Northport Health Svcs. of Ark., et al v. USDHHS, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, PM OPS, Inc., doing business as Dierks Health and Rehab, Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., doing business as Hendrix Health & Rehabilitation, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, doing business as Crystal River Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Ocala River Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Daytona Beach Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing busin, OR OPS, Inc., doing business as Oak Ridge Health and Rehabilitation, MHCNC, Inc., doing business as Care Manor Nursing and Rehab, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, doing business as Springdale Health and Rehabilitation Center, Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Salco NC 2, Inc., doing business as Amberwood Health and Rehabilitation, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SLNC, Inc., doing business as Southfork River Therapy and Living, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SCNC, Inc., doing business as Spring Creek Health & Rehab, Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, doing business as Birch Pointe Health and Rehabilitation, TXKNC, Inc., doing business as Bailey Creek Health & Rehab, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Salco NC, Inc., doing business as Evergreen Living Center at Stagecoach, Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., doing business as James River Nursing and Rehabilitation, Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, MLBNC, Inc., doing business as Pioneer Therapy and Living, RTNC, Inc., doing business as Rector Nursing and Rehab, Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., HBNC, Inc., doing business as Southridge Village Nursing and Rehab, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, CNNC, Inc., doing business as Corning Therapy and Living Center, Linco Health, Inc., doing business as Gardner Nursing and Rehabilitation, Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, AFNC, Inc., doing business as Eaglecrest Nursing and Rehab, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., FPNC, Inc., doing business as Twin Lakes Therapy and Living, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., WRNC, Inc., doing business as Chapel Woods Health and Rehabilitation, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, doing business as St. Elizabeths Place, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., MMNC, Inc., doing business as The Lakes at Maumelle Health and Rehabilitation, Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, doing business as Joplin Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Webb City Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Carthage Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Warsaw, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, doing business as Covington Court Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Fayetteville Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Springdale Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing busi, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., doing business as Magnolia Square Nursing and Rehab, GVNC, Inc., doing business as Gassville Therapy and Living, Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., SRCNC, Inc., doing business as The Crossing at Riverside Health and Rehabilitation, Perry County Care Center, Inc., Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, doing business as Timberlane Health & Rehabilitation, Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, HLNC, Inc., doing business as Heritage Living Center, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., JBNC, Inc., doing business as Ridgecrest Health and Rehabilitation, BNNC, Inc., doing business as Alcoa Pines Health and Rehabilitation, OCNC, Inc., doing business as Silver Oaks Health and Rehabilitation, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, doing business as The Maples, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, HSNC, Inc., doing business as Village Springs Health and Rehabilitation, WCNC, Inc., doing business as Katherines Place at Wedington, BVNC, Inc., doing business as Alcoa Pines Health and Rehabilitation, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., doing business as North Hills Life Care and Rehab, Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC and Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, In his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health & Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Seema Verma, In her official capacity as the Administrator of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-1799
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 JUDGE ORDER: The motion for stay pending appeal is granted until 09/01/2020 [ # 4916805-2 ]. Appellees' brief remains due 06/29/2020. Adp June 2020 [4922034] [20-1799] (BNW) [Entered: 06/09/2020 04:07 PM]
June 5, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 4916805-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis Fan for Appellees Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Seema Verma , w/service 06/05/2020. [4920911] [20-1799] (DF) [Entered: 06/05/2020 04:15 PM]
May 28, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANTS BRIEF filed by AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., BNNC, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., CNNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., FPNC, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, HBNC, Inc., HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., JRNRC OPS, Inc., Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., MSNRC OPS, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, OCNC, Inc., OR OPS, Inc., Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, PM OPS, Inc., Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Russellville Car Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., SLNC, Inc., SRCNC, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., WRNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC and Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. w/service 05/28/2020. Length: 13,000 words. Brief of Alex M. Azar II, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Seema Verma due on 06/29/2020. [4917728] [20-1799] (BNW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:34 PM]
May 28, 2020 APPELLANT brief of AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4917678] [20-1799] (PDC) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:16 AM]
May 27, 2020 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 2 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 2-volume appendix [4917405] [20-1799] (CMD) [Entered: 05/27/2020 04:17 PM]
May 27, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANTS FILED by Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., BNNC, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., CNNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., FPNC, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, HBNC, Inc., HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., JRNRC OPS, Inc., Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., MSNRC OPS, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, OCNC, Inc., OR OPS, Inc., Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, PM OPS, Inc., Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Russellville Car Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., SLNC, Inc., SRCNC, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., WRNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC and Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. w/service 05/27/2020. [4917242] [20-1799] (BNW) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:17 PM]
May 27, 2020 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Paul D. Clement for Appellants Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, AFNC, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., BNNC, Inc., BVNC, Inc., CNNC, Inc., FPNC, Inc., GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., JBNC, Inc., Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Linco Health, Inc., MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., OCNC, Inc., OR OPS, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., RTNC, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, SLNC, Inc., SRCNC, Inc., Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc., WRNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Parks Edge Care Center, Inc. and Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc.. [4917228] [20-1799] (BNW) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:06 PM]
