoit
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sarah Harrick
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucinda Jesson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Meg McCauley
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Persons
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shelby Richardson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Elizabeth Peterson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jannine Hebert
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Skye Renee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Puffer
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Terry Kniesel
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jamie Houlk
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Johnson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Katherine Lockie
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allison Collins
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tom Lundquist
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jamie Wuori
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jessica Unklehauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Courtney Jo Menten
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cal R. Ludeman
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Mullen
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joanne Christensen
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Crystal Leal
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jackie Warman
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Sayovitz
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dennis L. Benson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, whose true names are unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin Moser
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Terry Lee Branson
Represented By: Terry Lee Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?