Philip Petrone, et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Fardrel J. Guice, John Robert Hardin, Wilson M. Dagaye, Tonya McDonald, Robert Wallace, Diego Barraza, Paul Lowe, Richard Adam Solomon, David Wright Tillman, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Marcus Oscar Orr, James Matthew Potts, Steven Anthony Wasson, Matthew Jay McDaniel, Annette Fay Holder, David Andrew Delisi, Winston Stewart, Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Fred Glass, III, Justin Burkholder, Steven Dubinsky, Steven Dale Burgess, Thomas C. Marchione, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., Terry Lee Batko, Karl Matthew Emerson, Kenneth B. Cloud, Steven M. Ramsey, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Saleh M. Nasser, James G. Paige, Jr., Damien Marcus Boyer, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Noulieng Thisanakone, Randy Halcomb, Michael T. Jones, Patrick Mark Walters, Jean Marie Gogolin, Anthony Frank, Lance Wallace, John Christopher Glover, Michael Wayne Murray, Michael A. Sederquist, David Davila, Paul Cleaver, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, John Jason Pryor, William Thomas Roop, Richard F. Torrisi, Terry Lee Elkins, Oscar Reyes, Gary C. Montgomery, Justin Bristol, Jasbir Singh, Kabik Daam, Jack Dean Michael, David C. Waldron, Rafarel K. Boadu, Gary M. Bernstine, Robert Edward Howes, James Julian Alan Surrency, Timothy McCabe Bailey, John Reddick, Mark Antonio Woods, Harpal Singh, Thomas Cross, David Jacob Marrs, Richard Clair Bash, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kevin Toll, Alonza David Lee, Ahmad Abdinasir, Steven Scott Goodman, Jarrod Scott Pitts, Tamaro R. Graham, Stewart Fisher, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Steve N. Neely, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, Gary Eugene Gude, Warren R. Wright, Darrell Wayne Johnson, Jasper U. Reaves, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Howard Arthur Singer, Clarence Robinson, John Michael Doss, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Delandos Jackson, Randy Shane Smith, Brennon Thompson, Quitz Snider, Devon Terelle Wofford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Chad Michael Newsome, Seth Fezatte, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Steven Richard Milstead, Louis James Dietry, Csaba G. Barabas, Robert Lee Plunkett, David Andrew McDevitt, Jose Valentine, Carl Montgomery, Shannon Leigh Terry, Krystel Lucas, Tim Swadley, Dennis Dean Smith, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Doug Anthony McSwain, Stewart Fisher, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated, Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Dan Vilaythong, Brian Pankz, on behalf of themselves and all those similarly situated, Wayne Woodrow Waite, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Robert William Herrmann, Robert John Monroe, Kristopher Kibby, Olivia Bryant, Clell Morgan, II, Nathan Joel Nadell, Russell E. Lourwood, Kenya Dyone Collins, Timothy Michael Kyser, Daniel Jefferson, Brett Allen Huckstep, Joseph E. Barker, Shawn Michael Stone, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Kathleen M. Hallmark, Barney Robson, Debra Paula Gugle, August William Grow, Philip Petrone, David Burgess, Richard Copley, Luis Duran Saldivar, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Trey Anthony Webber, Matthew Pereira, Michael A. Karpouskas, Gary Ward Kennerly, Donald Wade Owens, Elias Bratcher, Michael Kovacsi, Johnny Carter, Lorene Musabelli, Martha L. Lantz, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Jeffrey G. Crissman, Christopher Ayala, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Scott A. Larrow, Stacey Webb, Debra A. Moore, Michael Ray Combs, Charles Roy Honacher, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Victor Chavarria, Issac Houston Chase, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Francisco Cruz, Robert A. Scott, III, Brett Carty, Stacey Marie Lowe, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Adam F. Akhalu, Steven M. Willis, Christina Bradley, Jeremy L. Maness, Roscoe W. Forman, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Howard Corley, Jr., Christopher Otto, Kyle Anthony Smith, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Nickilas Sams, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Luanne Santoro Voght, Peter B. Oh, Loman Hutchings, Barbara Ann Scoby, James Mancuso, Johnny Keith White, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Reia Winn, Heath Daniel Reams, Gregory D. Trent, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Brian Pankz, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated, D'Andre LeMare Handy, Darran LaVan Lewis, Brandon Richard, William Wood, Joseph Franklin Scott, Guertho Lemorin, Brandon Roldan, Henry Barentine, Mark C. Eure, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Richard Calvert, Bryan James Pratt, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, George A. Tapia, Curtis Ryals, Michael Scott Davis, Alan Blane Arthur, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Norrek McCarty, Gail Marie Hess, Noel Ramirez, Byron Huffin, John Anthony Morris, Joseph Pusateri, Perry A. Deeke, William James Petty, Jr., Charles Shackelford, James Michael Cullity, Nicholas Brown, Douglas Allen Elbon, Jasbir Singh, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated, David Allen Jones, Michael Andrew Pertle, Kevin L. Maehrer, Roman Stelter, Samuel Ray McMillian, Benjamin Reno, William Clyde Marks, Michael Hossler, Carl Eberhardt, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Derick Lynn Sullins, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Kenneth Ray Cook, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Jason Dewayne Gunn, John Manson Ray, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Derrick Earl Webb, Derek C. Anglero, Erick Thompkins, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Michael W. Moore, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Eric Franklin Green, David Frank Pressley, Luis S. Ogando Colon and Elizabeth Baumgartel
