Jo Ann Howard & Associates, et al v. National City Bank, et al
Defendant: Rhonda L. Cassity, Inc., Katherine P. Scannell, Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Lincoln Hertiage Corporation, Tony B. Lumpkin, III, Forever Illinois, Inc., Brent D. Cassity, Rhonda L. Cassity, Wulf, Bates and Murphy, Inc., Comerica Bank and Trust, N.A., Legacy International Imports, Inc., doing business as Triad, Brown Smith Wallace, LLC, Lincoln Memorial Services, Inc., Randall J. Singer, Bremen Bank and Trust Company, National Heritage Enterprises, Inc., Richard Markow, American Stock Transfer and Trust Company, Anne Chrun, Howard A. Wittner, Individually and as Trustee of the RBT Trust II, National Prearranged Services Agency, Inc., Hollywood Forever, Inc., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Wittner, Spewark and Maylack, PC, Nekol Province, Wise, Mitchell and Associates, LTD, Tyler J. Cassity, Roxanne J. Schnieders, Kelly Tate, U.S. Bank, N.A., Randall Sutton, Lennie J. Cappleman, George Wise, III, Texas Forever, Inc., doing business as Forever All Faiths, Marshall and Ilsley Trust Company, N.A., Herbert Morisse, Michael R. Butler, J. Douglas Cassity, Erin P. Engle, Larry Keith Hale, John Does, 1-25, Marianne Jones, David R. Wulf, Bank of America N.A., Forever Network, Inc., formerly known as Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Heritage Funeral Homes, Inc., Southwest Bank, Brentwood Heritage Properties, LLC and James M. Crawford
Plaintiff / Appellee: Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health adn Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Special Deputy Receiver of Lincoln Memorial Life Insurance Company, Memorial Service Life Insurance Company, and National Prearranged Services, Inc., Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association
Defendant / Appellant: PNC Bank, N.A. and National City Bank
Case Number: 19-2554
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4827470-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. James F. Bennett. Brief of National City Bank and PNC Bank due 10/28/2019. Appendix due on 10/28/2019. [4827658] [19-2554, 19-2658] (HAG) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:19 AM]
September 5, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/28/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. James F. Bennett for Appellees National City Bank and PNC Bank in 19-2658 w/service 09/05/2019. [4827470] [19-2554, 19-2658] (JFB) [Entered: 09/05/2019 04:44 PM]
August 26, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Sean Connelly for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/26/2019 [4823250] [19-2554] (SC) [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:53 PM]
August 15, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association in 19-2658, Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association in 19-2554. - FOR CAL [4819794] [19-2658, 19-2554] (CSP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:27 PM]
August 14, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees National City Bank and PNC Bank in 19-2658. - FOR CAL [4819122] [19-2658, 19-2554] (JFB) [Entered: 08/14/2019 12:43 PM]
August 8, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey R. Hoops for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 08/08/2019 [4817274] [19-2554] (JRH) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:13 PM]
August 7, 2019 CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/16/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, National City Bank and PNC Bank due 09/26/2019. Appendix due 09/26/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4816621] [19-2554, 19-2658] (CMH) [Entered: 08/07/2019 11:21 AM]
August 6, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Eric J. Magnuson for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/06/2019 [4816159] [19-2554] (EJM) [Entered: 08/06/2019 12:08 PM]
August 6, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Caitlin E. O'Connell for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 08/06/2019 [4815916] [19-2554] (CEO) [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:55 AM]
August 5, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants PNC Bank and National City Bank. No Transcript[4815776] [19-2554] (JFB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:28 PM]
August 5, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/05/2019 [4815769] [19-2554] (JFB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:17 PM]
August 5, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank. - FOR CAL [4815766] [19-2554] (JFB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:13 PM]
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth C. Carver for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 08/05/2019 [4815375] [19-2554]--[Edited 08/05/2019 by YML]***FORM REPLACED - TYPO*** (ECC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:30 AM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by James F. Bennett for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 08/02/2019 [4815155] [19-2554]--[Edited 08/05/2019 by YML]***FORM REPLACED - TYPO*** (JFB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:50 PM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michael P. Robertson for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/02/2019 [4815112] [19-2554] (MPR) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:50 AM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel M. Reilly for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/02/2019 [4815109] [19-2554] (DMR) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:46 AM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Larry S. Pozner for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/02/2019 [4815101] [19-2554] (LP) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:41 AM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Clare S. Pennington for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C. w/service 08/02/2019 [4815098] [19-2554] (CSP) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:35 AM]
August 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by John M. McHugh for Appellees Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 08/02/2019 [4815090] [19-2554] (JMM) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:32 AM]
July 25, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/03/2019. Appendix due 09/13/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, National City Bank and PNC Bank due 09/13/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4812099] [19-2554] (CMH) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:25 PM]
July 25, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law and Judgment both dated 7/3/2019. [4812092] [19-2554] (CMH) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:22 PM]
July 25, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4812067] [19-2554] (CMH) [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jo Ann Howard & Associates, et al v. National City Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda L. Cassity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine P. Scannell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Lincoln Hertiage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony B. Lumpkin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda L. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wulf, Bates and Murphy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank and Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy International Imports, Inc., doing business as Triad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Smith Wallace, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Memorial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremen Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Heritage Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Markow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Stock Transfer and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Chrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Wittner, Individually and as Trustee of the RBT Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Prearranged Services Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Forever, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wittner, Spewark and Maylack, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nekol Province
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise, Mitchell and Associates, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler J. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne J. Schnieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennie J. Cappleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wise, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Forever, Inc., doing business as Forever All Faiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall and Ilsley Trust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Morisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Douglas Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin P. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Keith Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Wulf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Network, Inc., formerly known as Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Heritage Funeral Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Heritage Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health adn Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Special Deputy Receiver of Lincoln Memorial Life Insurance Company, Memorial Service Life Insurance Company, and National Prearranged Services, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd Jr.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hoops
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Caitlin E. O'Connell
Represented By: Megan Heinsz
Represented By: Gabriel E. Gore
Represented By: Meghan E. Ball
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: National City Bank
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd Jr.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hoops
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Caitlin E. O'Connell
Represented By: Megan Heinsz
Represented By: Gabriel E. Gore
Represented By: Meghan E. Ball
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?