Ronald Douglas v. Eric Schmitt, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security & Empls of the Social Admin, Janet L. Schanzle, Security Armored Car & It's Insurers, Elaine L. Chao, U. S. Secretary of Transportation & Employees of the Federal Aviation Admin, Mark Stringer, Director of the Department of Mental Health in the State of Missouri Employees of the Dept of Mental Health & Employees of the Metropolitan St. Louis Psychiatric Center, Chris Slinkard, Director of the MO Division of Employment Security & Employees of the MO Department of Employment Security, Betsy DeVos, U.S. Secretary of Education & Empls. of the Dept. of Education, Maura B. McShane, Judge, Kenneth Zellers, Acting Dir. of the Missouri Department of Revenue, Employees of the MO Department of Revenue & the Treasurer as Custodian of the Sec. Injury Fund, Eric S. Schmitt, MO State Attorney General & Said Office's Other Officials, Jennifer Tidball, Dir of the Dept. of Social Services & Empls. of the Department of Social Services, AT&T, Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts, Michael L. Parson, Governor and Employees of the State of MO, Tyler Asher, President of Safeco Insurance Employees of Safeco National Insurance & Safeco Group of Insurance Companies, Andrew Saul, Chancellor (Chair) Wash. University's Vice Chancellor for Human Resources & Employees of Wash. U., Edward H. Chu, Acting Regional 7 Administrator Employees of the MO EPA & The MO. Air Conservation Commission, David L. Bernhardt, U. S. Secretary of Interior & Employees of the Department of Interior, William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General & Employees of the Attorney General's Office, City of Moline Acres, Attorney, Its Employees & Its Insurer, Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of Missouri, Warner L. Baxter, Chairman President & Chief Executive Office of Ameren CO. Employees of Ameren Electric CO. & Its Insurer, Thomas F. George, Office of the Chancellor &Employees of the University of Missouri St. Louis, Chief of Police, Administrative Aide (Private Security), Northwest, Ajit Pai, Commissioner Employees of Federal Communications Commission & Brendan Carr, Charles Rettig, IRS Commissioner & Empls. of the IRS, Andrew Wheeler, Employees of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency & The Federal Interagency Committee on Aviation Noise, Seth Tilzer, M.D., Rick Stevens, President of Christian Hospital & Employees of Christian Hospital, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Secretary of Commerce The Dep. of Commerce's Employees of National Telecom and Information Administration & The Director of the Office of Telecommunications, The Tax Court, Wash. University Police Department, & Its Attorneys, John Ashcroft, MO Sec of Commerce & Secretary of State and Anna Hui, Missouri Director of Labor & Industrial Relations & Employees of the Labor & Industrial Relations Commission
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ronald Douglas
Case Number: 19-3700
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-3700: pending] [4873845] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:33 AM]
January 15, 2020 RECORD FILED - MISC. RECORD, 3 volumes, Location Clerks Office, Comments: Petitioners petition labor and industrial relations [Return to Ronald Douglas - Appellant at end of case]. [4874098] [19-3700]--[Edited 01/24/2020 by STL] (RLS) [Entered: 01/23/2020 02:47 PM]
January 15, 2020 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Ronald Douglas w/service 01/16/2020. [4871900] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 01/16/2020 11:02 AM]
December 30, 2019 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4866202] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:59 AM]
December 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 01/15/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4863258] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 12/18/2019 12:42 PM]
December 18, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum and order dated 11/20/2019, order dated 11/21/2019[4863256] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 12/18/2019 12:41 PM]
December 18, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4863243] [19-3700] (RLS) [Entered: 12/18/2019 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Douglas v. Eric Schmitt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security & Empls of the Social Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janet L. Schanzle, Security Armored Car & It's Insurers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elaine L. Chao, U. S. Secretary of Transportation & Employees of the Federal Aviation Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Stringer, Director of the Department of Mental Health in the State of Missouri Employees of the Dept of Mental Health & Employees of the Metropolitan St. Louis Psychiatric Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Slinkard, Director of the MO Division of Employment Security & Employees of the MO Department of Employment Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Betsy DeVos, U.S. Secretary of Education & Empls. of the Dept. of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maura B. McShane, Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth Zellers, Acting Dir. of the Missouri Department of Revenue, Employees of the MO Department of Revenue & the Treasurer as Custodian of the Sec. Injury Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric S. Schmitt, MO State Attorney General & Said Office's Other Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer Tidball, Dir of the Dept. of Social Services & Empls. of the Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AT&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael L. Parson, Governor and Employees of the State of MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tyler Asher, President of Safeco Insurance Employees of Safeco National Insurance & Safeco Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Saul, Chancellor (Chair) Wash. University's Vice Chancellor for Human Resources & Employees of Wash. U.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward H. Chu, Acting Regional 7 Administrator Employees of the MO EPA & The MO. Air Conservation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David L. Bernhardt, U. S. Secretary of Interior & Employees of the Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General & Employees of the Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Moline Acres, Attorney, Its Employees & Its Insurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Warner L. Baxter, Chairman President & Chief Executive Office of Ameren CO. Employees of Ameren Electric CO. & Its Insurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas F. George, Office of the Chancellor &Employees of the University of Missouri St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chief of Police, Administrative Aide (Private Security)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ajit Pai, Commissioner Employees of Federal Communications Commission & Brendan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Rettig, IRS Commissioner & Empls. of the IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Wheeler, Employees of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency & The Federal Interagency Committee on Aviation Noise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Seth Tilzer, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rick Stevens, President of Christian Hospital & Employees of Christian Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wilbur Ross, U.S. Secretary of Commerce The Dep. of Commerce's Employees of National Telecom and Information Administration & The Director of the Office of Telecommunications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Tax Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wash. University Police Department, & Its Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Ashcroft, MO Sec of Commerce & Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anna Hui, Missouri Director of Labor & Industrial Relations & Employees of the Labor & Industrial Relations Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronald Douglas
Represented By: Ronald Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?