Wendy Thompson v. Kanabec County, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Kanabec County and Mille Lacs County
Plaintiff / Appellant: Wendy Thompson
Case Number: 19-1988
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 5, 2020 Summary Wendy Thompson v. Kanabec County

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456, 19-1988 w/service 07/09/2019. Length: 10,699 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Wendy Thompson due 07/15/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Kanabec County and Mille Lacs County due on 08/08/2019 [4806150] [19-1456, 19-1988] (HAG) [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:08 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456, 19-1988 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4806052] [19-1456, 19-1988] (AHS) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:56 AM]
July 9, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456 w/service 07/09/2019 [4805869] [19-1456, 19-1988] (HAG) [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:05 AM]
July 9, 2019 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Ms. Adrianna H. Shannon & Ms. Bonnie M. Smith for Appellant Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456, 19-1988. [4805858] [19-1456, 19-1988] (HAG) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:57 AM]
July 5, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456, 19-1988. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4805249] [19-1456, 19-1988] (AHS) [Entered: 07/05/2019 10:14 PM]
July 5, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Ms. Wendy Thompson in 19-1456, 19-1988 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4805248] [19-1456, 19-1988] (AHS) [Entered: 07/05/2019 10:06 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kristi A. Hastings for Appellee Mille Lacs County w/service 05/16/2019 [4788404] [19-1988] (KAH) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:56 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kendra E. Olson for Appellee Mille Lacs County w/service 05/16/2019 [4788402] [19-1988] (KAH) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:53 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Dyan Ebert for Appellee Kanabec County w/service 05/16/2019 [4788375] [19-1988] (DJE) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:16 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Cally Kjellberg-Nelson for Appellee Kanabec County w/service 05/16/2019 [4788370] [19-1988] (CRK) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:13 PM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/24/2019. Appendix due 07/05/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Wendy Thompson due 07/05/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4787853] [19-1456, 19-1988] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:45 AM]
May 15, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 5/2/2019, cost judgment dated 3/19/2019 [4787847] [19-1988] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:42 AM]
May 15, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4787834] [19-1988] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wendy Thompson v. Kanabec County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kanabec County
Represented By: Dyan J. Ebert
Represented By: Cally R. Kjellberg-Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mille Lacs County
Represented By: Hugh Morrison Kershner
Represented By: Kristi Ann Hastings
Represented By: Kendra Elizabeth Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wendy Thompson
Represented By: Bonnie M. Smith
Represented By: Adrianna Haugen Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?