Russell Knowles, et al v. TD Ameritrade Holding Corp., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Russell D. Knowles, individually and as attorney in fact for Bernard A. Knowles, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated. and Bernard A. Knowles, through his attorney-in-fact Russell D. Knowles, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated.
Defendant / Appellee: TD Ameritrade Investment Management, L.L.C., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, TD Ameritrade and TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Case Number: 19-3684
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4873941-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Ronald B. Cox. Brief of Bernard A. Knowles and Russell D. Knowles due 02/26/2020. Appendix due on 02/26/2020. [4873976] [19-3684] (BNW) [Entered: 01/23/2020 11:41 AM]
January 23, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/26/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Ronald B. Cox for Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles w/service 01/23/2020. [4873941] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 01/23/2020 11:11 AM]
December 30, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles - w/service 12/30/2019. [4866402] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:11 PM]
December 30, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles. No Transcript[4866401] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:09 PM]
December 30, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles. w/service 12/30/2019 [4866400] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:07 PM]
December 30, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/30/2019 [4866399] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:05 PM]
December 23, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees TD Ameritrade, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation and TD Ameritrade Investment Management, L.L.C.. - FOR CAL [4865092] [19-3684] (VHB) [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:35 PM]
December 20, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Thomas H. Dahlk for Appellees TD Ameritrade, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation and TD Ameritrade Investment Management, L.L.C. w/service 12/20/2019 [4864495] [19-3684] (THD) [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:31 PM]
December 20, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Victoria H. Buter for Appellees TD Ameritrade, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation and TD Ameritrade Investment Management, L.L.C. w/service 12/20/2019 [4864491] [19-3684] (VHB) [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:26 PM]
December 18, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Ronald B. Cox for Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles w/service 12/18/2019 [4863432] [19-3684] (RBC) [Entered: 12/18/2019 03:08 PM]
December 18, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Robert David Proffitt for Appellants Mr. Bernard A. Knowles and Mr. Russell D. Knowles w/service 12/18/2019 [4863400] [19-3684] (RDP) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:33 PM]
December 16, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/27/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bernard A. Knowles and Russell D. Knowles due 01/27/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4862283] [19-3684] (RLS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:54 PM]
December 16, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum and order dated 11/15/2019, judgment dated 11/15/2019. [4862281] [19-3684] (RLS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:52 PM]
December 16, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4862274] [19-3684] (RLS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell Knowles, et al v. TD Ameritrade Holding Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Russell D. Knowles, individually and as attorney in fact for Bernard A. Knowles, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated.
Represented By: Ronald B. Cox
Represented By: Robert David Proffitt
Represented By: Jason W. Grams
Represented By: Brady R. Thomas
Represented By: Alonzo J. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bernard A. Knowles, through his attorney-in-fact Russell D. Knowles, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated.
Represented By: Ronald B. Cox
Represented By: Robert David Proffitt
Represented By: Jason W. Grams
Represented By: Brady R. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade Investment Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Represented By: Thomas Harlan Dahlk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Represented By: Thomas Harlan Dahlk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Represented By: Thomas Harlan Dahlk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Represented By: Thomas Harlan Dahlk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?