Defendant / Appellee: Werner Enterprises, Inc., doing business as Werner Trucking and Drivers Management, LLC
Case Number: 20-2500
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 10/26/2020. Appellants brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees' brief due 12/10/2020. Reply brief due 1/15/2021. [20-2500] (LMT) [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:31 PM]
August 31, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4950578-2 ] motion extend the briefing schedule deadlines filed by appellants. Appellant brief deadline is 10/26/2020, Appellee brief deadline 12/10/2020, Reply brief deadline 1/15/2021. [4951122] [20-2500] (LMT) [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:11 PM]
August 28, 2020 MOTION to extend briefing deadlines, filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua S. Boyette for Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, et al. w/service 08/28/2020. [4950578] [20-2500]--[Edited 08/31/2020 by LMT]--[Edited 08/31/2020 by LMT]--[Edited 08/31/2020 by LMT]--[Edited 08/31/2020 by LMT] (RSS) [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:23 PM]
August 14, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Werner Enterprises, Inc.. w/service 08/14/2020 [4945641] [20-2500] (EAC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:03 PM]
August 6, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods, Warren R. Wright and Appellees Drivers Management, Drivers Management, Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Werner Enterprises, Inc. - w/service 08/06/2020. [4943019] [20-2500] (JSB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 08:08 PM]
August 6, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods and Warren R. Wright. w/service 08/06/2020 [4943008] [20-2500] (JSB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 05:17 PM]
August 6, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods and Warren R. Wright - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/06/2020 [4943007] [20-2500] (JSB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 05:15 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Joshua S. Boyette, Esq. for Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods and Warren R. Wright w/service 08/06/2020 [4942967] [20-2500] (JSB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:03 PM]
August 6, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods and Warren R. Wright. No Transcript[4942946] [20-2500] (JSB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 03:43 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Justin L. Swidler, Esq. for Appellants Ahmad Abdinasir, Adam F. Akhalu, Latoshia Denise Anderson, Derek C. Anglero, Alan Blane Arthur, Christopher Ayala, Timothy McCabe Bailey, Csaba G. Barabas, Henry Barentine, Joseph E. Barker, Diego Barraza, Richard Clair Bash, Terry Lee Batko, Elizabeth Baumgartel, Jeremy Alfred Bennett, Gary M. Bernstine, Stacy Lynn Bluebird, Rafarel K. Boadu, Damien Marcus Boyer, Christina Bradley, Elias Bratcher, Justin Bristol, Micheal Anthony Brooks, Nicholas Brown, Olivia Bryant, Lawrence F. Bunkowski, David Burgess, Steven Dale Burgess, Justin Burkholder, Richard Calvert, Johnny Carter, Brett Carty, Joel Castaneda-Dominguez, Lawrence Edward Cecil, Issac Houston Chase, Victor Chavarria, Paul Cleaver, Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr., Kenneth B. Cloud, Thomas Ricky Coker, Kenya Dyone Collins, Luis S. Ogando Colon, Michael Ray Combs, Kenneth Ray Cook, Richard Copley, Howard Corley, Jr., Jeffrey G. Crissman, Jimmy Carl Criswell, Thomas Cross, Francisco Cruz, James Michael Cullity, Kabik Daam, Wilson M. Dagaye, David Davila, Michael Scott Davis, Jermey Leonard Dawson, Perry A. Deeke, David Andrew Delisi, Louis James Dietry, John Michael Doss, Steven Dubinsky, Carl Eberhardt, Harcourt P. Edgecombe, Douglas Allen Elbon, Terry Lee Elkins, Paul Terry Elliott, Jr., Karl Matthew Emerson, Mark C. Eure, Seth Fezatte, Stewart Fisher, Stewart Fisher, Roscoe W. Forman, Anthony Frank, Nathaniel Anthony Frazier, Jr., Ernest G. Fulp, Jr., Peter Liyayi Gaitano, Jose Garcia-Gonzalez, JoAnna Hancock Geddings, Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr., Fred Glass, III, John Christopher Glover, Jean Marie Gogolin, Steven Scott Goodman, Tamaro R. Graham, Eric Franklin Green, August William Grow, Gary Eugene Gude, Debra Paula Gugle, Fardrel J. Guice, Jason Dewayne Gunn, Shaun Phillip Guthrie, Randy Halcomb, Kathleen M. Hallmark, D'Andre LeMare Handy, John Robert Hardin, Robert William Herrmann, Gail Marie Hess, Annette Fay Holder, Charles Roy Honacher, Michael Hossler, Robert Edward Howes, Brett Allen Huckstep, Byron Huffin, Loman Hutchings, Delandos Jackson, Morris Jacobs, Jr., Daniel Jefferson, Ciera Lillian Jenkins, Darrell Wayne Johnson, David Allen Jones, Michael T. Jones, Willie Lee Jones, Sr., Michael A. Karpouskas, Behzad Kazemiseresht, Gary Ward Kennerly, Kristopher Kibby, Ronald L. Kilpatrick, Nathan Phillip Koehler, Michael Kovacsi, Timothy Michael Kyser, Martha L. Lantz, Scott A. Larrow, Alonza David Lee, Guertho Lemorin, Darran LaVan Lewis, Joshua Brooke Lipham, Russell E. Lourwood, Paul Lowe, Stacey Marie Lowe, Krystel Lucas, Kevin L. Maehrer, Jonathan Michael Magnuson, James Mancuso, Jeremy