Michael Allen v. Lucas Embanton
Petitioner / Appellant: Michael Edward Allen
Defendant / Appellee: Lucas Embanton, Sheriff, Van Buren County Jail
Case Number: 20-1838
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - titled, "Addendum" filed by Mr. Michael Edward Allen. w/service 06/18/2020 [4925174] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 06/18/2020 02:28 PM]
May 18, 2020 MEMORANDUM of Appellant Mr. Michael Edward Allen in support of originating court document notice of appeal, , Doc No. [ # 4905699-2 ]. w/service 05/18/2020. [4914430] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:25 PM]
May 6, 2020 MEMORANDUM of Appellant Mr. Michael Edward Allen in support of originating court document notice of appeal, , Doc No. [ # 4905699-2 ]. w/service 05/07/2020. [4910741] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:59 AM]
May 4, 2020 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Edward Allen w/service 05/05/2020. [4909881] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 05/05/2020 11:45 AM]
April 22, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4905705] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:35 PM]
April 22, 2020 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 05/20/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4905703] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:34 PM]
April 22, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Partial Recommended Disposition 3/3/20, Order 3/9/20, Order 4/7/20, Judgment 4/7/20, Text Order Denying IFP 4/22/20, docket entries, [4905699] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:32 PM]
April 22, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4905697] [20-1838] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Allen v. Lucas Embanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Michael Edward Allen
Represented By: Michael Edward Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucas Embanton, Sheriff, Van Buren County Jail
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?