May 26, 2020 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Paul D. Clement for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 05/26/2020. [4916805] [20-1799] (PDC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 08:17 PM]
May 26, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4916804] [20-1799] (PDC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 08:08 PM]
May 26, 2020 APPELLANT brief of AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4916803] [20-1799] (PDC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 08:05 PM]
May 6, 2020 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Source Location: USDC/ WARF, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Barden, Paula [4910162] [20-1799] (JJF) [Entered: 05/06/2020 08:17 AM]
April 30, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc.. w/service 04/30/2020 [4908382] [20-1799] (EM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:06 PM]
April 30, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/30/2020 [4908378] [20-1799] (EM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:02 PM]
April 30, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. - w/service 04/30/2020. [4908375] [20-1799] (EM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:58 AM]
April 28, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Party/Appellant, "Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC" added and duplicate party "NWA Nursing Center, LLC" was removed from the caption. [4907479] [20-1799] (AEV) [Entered: 04/28/2020 02:17 PM]
April 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Damon C. Andrews for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 04/24/2020 [4906303] [20-1799] (DCA) [Entered: 04/24/2020 09:27 AM]
April 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Kasdin Miller Mitchell for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 04/24/2020 [4906254] [20-1799] (KMM) [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:16 AM]
April 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Erin E. Murphy for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 04/24/2020 [4906248] [20-1799] (EM) [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:10 AM]
April 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Paul D. Clement for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 04/24/2020 [4906246] [20-1799] (PDC) [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:07 AM]
April 22, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4905759] [20-1799] (KTD) [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:36 PM]
April 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Kirkman T. Dougherty for Appellants AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, BNNC, Inc., Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, CNNC, Inc., Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, FPNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., HBNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, JRNRC OPS, Inc., Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MSNRC OPS, Inc., Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., OCNC, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, OR OPS, Inc., Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., PM OPS, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Russellville Car Center, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, SLNC, Inc., South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, SRCNC, Inc., Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. and WRNC, Inc. w/service 04/22/2020 [4905686] [20-1799] (KTD) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:17 PM]
April 16, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Dennis Fan for Appellees U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and Ms. Seema Verma w/service 04/16/2020 [4903723] [20-1799] (DF) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:51 PM]
April 16, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/26/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT AFNC, Inc., Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC, Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC, Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC, Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Atkins Care Center, Inc., BNNC, Inc., BVNC, Inc., Beebe Retirement Center, Inc., Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., CNNC, Inc., Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC, Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC, Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc., Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC, Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Country Club Gardens, LLC, Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Eufaula Care Center, Inc., FPNC, Inc., Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, GVNC, Inc., Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Greenbrier Care Center, Inc., Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, HBNC, Inc., HLNC, Inc., HSNC, Inc., Heather Manor Care Center, Inc., Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC, Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC, JBNC, Inc., JRNRC OPS, Inc., Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC, Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC, Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC, Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC, Linco Health, Inc., Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC, Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, MHCNC, Inc., MLBNC, Inc., MMNC, Inc., MSNRC OPS, Inc., Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, NWA Nursing Center, LLC, Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc., Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC, Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, OCNC, Inc., OR OPS, Inc., Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, PM OPS, Inc., Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Parks Edge Care Center, Inc., Perry County Care Center, Inc., Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, RTNC, Inc., Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Russellville Car Center, Inc., SCNC, Inc., SLNC, Inc., SRCNC, Inc., Salco NC 2, Inc., Salco NC, Inc., Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Senior Living Management Group, LLC, Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC, South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Stella Manor Care Center, Inc., Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Superior Health & Rehab, LLC, TXKNC, Inc., Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, WCNC, Inc., WRNC, Inc., Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc., Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC and Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc. due 05/26/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4903716] [20-1799] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:48 PM]
April 16, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum Opinion and Order 4/7/20, Judgment 4/7/20, docket entries, [4903698] [20-1799] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:32 PM]
April 16, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4903695] [20-1799] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Northport Health Svcs. of Ark., et al v. USDHHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Civic Center Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Crossville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Superior Health & Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PM OPS, Inc., doing business as Dierks Health and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hendrix Health Care Center, Inc., doing business as Hendrix Health & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northport Health Services of Florida, LLC, doing business as Crystal River Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Ocala River Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Daytona Beach Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing busin
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OR OPS, Inc., doing business as Oak Ridge Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MHCNC, Inc., doing business as Care Manor Nursing and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Luverne Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Prattville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, doing business as Springdale Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shiloh Nursing and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robinson Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Legacy Heights Nursing and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Hoover, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Salco NC 2, Inc., doing business as Amberwood Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Country Club Gardens, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beebe Retirement Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Valley View Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SLNC, Inc., doing business as Southfork River Therapy and Living