L. Maness, Thomas C. Marchione, William Clyde Marks, David Jacob Marrs, Norrek McCarty, Matthew Jay McDaniel, David Andrew McDevitt, Tonya McDonald, Samuel Ray McMillian, Doug Anthony McSwain, Jack Dean Michael, Steven Richard Milstead, Robert John Monroe, Carl Montgomery, Gary C. Montgomery, Debra A. Moore, Michael W. Moore, Clell Morgan, II, John Anthony Morris, Michael Wayne Murray, Lorene Musabelli, Nathan Joel Nadell, Saleh M. Nasser, Steve N. Neely, Chad Michael Newsome, Aaron Jermain Nixon, Peter B. Oh, Marcus Oscar Orr, Christopher Otto, Donald Wade Owens, Charles D. Paglicco, Jr., James G. Paige, Jr., Brian Pankz, Brian Pankz, Matthew Pereira, Michael Andrew Pertle, Philip Petrone, Philip Petrone, William James Petty, Jr., Jarrod Scott Pitts, Robert Lee Plunkett, James Matthew Potts, Bryan James Pratt, David Frank Pressley, John Jason Pryor, Joseph Pusateri, Noel Ramirez, Steven M. Ramsey, John Manson Ray, Heath Daniel Reams, Jasper U. Reaves, John Reddick, Benjamin Reno, Oscar Reyes, Brandon Richard, Gregory Scott Vian Risdon, Clarence Robinson, Rayo Emmiito Robinson, Barney Robson, Brandon Roldan, William Thomas Roop, Curtis Ryals, Luis Duran Saldivar, Nickilas Sams, Franklin L. Schmidt, III, Barbara Ann Scoby, Joseph Franklin Scott, Robert A. Scott, III, Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr., Michael A. Sederquist, Phillip Wayne Senecal, Guillermo Serrano-Lopez, Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez, Charles Shackelford, Katherine P. Shoemaker, Howard Arthur Singer, Harpal Singh, Jasbir Singh, Jasbir Singh, Dennis Dean Smith, Kyle Anthony Smith, Randy Shane Smith, Timothy Leonardo Smith, Quitz Snider, Richard Adam Solomon, Roman Stelter, Winston Stewart, Shawn Michael Stone, Derick Lynn Sullins, James Julian Alan Surrency, Tim Swadley, George A. Tapia, Shannon Leigh Terry, Noulieng Thisanakone, Erick Thompkins, Brennon Thompson, Stephen Loyd Tillerson, David Wright Tillman, Kevin Toll, Richard F. Torrisi, Jeffrey S. Torsrud, Gregory D. Trent, Jose Valentine, Dan Vilaythong, Luanne Santoro Voght, Wayne Woodrow Waite, David C. Waldron, Marisa Sabrinda Walker, Lance Wallace, Robert Wallace, Patrick Mark Walters, Steven Anthony Wasson, Joseph Kane Weatherford, Derrick Earl Webb, Stacey Webb, Trey Anthony Webber, Carisma Concetta Weiss, Keeley Wheeler, Jr., Johnny Keith White, Kacy Fonteze Williams, Tiffany Nicole Williams, Steven M. Willis, Reia Winn, Marlon Dewayne Witcham, Devon Terelle Wofford, William Wood, Mark Antonio Woods and Warren R. Wright w/service 08/06/2020 [4942925] [20-2500] (JLS) [Entered: 08/06/2020 03:31 PM]
July 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth A. Culhane for Appellees Drivers Management, Drivers Management, Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Werner Enterprises, Inc. w/service 07/24/2020 [4938063] [20-2500] (EAC) [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:42 PM]
July 24, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Drivers Management and Drivers Management. - FOR CAL [4938043] [20-2500] (JEJ) [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:23 PM]
July 24, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Werner Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4938041] [20-2500] (JEJ) [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:21 PM]
July 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Joseph E. Jones for Appellees Drivers Management, Drivers Management, Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Werner Enterprises, Inc. w/service 07/24/2020 [4938034] [20-2500] (JEJ) [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:16 PM]
July 23, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/01/2020. Appendix due 09/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANTS due 09/11/2020 Appellees' brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4937502] [20-2500] (CAH) [Entered: 07/23/2020 04:58 PM]
July 23, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum & order 6/22/20, judgment 6/22/20. [4937498] [20-2500] (CAH) [Entered: 07/23/2020 04:56 PM]
July 23, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4937492] [20-2500] (CAH) [Entered: 07/23/2020 04:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Philip Petrone, et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fardrel J. Guice
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Robert Hardin
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wilson M. Dagaye
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tonya McDonald
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Wallace
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Diego Barraza
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Lowe
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Adam Solomon
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Wright Tillman
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JoAnna Hancock Geddings
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nathan Phillip Koehler
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marcus Oscar Orr
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Matthew Potts
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Anthony Wasson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Matthew Jay McDaniel
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Annette Fay Holder
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Andrew Delisi
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Winston Stewart
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ernest G. Fulp, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fred Glass, III
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Justin Burkholder
