Lucinda Beadle v. City of Omaha, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Does, 1 through 25, inclusive, Alvin Lugod, Former Officer, only in his official position as an Omaha Police Officer and Agent of the City of Omaha, City of Omaha, a political subdivision of the State of Nebraska and Todd Schmaderer, only in his official capactiy as City of Omaha Chief of Police
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lucinda Beadle, Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel A. Elrod, Deceased
Case Number: 19-3230
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 31, 2020 Summary Beadle v. City of Omaha

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Lucinda Beadle. w/service 12/02/2019 , Length: 6065 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Lucinda Beadle due 12/09/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of City of Omaha, Does, Alvin Lugod and Todd Schmaderer due on 01/02/2020 [4857488] [19-3230] (LMT) [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:03 AM]
December 3, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle , w/service 11/20/2019 [4857445] [19-3230] (LMT) [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:57 AM]
December 2, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Ms. Lucinda Beadle submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4857353] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 06:36 PM]
November 27, 2019 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Brian E. Jorde for Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle. [4856528] [19-3230] (LMT) [Entered: 11/27/2019 10:03 AM]
November 26, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Ms. Lucinda Beadle submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4856455] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 11/26/2019 06:52 PM]
November 21, 2019 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Brian E. Jorde for Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle. [4854281] [19-3230] (LMT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:10 AM]
November 20, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Ms. Lucinda Beadle submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4854210] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 11/20/2019 10:54 PM]
November 20, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Lucinda Beadle. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4854205] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 11/20/2019 09:17 PM]
October 25, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle - w/service 10/25/2019. [4845961] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 10/25/2019 05:07 PM]
October 25, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle. w/service 10/25/2019 [4845960] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 10/25/2019 05:05 PM]
October 24, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/24/2019 [4845555] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 10/24/2019 05:16 PM]
October 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Sara A. Larson for Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle w/service 10/15/2019 [4841720] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:27 PM]
October 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Brian E. Jorde for Appellant Ms. Lucinda Beadle w/service 10/14/2019 [4841413] [19-3230] (BEJ) [Entered: 10/14/2019 02:18 PM]
October 13, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Ryan J. Wiesen for Appellees City of Omaha, Alvin Lugod and Mr. Todd Schmaderer w/service 10/13/2019 [4841360] [19-3230] (RJW) [Entered: 10/13/2019 05:30 PM]
October 11, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/20/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Lucinda Beadle due 11/20/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4841300] [19-3230] (CJO) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:40 PM]
October 11, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order dated 10/31/2018, Memorandum and Order dated 01/15/2019, and Order of Dismissal 09/11/2019. [4841297] [19-3230] (CJO) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:37 PM]
October 11, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4841276] [19-3230] (CJO) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lucinda Beadle v. City of Omaha, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alvin Lugod, Former Officer, only in his official position as an Omaha Police Officer and Agent of the City of Omaha
Represented By: Michelle Peters
Represented By: Ryan John Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Omaha, a political subdivision of the State of Nebraska
Represented By: Michelle Peters
Represented By: Ryan John Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Todd Schmaderer, only in his official capactiy as City of Omaha Chief of Police
Represented By: Michelle Peters
Represented By: Ryan John Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lucinda Beadle, Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel A. Elrod, Deceased
Represented By: Brian E. Jorde
Represented By: Sara A. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?