Bradley Hartke, et al v. Roger Dean Waldner
Defendant: WIPT, Inc., The One Stop, Inc., RDW-KILT, Inc. and Community Bank
Plaintiff / Appellee: Bradley R. Hartke, Douglas P. Hartke, Joan L. Hartke, individually and as Trustees of the Joan L. Hartke QTIP Marital Trust dated and as Trustees of the Robert Eugene Hartke Family Trust dated, The Joan L. Hartke QTIP Marital Trust dated and The Robert Eugene Hartke Family Trust dated
Defendant / Appellant: Roger Dean Waldner
Case Number: 19-2813
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 4823501-2 ] motion for stay filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Dean Waldner. Adp Sep 2019 [4827716] [19-2813] (LMT) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:33 PM]
September 4, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4823501-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. David W. Larson for Appellees Mr. Bradley R. Hartke, Mr. Douglas P. Hartke, Ms. Joan L. Hartke, Joan L. Hartke QTIP Marital Trust dated 7/12/1996 and Robert Eugene Hartke Family Trust dated 7/12/1996 , w/service 09/04/2019. [4826567] [19-2813] (DWL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:45 AM]
August 26, 2019 MOTION for stay, filed by Party Mr. Roger Dean Waldner w/service 08/26/2019. [4823501] [19-2813] (RDW) [Entered: 08/26/2019 06:15 PM]
August 26, 2019 CLERK ORDER: Appellant's motion for stay is overlength, and his motion to file an overlength motion is denied. The motion for stay is stricken. [ # 4822279-2 ] [4823119] [19-2813] (CMD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:05 AM]
August 22, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Party Mr. Roger Dean Waldner correcting [ # 4822279-2 ] motion for stay filed by Appellant. [4822406] [19-2813] (RDW) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:09 PM]
August 22, 2019 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for stay, [ # 4822279-2 ], submitted by Mr. Roger Dean Waldner in 19-2813 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [19-2813] (CMD) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:41 PM]
August 22, 2019 MOTION for stay pending appeal, filed by Party Mr. Roger Dean Waldner w/service 08/22/2019. [4822279] [19-2813] THIS MOTION IS STRICKEN PER CLERK'S ORDER DATED 8/26/2019.--[Edited 08/26/2019 by CMD] (RDW) [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:34 PM]
August 22, 2019 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4822197] [19-2813] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:20 AM]
August 22, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 7/22/2019 [4822194] [19-2813] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:15 AM]
August 22, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4822169] [19-2813] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bradley Hartke, et al v. Roger Dean Waldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIPT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The One Stop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDW-KILT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bradley R. Hartke
Represented By: David W. Larson
Represented By: John Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Douglas P. Hartke
Represented By: David W. Larson
Represented By: John Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joan L. Hartke, individually and as Trustees of the Joan L. Hartke QTIP Marital Trust dated and as Trustees of the Robert Eugene Hartke Family Trust dated
Represented By: David W. Larson
Represented By: John Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: The Joan L. Hartke QTIP Marital Trust dated
Represented By: David W. Larson
Represented By: John Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: The Robert Eugene Hartke Family Trust dated
Represented By: David W. Larson
Represented By: John Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Roger Dean Waldner
Represented By: Roger Dean Waldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?