Clarence Anderson v. K. Bowers, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Toni Raymond, Assistant Adminstration, Craighead County Detention Center, Marty Boyd, Sheriff, Craighead County Detention Center, K. Bowers, Administration, Craighead County Detention Center and Does, Chaplain
Plaintiff / Appellant: Clarence Anderson
Case Number: 20-1792
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 20-1792: due] [4911875] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:07 PM]
May 11, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Upon further review, the District Court has determined Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 06/10/2020. [4911834] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:16 PM]
May 4, 2020 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Clarence Anderson w/service 05/04/2020. [4909621] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 04:59 PM]
April 16, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4903350] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:58 AM]
April 16, 2020 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 05/14/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4903343] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:55 AM]
April 16, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Proposed Findings & Recommendations dated 3/2/2020, Order and Judgment both dated 3/24/2020, and Order dated 4/15/2020. [4903340] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:54 AM]
April 16, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4903333] [20-1792] (CMH) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clarence Anderson v. K. Bowers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Toni Raymond, Assistant Adminstration, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marty Boyd, Sheriff, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. Bowers, Administration, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, Chaplain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clarence Anderson
Represented By: Clarence Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?