Eric Lougin, et al v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Claudia Roe, in her official capacity, Shawn Ordway, in his offical capacity, Freddie Dunlap, in his official and individual capacity, St. Louis City Board of Equalization, City of Saint Louis Assessor President of the BOE, Chris Roth, in his official and individual capacity, City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, 1-4, in their official capacity, Grand Center, Inc. and Rick Lauman, in his official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: Francesco R. Russo and Eric D. Lougin
Case Number: 19-2469
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Eric D. Lougin and Mr. Francesco R. Russo. w/service 08/26/2019 , Length: 6798 words. 5 copies made by USCA-8. Brief of City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, Freddie Dunlap, Grand Center, Rick Lauman, Shawn Ordway, Claudia Roe, Chris Roth and St. Louis City Board of Equalization due on 09/20/2019. [4823234] [19-2469] (MDS) [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:29 PM]
July 31, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Matthew S McBride for Appellee Grand Center w/service 07/31/2019 [4814110] [19-2469] (MSM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:32 AM]
July 25, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Erin K. McGowan for Appellees City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, Freddie Dunlap, Mr. Rick Lauman, Mr. Shawn Ordway, Claudia Roe, Chris Roth and St. Louis City Board of Equalization w/service 07/25/2019 [4812087] [19-2469] (EKM) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:16 PM]
July 16, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Eric D. Lougin and Francesco R. Russo due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808677] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:03 PM]
July 16, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-2469: paid - cs] Fee paid 7/10/19 int D. Court. [4808675] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:01 PM]
July 16, 2019 CLERK ORDER: Vacating this court's previous order dated 7/15/2019, Directing Appellant to pay docketing fee Doc No. [ # 4808030-2 ]. The District Court has notified this court that the filing and docketing fee has been paid. This court's previous order, issued Jul 15, 2019, directing Appellant to pay the fee is hereby vacated. [4808674] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:55 PM]
July 16, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4808661] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:42 PM]
July 15, 2019 CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/05/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808030] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:45 AM]
July 15, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/10/19, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 7/08/19. [4808029] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:44 AM]
July 15, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4808017] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Lougin, et al v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Claudia Roe, in her official capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shawn Ordway, in his offical capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Freddie Dunlap, in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: St. Louis City Board of Equalization, City of Saint Louis Assessor President of the BOE
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Roth, in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of St. Louis, Missouri
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 1-4, in their official capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grand Center, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott McBride
Represented By: Matthew S. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rick Lauman, in his official capacity
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Francesco R. Russo
Represented By: Francesco R. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eric D. Lougin
Represented By: Eric D. Lougin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?