Eddie Risdal v. Chf of Police, Cty of Cherokee, et al
Defendant: Anna C. Salter
Defendant / Appellee: Chief of Police, City of Cherokee, Dave Jobes and Mike Adams
Plaintiff / Appellant: Eddie C. Risdal
Case Number: 20-1730
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 20-1730: paid - cs] [4911337] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 05/08/2020 02:50 PM]
May 5, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 05/04/2020 Risdal will be given twenty one (21) days from the date of this order to respond to defendants motion to strike and show cause why he has not violated Rule 11(b)(3). If Risdal fails to file a response, or if that response fails to explain the violation of Rule 11(b)(3), his motions to appeal in forma pauperis will be denied as a sanction. [4910099] [20-1730, 20-1752] (AEV) [Entered: 05/05/2020 03:55 PM]
May 5, 2020 CLERK ORDER On the court's own motion Appellant is granted an extension of time to resolve the appellate file filing fee until 05/26/2020 in order to comply with the U.S. District Court order of 5/4/20 regarding this issue. [4910103] [20-1730, 20-1752] (AEV) [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:01 PM]
May 4, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for brief Appellant/Petitioner Brief, Doc No. [ # 4905840-2 ], brief premature brief, Doc No. [ # 4905840-3 ], filed by Appellant Mr. Eddie C. Risdal. [4909583] [20-1730] (HAG) [Entered: 05/04/2020 03:57 PM]
April 21, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Eddie C. Risdal. w/service by USCA-8 on 04/23/2020 , , The court has received and filed appellant's brief. Because no briefing schedule has been established, the appellant's brief is premature. Until a briefing schedule is established, no appellee responsive brief is due at this time. Length: 4 pages [4905840] [20-1730] (LMT) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:06 AM]
April 20, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent regarding payment for $100 received and forwarded to the US District Court for Northern Iowa - Western division. Mr. Risdal is advised that the appellate filing fee for his cases is $505 each. This payment is insufficient to satisfy either filing. Additionally, he is notified to send any future payments to the U.S. District court. [4904561] [20-1730, 20-1752] (AEV) [Entered: 04/20/2020 01:16 PM]
April 9, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of second notice of appeal, docket entries, [4901362] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:49 AM]
April 8, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum, Opinion and Order 3/24/20, Judgment 3/24/20, Order 4/6/20, docket entries, [4900235] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:20 AM]
April 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/29/2020, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4900243] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:28 AM]
April 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4900246] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:30 AM]
April 8, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4900227] [20-1730] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eddie Risdal v. Chf of Police, Cty of Cherokee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chief of Police, City of Cherokee
Represented By: Barbara Ann Hering
Represented By: Alex Grasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dave Jobes
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Peterzalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mike Adams
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Peterzalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna C. Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eddie C. Risdal
Represented By: Eddie C. Risdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?