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Palm Gardens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stella Manor Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Georgiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bradford House Nursing and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCNC, Inc., doing business as Spring Creek Health & Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Apple Creek Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ashland Place Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eufaula Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sherwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Senior Living Management Group, LLC, doing business as Birch Pointe Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TXKNC, Inc., doing business as Bailey Creek Health & Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gulf Coast Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Salco NC, Inc., doing business as Evergreen Living Center at Stagecoach
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cabot Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lineville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sumter Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JRNRC OPS, Inc., doing business as James River Nursing and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wetumpka Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Colonel Glenn Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aspire Physical Recovery Center at Cahaba River, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MLBNC, Inc., doing business as Pioneer Therapy and Living
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RTNC, Inc., doing business as Rector Nursing and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Johnson County Heatlh and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nursing and Rehabilitation Center at Good Shepherd, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Innisfree Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Briarwood Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cherokee County Nursing Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oak Manor Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HBNC, Inc., doing business as Southridge Village Nursing and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: South Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Greystone Nursing and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CNNC, Inc., doing business as Corning Therapy and Living Center
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Linco Health, Inc., doing business as Gardner Nursing and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Florala Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Creek Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ozark Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Westwood Health and Rehab, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Quapaw Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AFNC, Inc., doing business as Eaglecrest Nursing and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chapel Ridge Nursing Center, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Columbiana Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oak Knoll Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Legacy Health and Rehabilitation of Pleasant Grove, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Atkins Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FPNC, Inc., doing business as Twin Lakes Therapy and Living
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ashton Place Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Greenbrier Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Belvedere Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Huntsville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nashville Nursing & Rehab, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WRNC, Inc., doing business as Chapel Woods Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jonesboro Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, doing business as St. Elizabeths Place
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Parks Edge Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Russellville Car Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MMNC, Inc., doing business as The Lakes at Maumelle Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lakewood Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northway Health & Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northport Health Services of Missouri, LLC, doing business as Joplin Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Webb City Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Carthage Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Warsaw
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, doing business as Covington Court Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Fayetteville Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing business as Springdale Health and Rehabilitation Center, doing busi
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Windcrest Health and Rehab, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Opp Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aspire Physical Recovery Center of West Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSNRC OPS, Inc., doing business as Magnolia Square Nursing and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GVNC, Inc., doing business as Gassville Therapy and Living
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Salem Place Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Heather Manor Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SRCNC, Inc., doing business as The Crossing at Riverside Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Perry County Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timberlane Care and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, doing business as Timberlane Health & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hickory Heights Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: South Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HLNC, Inc., doing business as Heritage Living Center
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dardanelle Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JBNC, Inc., doing business as Ridgecrest Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BNNC, Inc., doing business as Alcoa Pines Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OCNC, Inc., doing business as Silver Oaks Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Park Manor Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Moundville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Athens Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NWA Nursing Center, LLC, doing business as The Maples
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lonoke Health and Rehab Center, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tallassee Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacksonville Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HSNC, Inc., doing business as Village Springs Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WCNC, Inc., doing business as Katherines Place at Wedington
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BVNC, Inc., doing business as Alcoa Pines Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cordova Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jamestown Nursing and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northwest Health and Rehab, Inc., doing business as North Hills Life Care and Rehab
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Johnson County Health and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Damon Clarke Andrews
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glen Haven Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Andrew C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, In his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Seth T. Creed
Represented By: Dennis Fan
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Seth T. Creed
Represented By: Dennis Fan
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Seema Verma, In her official capacity as the Administrator of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Seth T. Creed
Represented By: Dennis Fan
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Seth T. Creed
Represented By: Dennis Fan
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?