International Union, et al v. Trane U.S. Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, AFL-CIO and UAW, Local 716
Defendant / Appellee: Trane U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 19-2255
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 sets, Source Location: St. Louis [4815275] [19-2255] (HAG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:35 PM]
August 2, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4813122-2 ] filed by International Union and UAW 10 paper copies received, w/Addendum attached [4815273] [19-2255] (HAG) [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:34 PM]
July 29, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants UAW and UAW, w/service 07/29/2019 [4813127] [19-2255] (HAG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:37 PM]
July 29, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by UAW and UAW w/service 07/29/2019. Length: 6,026 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America and UAW due 08/05/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Trane U.S. Inc. due on 08/28/2019 [4813122] [19-2255] (HAG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:35 PM]
July 29, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by UAW. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4812877] [19-2255] (MTA) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:17 AM]
July 29, 2019 APPELLANT brief of UAW submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4812872] [19-2255] (MTA) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:16 AM]
June 21, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Wendy Wilkins for Appellee Trane U.S. Inc. w/service 06/21/2019 [4800344] [19-2255] (WW) [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:07 AM]
June 21, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Trane U.S. Inc.. - FOR CAL [4800342] [19-2255] (TRP) [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:02 AM]
June 21, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Talley R. Parker for Appellee Trane U.S. Inc. w/service 06/21/2019 [4800339] [19-2255] (TRP) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:57 AM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michael T. Anderson for Appellant UAW w/service 06/19/2019 [4799606] [19-2255] (MTA) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:38 PM]
June 19, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant UAW. - FOR CAL [4799603] [19-2255] (MTA) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:36 PM]
June 19, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 07/29/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America and UAW due 07/29/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4799589] [19-2255] (TMF) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:22 PM]
June 19, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 6/17/19, docket entries, Opinion and Order 6/05/19, Judgment 6/05/19. [4799585] [19-2255] (TMF) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:21 PM]
June 19, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4799578] [19-2255] (TMF) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union, et al v. Trane U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michael Anderson
Represented By: John Lindsay Burnett
Represented By: Arlus J. Stephens
Represented By: Michael T. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UAW, Local 716
Represented By: Michael Anderson
Represented By: John Lindsay Burnett
Represented By: Arlus J. Stephens
Represented By: Michael T. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Hash
Represented By: Wendy Wilkins
Represented By: Talley R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?