Gary Webster v. Marty Boyd, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Doe, Medical Administrator, Becker, Deputy, Craighead County Detention Center, Gibson, Deputy, Craighead County Detention Center and Marty Boyd, Sheriff, Craighead County
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gary Leon Webster
Case Number: 20-1264
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 20-1264: due]. Fee due. [4897661] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:58 PM]
March 30, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Appellant's motion [ # 4896798-2 ] for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster is denied as moot. The briefing schedule previously issued in this case was vacated by order of this Court on 3/17/2020. [4896802] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 03/30/2020 10:14 AM]
March 27, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief, filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster w/service 03/30/2020. [4896798] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 03/30/2020 10:09 AM]
March 17, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Upon further review, the briefing schedule previously entered has been vacated in this matter. The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/16/2020. [4892351] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:23 PM]
February 20, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4883486-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster. Brief of Gary Leon Webster due 03/19/2020 [4883495] [20-1264] (MDS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:24 PM]
February 18, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/19/2020, filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster w/service 02/20/2020. [4883486] [20-1264] (MDS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:13 PM]
February 7, 2020 VACATED ON 3/17/2020 -- ENTERED IN ERROR BY CLERK -- BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Gary Leon Webster due 03/18/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4879228] [20-1264]--[Edited 03/17/2020 by CMH] (CMH) [Entered: 02/07/2020 11:04 AM]
February 7, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 1/13/2020 and Order dated 2/5/2020. [4879220] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 02/07/2020 11:00 AM]
February 7, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4879213] [20-1264] (CMH) [Entered: 02/07/2020 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gary Webster v. Marty Boyd, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Medical Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Becker, Deputy, Craighead County Detention Center
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gibson, Deputy, Craighead County Detention Center
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marty Boyd, Sheriff, Craighead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Leon Webster
Represented By: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?