Jo Ann Howard and Associates,, et al v. National City Bank, et al
Defendant: Randall Sutton, Katherine P. Scannell, Tony B. Lumpkin, III, Forever Illinois, Inc., Brent D. Cassity, Lennie J. Cappleman, Wulf, Bates and Murphy, Inc., Legacy International Imports, Inc., doing business as Triad, Lincoln Memorial Services, Inc., Randall J. Singer, Bremen Bank and Trust Company, National Heritage Enterprises, Inc., Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Lincoln Heritage Corporation, Richard Markow, Forever Network, Inc., formerly known as Forever Enterprises, Inc., also known as Cassity Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Heritage Funeral Homes, American Stock Transfer and Trust Company, Anne Chrun, Howard A. Wittner, Individually and as Trustee of the RBT Trust II, National Prearranged Services Agency, Inc., Hollywood Forever, Inc., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Brown Smith Wallace, LLC, Nekol Province, Wise, Mitchell and Associates, LTD, Tyler J. Cassity, Roxanne J. Schnieders, Kelly Tate, U.S. Bank, N.A., Wittner, Spewark and Maylack, PC, formerly known as Wittner, Poger, Spewak, Maylack and Spooner, P.C., Rhonda L. Cassity, George Wise, III, Texas Forever, Inc., doing business as Forever All Faiths, Marshall and Ilsley Trust Company, N.A., Herbert Morisse, Michael R. Butler, J. Douglas Cassity, Erin P. Engle, Larry Keith Hale, John Does, 1-25, Marianne Jones, David R. Wulf, Comerica Bank and Trust, N.A., Southwest Bank, Bank of America, N.A., Brentwood Heritage Properties, LLC and James M. Crawford
Plaintiff / Appellee: Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Special Deputy Receiver of Lincoln Memorial Life Insurance Company, Memorial Service Life Insurance Company, and National Prearranged Services, Inc., Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Defendant / Appellant: PNC Bank, N.A. and National City Bank
Case Number: 20-1438
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4902737-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. James F. Bennett. Brief of National City Bank and PNC Bank due 05/22/2020. Appendix due on 05/22/2020. [4902851] [20-1438] (HAG) [Entered: 04/15/2020 10:29 AM]
April 15, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Appellants [ # 4902644-2 ] motion to consolidate Appeals Nos. 19-2554 and 19-3663 with Appeal No. 20-1438 is granted, and the appeals are hereby consolidated for submission and disposition. Briefing is not consolidated, however, given the status of the briefing in the appeals. The parties shall observe the separate briefing schedules previously established for the cases. ASSOCIATION CREATED. [4902846] [19-2554, 19-3662, 20-1438] (HAG) [Entered: 04/15/2020 10:19 AM]
April 15, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/22/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. James F. Bennett for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 04/15/2020. [4902737] [20-1438] (JFB) [Entered: 04/15/2020 08:45 AM]
March 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Larry S Pozner for Appellees Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/12/2020 [4890892] [20-1438] (LP) [Entered: 03/12/2020 05:44 PM]
March 6, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association. - FOR CAL [4888911] [20-1438] (CSP) [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:11 PM]
March 6, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Eric J. Magnuson for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/06/2020 [4888658] [20-1438] (EJM) [Entered: 03/06/2020 09:47 AM]
March 6, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/06/2020 [4888593] [20-1438] (JFB) [Entered: 03/06/2020 07:56 AM]
March 6, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank. No Transcript[4888592] [20-1438] (JFB) [Entered: 03/06/2020 07:54 AM]
March 6, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank. - FOR CAL [4888588] [20-1438] (JFB) [Entered: 03/06/2020 07:46 AM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Sean Connelly for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/05/2020 [4888560] [20-1438] (SC) [Entered: 03/05/2020 06:01 PM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by John M. McHugh for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/05/2020 [4888554] [20-1438] (JMM) [Entered: 03/05/2020 05:02 PM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michael P. Robertson for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/05/2020 [4888553] [20-1438] (MPR) [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:58 PM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Clare S. Pennington for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/05/2020 [4888549] [20-1438] (CSP) [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:53 PM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel M. Reilly for Appellees Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations and Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association w/service 03/05/2020 [4888547] [20-1438] (DMR) [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:50 PM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey R. Hoops for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 03/05/2020 [4888057] [20-1438] (JRH) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:37 AM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Caitlin E. O'Connell for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 03/05/2020 [4888049] [20-1438] (CEO) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:34 AM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth C. Carver for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 03/05/2020 [4888045] [20-1438] (ECC) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:31 AM]
March 5, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by James F. Bennett for Appellants National City Bank and PNC Bank w/service 03/05/2020 [4888039] [20-1438] (JFB) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:28 AM]
March 3, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/13/2020. Appendix due 04/22/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, National City Bank and PNC Bank due 04/22/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4887481] [20-1438] (CMH) [Entered: 03/03/2020 04:50 PM]
March 3, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment oth dated 2/21/2020. [4887478] [20-1438] (CMH) [Entered: 03/03/2020 04:46 PM]
March 3, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4887476] [20-1438] (CMH) [Entered: 03/03/2020 04:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jo Ann Howard and Associates,, et al v. National City Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine P. Scannell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony B. Lumpkin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennie J. Cappleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wulf, Bates and Murphy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy International Imports, Inc., doing business as Triad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Memorial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremen Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Heritage Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Lincoln Heritage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Markow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Network, Inc., formerly known as Forever Enterprises, Inc., also known as Cassity Enterprises, Inc., formerly known as Cassity Heritage Funeral Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Stock Transfer and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Chrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Wittner, Individually and as Trustee of the RBT Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Prearranged Services Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Forever, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Smith Wallace, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nekol Province
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise, Mitchell and Associates, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler J. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne J. Schnieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wittner, Spewark and Maylack, PC, formerly known as Wittner, Poger, Spewak, Maylack and Spooner, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda L. Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wise, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Forever, Inc., doing business as Forever All Faiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall and Ilsley Trust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Morisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Douglas Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin P. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Keith Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Wulf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank and Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Heritage Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Texas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly known as Texas Life, Accident, Health and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C., Special Deputy Receiver of Lincoln Memorial Life Insurance Company, Memorial Service Life Insurance Company, and National Prearranged Services, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oklahoma Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Arkansas Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: National Organization of Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Associations
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Maurice B. Graham
Represented By: Larry Pozner
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Eric John Magnuson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Clare S. Pennington
Represented By: Michael P. Robertson
Represented By: Farrell A. Carfield
Represented By: John M. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Lawrence Giacomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd Jr.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hoops
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Caitlin E. O'Connell
Represented By: Gabriel E. Gore
Represented By: Megan Heinsz
Represented By: Meghan E. Ball
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: National City Bank
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd Jr.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hoops
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Caitlin E. O'Connell
Represented By: Gabriel E. Gore
Represented By: Megan Heinsz
Represented By: Meghan E. Ball
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?