Kenneth Hand v. Cal Ludeman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Paul J. Halverson, David Bornus, Emily Johnson Piper, Wes Kooistra, Scott Benoit, James Neese, Anne Barry, Yvette Andersen, James Loveland, David Averill, Greg Carlson, Laine Jahnke, Susan Persons, Shelby Richardson, Shannon Elke, Kristi Strang, Sara Kulas, Dr. Jane Ward, Darlene L. Harris, Darci Wikeluis, formerly known as Darci Lewis, Jannine Hebert, Ross Peterson, Jane Doe, whose names are unknown, Dennis Benson, Nancy Johnston, Terry Kniesel, Cal Ludeman, Debra James, Dr. Peter Puffer, Dr. David Prescott, John Doe, Dr. Elizabeth Peterson, Nancy Stacken, Tom Lundquist, Lucinda Jesson, Dana Osborne, D. Minor, Dr. Samantha Sheeran, Joanne Christensen, Katherine Lockie, Julie Rieger, Bruce Wagner, Kristen Johnson, Steve Sayovitz, S. Winkelmann, Tara Osborne-Leivian, Megan Miller, Benjamin Zwart, all in their official and individual capacities and Kevin Moser
Plaintiff / Appellant: Kenneth Donald Hand
Case Number: 19-1962
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Boese for Appellees David Averill, Scott Benoit, David Bornus, Joanne Christensen, Darlene L. Harris, Ms. Jannine Hebert, Debra James, Ms. Nancy Johnston, Mr. Terry Kniesel, Sara Kulas, Katherine Lockie, Kevin Moser, Dana Osborne, Tara Osborne-Leivian, Elizabeth Peterson, Ross Peterson, Mr. Peter Puffer, Ms. Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, Steve Sayovitz, Samantha Sheeran, Mr. Dennis Benson, Ms. Lucinda Jesson, Cal Ludeman and Tom Lundquist w/service 06/28/2019 [4802989] [19-1962] (BLB) [Entered: 06/28/2019 11:03 AM]
June 27, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Appellants in 19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992 w/service by USCA8 06/27/2019. Length: 41 pages, 5 copies received Brief of Appellees due on 07/29/2019 [4802463] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992]--[Edited to indicate 5 copies rec'd 06/27/2019 by HAG] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:14 AM]
June 27, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Appellants' motion for appointment of counsel has been considered by the court, and the motion [ # 4797177-2 ] is denied. While this motion was pending before the court, the appellants filed a joint brief of 41 pages. While the brief is overlength, under the circumstances the filing of a consolidated brief by all appellants warrants an expansion of the page limits, and the clerk is directed to file the brief. Appellants are cautioned, however, that they must seek advance permission to file an overlength reply brief if they cannot file a reply brief which complies with the 15-page limit for reply briefs. Appellees' brief is due July 29, 2019. Adp June 2019 [4802441] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 09:56 AM]
June 26, 2019 Tendered Overlength Brief submitted by appellants received from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 [4802250] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:52 PM]
June 18, 2019 LETTER from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 regarding prison mail and docketing of cases. w/service 07/01/2019 [4803829] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] *These matter has been addressed.* (MDS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:44 PM]
June 13, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellants Terry Lee Branson (19-1956), Kenneth Hand (19-1962), Peter Lonergan (19-1964), Randy Hammermeister (19-1970), Brad Stevens (19-1973), Steven Hogy (19-1976), Peter Allan, Sr. (19-1987), Bradley Foster (19-1990), Kevin Karsjens (19-1992) w/service 06/03/2019. [4797177] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:16 AM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Original file of originating court shall serve as record on appeal. Appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. Clerk of originating court is requested to forward the file forthwith, together with any exhibits and documents maintained in paper format.. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Terry Lee Branson, Kenneth Donald Hand, Peter Gerard Lonergan, Randy Earl Hammermeister, Brad Ronald Stevens, Steven Merrill Hogy, Peter Allan Sr., Bradley Wayne Foster and Kevin Scott Karsjens due 06/24/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4787965] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:05 PM]
May 10, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report & Recommendation 1/4/19, Order Adopting R&R 3/25/19, 2d Amd. Judgment 4/2/19, and Order granting IFP 5/6/19 [4786551] [19-1962] (MMH) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:49 PM]
May 10, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4786538] [19-1962] (MMH) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Hand v. Cal Ludeman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul J. Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Bornus
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emily Johnson Piper
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wes Kooistra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Benoit
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Neese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anne Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yvette Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Loveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Averill
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Greg Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laine Jahnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shelby Richardson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shannon Elke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kristi Strang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sara Kulas
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Jane Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darlene L. Harris
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darci Wikeluis, formerly known as Darci Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jannine Hebert
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ross Peterson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, whose names are unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dennis Benson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Terry Kniesel
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cal Ludeman
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Debra James
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Peter Puffer
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. David Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Elizabeth Peterson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Stacken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tom Lundquist
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucinda Jesson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dana Osborne
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Samantha Sheeran
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joanne Christensen
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Katherine Lockie
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Julie Rieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bruce Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kristen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Sayovitz
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. Winkelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tara Osborne-Leivian
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Megan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Benjamin Zwart, all in their official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin Moser
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenneth Donald Hand
Represented By: Kenneth Donald Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?