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Dubinsky
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Dale Burgess
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas C. Marchione
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stacy Lynn Bluebird
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tiffany Nicole Williams
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles D. Paglicco, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Terry Lee Batko
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Karl Matthew Emerson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenneth B. Cloud
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven M. Ramsey
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carisma Concetta Weiss
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Saleh M. Nasser
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James G. Paige, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Damien Marcus Boyer
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jimmy Carl Criswell
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Noulieng Thisanakone
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Randy Halcomb
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patrick Mark Walters
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jean Marie Gogolin
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Frank
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lance Wallace
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Christopher Glover
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Wayne Murray
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael A. Sederquist
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Davila
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Cleaver
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marisa Sabrinda Walker
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Larry Nathaniel Clinton, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jose Garcia-Gonzalez
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Jason Pryor
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Thomas Roop
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard F. Torrisi
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Terry Lee Elkins
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oscar Reyes
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary C. Montgomery
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Justin Bristol
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jasbir Singh
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kabik Daam
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jack Dean Michael
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David C. Waldron
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rafarel K. Boadu
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary M. Bernstine
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Edward Howes
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Julian Alan Surrency
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy McCabe Bailey
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Reddick
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Antonio Woods
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Harpal Singh
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Cross
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Jacob Marrs
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Clair Bash
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Ricky Coker
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kevin Toll
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alonza David Lee
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ahmad Abdinasir
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Scott Goodman
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jarrod Scott Pitts
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tamaro R. Graham
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stewart Fisher
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marlon Dewayne Witcham
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steve N. Neely
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jonathan Michael Magnuson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Eugene Gude
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Warren R. Wright
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Darrell Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jasper U. Reaves
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory Scott Vian Risdon
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Howard Arthur Singer
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clarence Robinson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Michael Doss
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Brooke Lipham
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Delandos Jackson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Randy Shane Smith
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brennon Thompson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Quitz Snider
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Devon Terelle Wofford
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Katherine P. Shoemaker
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chad Michael Newsome
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Seth Fezatte
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Vernon B. Seaborn, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Richard Milstead
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Louis James Dietry
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Csaba G. Barabas
