James Jensen, et al v. MN Dept. of Human Services, et al
Defendant: Director, Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota, Clinical Director, the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota, Douglas Bratvold, individually, and as Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a progam of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota and Scott TenNapel, individually, and as Clinicial Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Plaintiff / Appellee: Darren Allen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Thomas M. Allbrink and others similarly situated, James Brinker, James Jensen, Elizabeth Jacobs, as parent, guardian and next friend of Jason R. Jacobs and others similarly situated and Lorie Jensen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Bradley J. Jensen and others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota and State of Minnesota
Case Number: 20-1399
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 MOTION for attorney fees in the amount of $128,062.50, filed by Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen and Mr. Shamus Patrick O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399, Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs and Mr. Shamus Patrick O'Meara for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs in 20-1126 w/service 04/21/2020. [4905311] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 04/21/2020 07:36 PM]
April 7, 2020 JUDGMENT FILED - DISMISSED. Granting [ # 4890894-2 ] motion to dismiss cases filed by appellees. JANE KELLY, ROGER L. WOLLMAN and MORRIS S. ARNOLD Adp Feb 2020 [4900181] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 04/07/2020 04:24 PM]
April 1, 2020 REPLY to response [ # 4896079-2 ] filed by Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Ms. Lorie Jensen and Mr. James Jensen in 20-1399, 20-1126 w/service 04/01/2020. [4898242] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 04/01/2020 06:57 PM]
March 31, 2020 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Jane Kelly, Roger L. Wollman, Morris S. Arnold in St. Louis [4900178] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 04/07/2020 04:20 PM]
March 30, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michael N. Leonard for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 03/30/2020 [4896910] [20-1399] (MNL) [Entered: 03/30/2020 12:59 PM]
March 30, 2020 Originating court documents filed consisting of originating court order dated 03/04/2020 regarding external review and status conference and order of 3/9/2020 denying defendants' motion for stay pending appeal. [4896733] [20-1126, 20-1399] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:00 AM]
March 26, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4890894-2 ] filed by Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota and Mr. Aaron Edward Winter for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 , w/service 03/26/2020. [4896079] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:02 PM]
March 17, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on motion to dismiss. [4892118] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:36 AM]
March 16, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399, Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs in 20-1126 correcting [ # 4890894-2 ] motion filed by null in 20-1399. [4891547] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:44 AM]
March 16, 2020 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to dismiss case, [ # 4890894-2 ], , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [20-1126, 20-1399] CERTIFICATE HAS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER AT HEADING (LMT) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:04 AM]
March 12, 2020 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen and Mr. Shamus Patrick O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399 w/service 03/12/2020. [4890894] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 06:48 PM]
March 12, 2020 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Status Conference [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/16/2019, No. of Pgs.: 161, Court Reporter: Krenz, Lynne [4890733] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 01:59 PM]
March 12, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126. Transcript ordered for April 16, 2019 hearing. [4890585] [20-1399, 20-1126] --[Edited 03/12/2020 by BNW to correct docket text to show transcript was ordered.] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:53 AM]
March 12, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/12/2020 [4890573] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:44 AM]
March 12, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - w/service 03/12/2020. [4890571] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:37 AM]
February 28, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Location STL, Comments: 1 envelope containing Sealed District Court document #800 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN [4886109] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:18 AM]
February 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Aaron Winter for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 02/27/2020 [4885935] [20-1399] (AEW) [Entered: 02/27/2020 05:01 PM]
February 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Scott H. Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 02/27/2020 [4885933] [20-1399] (SHI) [Entered: 02/27/2020 04:55 PM]
February 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Shamus P. O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 02/27/2020 [4885625] [20-1399] (MRA) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:58 AM]
February 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 02/27/2020 [4885623] [20-1399] (MRA) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:56 AM]
February 27, 2020 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/07/2020. Appendix due 04/17/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota due 04/17/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4885553] [20-1126, 20-1399] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:12 AM]
February 27, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 2/13/2020, notice of appeal [4885547] [20-1399] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:09 AM]
February 27, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4885536] [20-1399] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Jensen, et al v. MN Dept. of Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darren Allen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Thomas M. Allbrink and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Brinker
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Jensen
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Jacobs, as parent, guardian and next friend of Jason R. Jacobs and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lorie Jensen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Bradley J. Jensen and others similarly situated
Represented By: Shamus Patrick O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Director, the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Bratvold, individually, and as Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a progam of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott TenNapel, individually, and as Clinicial Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota
Represented By: Anthony R. Noss
Represented By: Scott Hiromi Ikeda
Represented By: Aaron Edward Winter
Represented By: Michael N. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Anthony R. Noss
Represented By: Scott Hiromi Ikeda
Represented By: Aaron Edward Winter
Represented By: Michael N. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?