James Jensen, et al v. MN Dept. of Human Services, et al
Defendant: Director, Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota, Clinical Director, the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota, Douglas Bratvold, individually, and as Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a progam of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota and Scott TenNapel, individually, and as Clinicial Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Plaintiff / Appellee: Darren Allen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Thomas M. Allbrink and others similarly situated, James Brinker, James Jensen, Elizabeth Jacobs, as parent, guardian and next friend of Jason R. Jacobs and others similarly situated and Lorie Jensen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Bradley J. Jensen and others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota and State of Minnesota
Case Number: 20-1126
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on motion to dismiss. [4892118] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:36 AM]
March 16, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399, Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs in 20-1126 correcting [ # 4890894-2 ] motion filed by null in 20-1399. [4891547] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:44 AM]
March 16, 2020 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to dismiss case, [ # 4890894-2 ], , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [20-1126, 20-1399] CERTIFICATE HAS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER AT HEADING (LMT) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:04 AM]
March 12, 2020 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen and Mr. Shamus Patrick O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399 w/service 03/12/2020. [4890894] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 06:48 PM]
March 12, 2020 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Status Conference [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/16/2019, No. of Pgs.: 161, Court Reporter: Krenz, Lynne [4890733] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 01:59 PM]
March 12, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126. Transcript ordered for April 16, 2019 hearing. [4890585] [20-1399, 20-1126] --[Edited 03/12/2020 by BNW to correct docket text to show transcript was ordered.] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:53 AM]
March 12, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/12/2020 [4890573] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:44 AM]
March 12, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - w/service 03/12/2020. [4890571] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:37 AM]
March 5, 2020 JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 4879552-2 ] motion for stay filed by Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for appellants. Adp Feb 2020 [4888312] [20-1126] (LMT) [Entered: 03/05/2020 12:19 PM]
February 28, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Location STL, Comments: 1 envelope containing Sealed District Court document #800 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN [4886109] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:18 AM]
February 27, 2020 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/07/2020. Appendix due 04/17/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota due 04/17/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4885553] [20-1126, 20-1399] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:12 AM]
February 25, 2020 REPLY to response [ # 4882413-2 ] filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 02/25/2020. [4884792] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:39 PM]
February 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting order dated 02/13/2020 regarding the identification of external reviewers in the district court. [4883634] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/21/2020 09:55 AM]
February 18, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4879552-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen , w/service 02/18/2020. [4882413] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:49 PM]
February 11, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order dated 02/04/2020 regarding an external review of the Forensic Mental Health Program. [4880177] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:58 AM]
February 11, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order dated 02/04/2020 denying defendants' motion to stay pending appeal. [4880175] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:56 AM]
February 7, 2020 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 02/07/2020. [4879552] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:31 PM]
February 4, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota. No Transcript[4877822] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:36 AM]
February 4, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/04/2020 [4877810] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:24 AM]
February 4, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - w/service 02/04/2020. [4877797] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:19 AM]
January 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Scott H. Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 01/22/2020 [4873545] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:08 PM]
January 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Shamus P. O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873528] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:37 AM]
January 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Mark. R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873527] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:35 AM]
January 21, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/02/2020. Appendix due 03/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota due 03/11/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4872930] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:09 AM]
January 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 12/18/2019, notice of appeal [4872921] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:06 AM]
January 21, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4872912] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Jensen, et al v. MN Dept. of Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darren Allen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Thomas M. Allbrink and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Brinker
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Jensen
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Jacobs, as parent, guardian and next friend of Jason R. Jacobs and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lorie Jensen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Bradley J. Jensen and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Director, the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Bratvold, individually, and as Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a progam of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott TenNapel, individually, and as Clinicial Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Represented By: Anthony R. Noss
Represented By: Scott Hiromi Ikeda
Represented By: Aaron Edward Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Anthony R. Noss
Represented By: Scott Hiromi Ikeda
Represented By: Aaron Edward Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?