Melinda Myers, et al v. Iowa Board of Regents
Plaintiff / Appellee: Shuna Tosa, on Behalf of Themselves and Others Similarly Situated, Melinda Myers, John Eivins, Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Barbara Stanerson and Christopher Taylor
Defendant / Appellant: Iowa Board of Regents
Case Number: 20-2020
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by. w/service 07/16/2020 , Length: 5,315 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Iowa Board of Regents due 07/21/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of John Eivins, Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Melinda Myers, Barbara Stanerson, Christopher Taylor and Shuna Tosa due on 08/17/2020 [4934487] [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:27 PM]
July 15, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Iowa Board of Regents submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4934173] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 07/15/2020 04:44 PM]
July 15, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Iowa Board of Regents , w/service 07/14/2020 [4934058] [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:53 PM]
July 15, 2020 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Andrew T. Tice for Appellant Iowa Board of Regents. [4934051] [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:23 PM]
July 14, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Iowa Board of Regents. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4933705] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 07/14/2020 03:54 PM]
July 14, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Iowa Board of Regents submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4933704] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 07/14/2020 03:53 PM]
June 29, 2020 REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Brief of Iowa Board of Regents due 07/14/2020 [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 06/29/2020 11:03 AM]
June 15, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Appellees' motionto take judicial notice filed by Mr. Benjamin J. Weber in 20-2020 , [ # 4920840-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4923711] [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:10 PM]
June 15, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to motion take judicial notice [ # 4920840-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Jason Michael Craig for Appellant Iowa Board of Regents , w/service 06/15/2020. [4923689] [20-2020] RESPONSE in opposition to motion take judicial notice [ # 4920840-2 ] ,. - FOR CAL [4923689] [20-2020]--[Edited 06/15/2020 by CMD] (JMC) [Entered: 06/15/2020 11:45 AM]
June 5, 2020 MOTION Judicial Notice, filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin J. Weber for Appellees Mr. John Eivins, Ms. Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Ms. Melinda Myers, Ms. Barbara Stanerson, Mr. Christopher Taylor and Ms. Shuna Tosa w/service 06/05/2020. [4920840] [20-2020] (Event is edited to reflect the correct relief)--[Edited 06/05/2020 by CMD] MOTION - FOR CAL,. [4920840] [20-2020]--[Edited 06/16/2020 by CMD] (BJW) [Entered: 06/05/2020 02:54 PM]
June 5, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance. [4920540] [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:35 AM]
June 5, 2020 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under Rule 27 certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion take judicial notice, [ # 4920437-2 ], submitted by Mr. Benjamin J. Weber in 20-2020 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [20-2020] (CMD) [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:32 AM]
June 4, 2020 MOTION Judicial Notice, filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin J. Weber for Appellees Mr. John Eivins, Ms. Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Ms. Melinda Myers, Ms. Barbara Stanerson, Mr. Christopher Taylor and Ms. Shuna Tosa w/service 06/04/2020. [4920437] [20-2020] (Event edited to reflect correct relief)--[Edited 06/05/2020 by CMD] THIS DOCUMENT IS LOCKED. COUNSEL REFILED MOTION WITH REQUESTED CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE.--[Edited 06/05/2020 by CMD] (BJW) [Entered: 06/04/2020 05:06 PM]
June 4, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Iowa Board of Regents - w/service 06/04/2020. [4920268] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:28 PM]
June 4, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Iowa Board of Regents. w/service 06/04/2020 [4920257] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:23 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Nathan T. Willems for Appellees Mr. John Eivins, Ms. Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Ms. Melinda Myers, Ms. Barbara Stanerson, Ms. Shuna Tosa and Mr. Christopher Taylor w/service 05/27/2020 [4917229] [20-2020] (NTW) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:07 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin J. Weber for Appellees Mr. John Eivins, Ms. Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Ms. Melinda Myers, Ms. Barbara Stanerson, Mr. Christopher Taylor and Ms. Shuna Tosa w/service 05/27/2020 [4916928] [20-2020] (BJW) [Entered: 05/27/2020 09:31 AM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Lindsay A. Vaught for Appellant Iowa Board of Regents w/service 05/26/2020 [4916352] [20-2020] (LAV) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:36 AM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew T. Tice for Appellant Iowa Board of Regents w/service 05/26/2020 [4916349] [20-2020] (ATT) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:35 AM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Jason M. Craig for Appellant Iowa Board of Regents w/service 05/26/2020 [4916344] [20-2020] (JMC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:31 AM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Harold L. Lichten for Appellees Ms. Melinda Myers, Mr. John Eivins, Ms. Liv Kelly-Sellnau, Ms. Barbara Stanerson, Mr. Christopher Taylor and Ms. Shuna Tosa w/service 05/26/2020 [4916335] [20-2020] (HLL) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:26 AM]
May 21, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Iowa Board of Regents due 06/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4915511] [20-2020] (CAH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:25 PM]
May 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 5/5/20, motion for stay and brief in support which were filed in the district court on 5/19/20. [4915508] [20-2020] (CAH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:24 PM]
May 21, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4915502] [20-2020] (CAH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melinda Myers, et al v. Iowa Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shuna Tosa, on Behalf of Themselves and Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melinda Myers
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Eivins
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Liv Kelly-Sellnau
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Stanerson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin J. Weber
Represented By: Nathan T. Willems
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Iowa Board of Regents
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?