Harold Sims v. Marty Boyde, et al
Defendant / Appellee: M. Ballard, Corporal, Craighead County Detention Center, Chadwick, Lieutenant, Craighead County Detention Center, Keith Bowers, Head Jailer, Craighead County Detention Center, Marty Boyde, Sheriff, Craighead County and Heral, Lieutenant, Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff / Appellant: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Case Number: 19-3406
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 MEMORANDUM of Appellant Mr. Harold Shawgnessy Sims in support of originating court document notice of appeal regarding problems sending mail from prison , Doc No. [ # 4849874-2 ]. w/service 12/12/2019. [4861388] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:21 PM]
December 12, 2019 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Harold Shawgnessy Sims w/service 12/12/2019. [4861380] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:17 PM]
December 3, 2019 CLERK ORDER: On the court's own motion, an extension of time to file filing fee is granted until 12/23/2019 due to case opening mail being returned from Craighead County Detention Center and re-mailed on 12/3/19. [4857693] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:47 PM]
December 3, 2019 Re-mailed correspondence - originating court document notice of appeal, [ # 4849874-2 ], clerk order pay full filing fee, [ # 4849877-2 ], [ # 4849877-3 ], clerk order case proceeding on of (need file), [ # 4849880-2 ], [ # 4849880-3 ] to Mr. Harold Shawgnessy Sims at Ouachita River Correctional Unit, P.O. Box 1630, Malvern, AR (returned from Craighead Co Det Ctr) [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:45 PM]
November 7, 2019 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4849880] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:18 AM]
November 7, 2019 CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 12/09/2019 [4849877] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:17 AM]
November 7, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Proposed Findings and Recommendations 10/17/19, ORder 10/24/19, Judgment 10/24/19, Order 11/6/19, docket entries, [4849874] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:15 AM]
November 7, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4849869] [19-3406] (AEV) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Harold Sims v. Marty Boyde, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. Ballard, Corporal, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chadwick, Lieutenant, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Bowers, Head Jailer, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marty Boyde, Sheriff, Craighead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Heral, Lieutenant, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Represented By: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?