Daredevil, Inc. v. ZTE Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: ZTE Corporation, a corporation incorporated under the laws of the People's Republic of China
Plaintiff / Appellant: Daredevil, Inc., a Missouri Corporation
Case Number: 19-3769
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4875967-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. S. Jay Dobbs. Brief of Daredevil, Inc. due 03/04/2020. Appendix due on 03/04/2020 [4876720] [19-3769] (MDS) [Entered: 01/31/2020 09:27 AM]
January 29, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/04/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua Evan Austin for Appellant Daredevil, Inc. w/service 01/29/2020. [4875967] [19-3769]--[Edited 01/31/2020 by MDS - Reason: Edited to correct filing parties.] (SJD) [Entered: 01/29/2020 11:19 AM]
January 10, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Britton L. St. Onge for Appellee ZTE Corporation w/service 01/10/2020 [4870213] [19-3769] (BLS) [Entered: 01/10/2020 03:57 PM]
January 10, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Daredevil, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4869961] [19-3769] (SJD) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:30 AM]
January 10, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Daredevil, Inc. - w/service 01/10/2020. [4869959] [19-3769] (SJD) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:29 AM]
January 10, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Daredevil, Inc.. w/service 01/10/2020 [4869955] [19-3769]--[Edited 01/10/2020 by MDS - Reason: Document is a Certificate of Transcript (no transcript) and a Method of appendix preparation (Separate).] (SJD) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:27 AM]
January 10, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by S. Jay Dobbs for Appellant Daredevil, Inc. w/service 01/10/2020 [4869953] [19-3769] (SJD) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:25 AM]
January 3, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee ZTE Corporation. - FOR CAL [4867345] [19-3769] (LEB) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:30 AM]
January 3, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Laura E. Besvinick for Appellee ZTE Corporation w/service 01/03/2020 [4867298] [19-3769] (LEB) [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:33 AM]
January 3, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Frank T. Spano for Appellee ZTE Corporation w/service 01/03/2020 [4867249] [19-3769] (FTS) [Entered: 01/03/2020 09:59 AM]
December 27, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 02/05/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Daredevil, Inc. due 02/05/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4865657] [19-3769] (CJO) [Entered: 12/27/2019 10:07 AM]
December 27, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order dated 11/26/2019, and Judgment dated 11/26/2019. [4865655] [19-3769] (CJO) [Entered: 12/27/2019 10:03 AM]
December 27, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4865644] [19-3769] (CJO) [Entered: 12/27/2019 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daredevil, Inc. v. ZTE Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZTE Corporation, a corporation incorporated under the laws of the People's Republic of China
Represented By: David M. Slaby
Represented By: Laura Eve Besvinick
Represented By: Frank T. Spano
Represented By: Britton L. St. Onge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daredevil, Inc., a Missouri Corporation
Represented By: S. Jay Dobbs
Represented By: Joshua Evan Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?