Logan Lundahl, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, et al
Defendant / Appellee: First American Title Insurance Company, Smith County, TX, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Lilia Chavarin, Mel Hoffman, Old Republic Insurance Co., HSBC, Does 1-10, David Gilbertson, Paul Kelley, Jr., Craig Pfeifle, in their Administrative Capacities, American Title Insurance Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Sandra Copeland, Los Angeles Homeowners Aid and Lois Mosley
Plaintiff / Appellant: Logan Lundahl and Holli Lundahl
Case Number: 20-1270
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED. [4893751] [20-1270] (CMD) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:14 AM]
March 10, 2020 JUDGE ORDER: Denying [ # 4888800-2 ] motion for writ of mandamus filed by Appellants Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl. Adp Feb 2020 [4889842] [20-1270] (MDS) [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:28 PM]
March 6, 2020 MOTION motion for writ of mandamus against Judge Piersol with attached 48 exhibits-- in lieu of filing an opening brief (expedited relief is necessary outside of normal appeal methods), filed by Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl w/service 03/06/2020. [4888800] [20-1270] (HL) [Entered: 03/06/2020 12:42 PM]
February 28, 2020 JUDGMENT FILED - Case dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. L. STEVEN GRASZ, ROGER L. WOLLMAN and DAVID R. STRAS Adp Feb 2020 [4886124] [20-1270] (MDS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:33 AM]
February 26, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - Page 4 of Document 87 from district court docket sheet filed by Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl. w/service 02/28/2020 [4886075] [20-1270] (Received via email) (MDS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:41 AM]
February 26, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - Document 91 from district court docket sheet filed by Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl. w/service 02/28/2020 [4886059] [20-1270] (Received via email) (MDS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:31 AM]
February 26, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - Portion of district court docket sheet filed by Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl. w/service 02/28/2020 [4886047] [20-1270] (Received via email.) (MDS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:14 AM]
February 25, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent to appellants regarding status of appeal. [4884559] [20-1270] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:19 AM]
February 25, 2020 Originating court documents filed consisting of originating court orders dated 02/24/2020 entitled Order Granting in part the Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate and 1915A Screening of Amended Complaint and Amended Judgment. [4884556] [20-1270] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:18 AM]
February 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Heather Lammers Bogard for Appellee American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. w/service 02/12/2020 [4881141] [20-1270] (HL) [Entered: 02/12/2020 02:49 PM]
February 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Terry G. Westergaard for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company w/service 02/12/2020 [4880886] [20-1270] (TGW) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:24 AM]
February 11, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Haigh for Appellee Old Republic Insurance Co. w/service 02/11/2020 [4880586] [20-1270] (MWH) [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:54 PM]
February 7, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 8/12/2019, judgment of 8/12/2019, order of 12/18/2019, notice of appeal, [4879522] [20-1270] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:58 PM]
February 7, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4879492] [20-1270] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Logan Lundahl, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Smith County, TX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lammers Bogard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lilia Chavarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mel Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Old Republic Insurance Co.
Represented By: Tyler Haigh
Represented By: Mark William Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Kelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Craig Pfeifle, in their Administrative Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Title Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sandra Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Los Angeles Homeowners Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lois Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Logan Lundahl
Represented By: Logan Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Holli Lundahl
Represented By: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?