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Lee Plunkett
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Andrew McDevitt
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jose Valentine
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carl Montgomery
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shannon Leigh Terry
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Krystel Lucas
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tim Swadley
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dennis Dean Smith
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Keeley Wheeler, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Doug Anthony McSwain
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stewart Fisher, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Peter Liyayi Gaitano
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dan Vilaythong
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brian Pankz, on behalf of themselves and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wayne Woodrow Waite
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pablo A. Serrano-Lopez
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert William Herrmann
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert John Monroe
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kristopher Kibby
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olivia Bryant
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clell Morgan, II
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nathan Joel Nadell
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Russell E. Lourwood
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenya Dyone Collins
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy Michael Kyser
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel Jefferson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brett Allen Huckstep
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph E. Barker
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shawn Michael Stone
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lawrence F. Bunkowski
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Terry Elliott, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kathleen M. Hallmark
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barney Robson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Debra Paula Gugle
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: August William Grow
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Philip Petrone
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Burgess
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Copley
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Luis Duran Saldivar
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lawrence Edward Cecil
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Harcourt P. Edgecombe
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trey Anthony Webber
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Matthew Pereira
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael A. Karpouskas
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Ward Kennerly
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donald Wade Owens
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elias Bratcher
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Kovacsi
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Johnny Carter
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lorene Musabelli
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martha L. Lantz
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shaun Phillip Guthrie
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeffrey G. Crissman
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Ayala
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Morris Jacobs, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Scott A. Larrow
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stacey Webb
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Debra A. Moore
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Ray Combs
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles Roy Honacher
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jermey Leonard Dawson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victor Chavarria
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Issac Houston Chase
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aaron Jermain Nixon
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Francisco Cruz
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert A. Scott, III
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brett Carty
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stacey Marie Lowe
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Guillermo Serrano-Lopez
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adam F. Akhalu
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven M. Willis
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christina Bradley
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeremy L. Maness
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roscoe W. Forman
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Franklin L. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Howard Corley, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Otto
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kyle Anthony Smith
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clair Henry Gilmore, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nickilas Sams
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy Leonardo Smith
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kacy Fonteze Williams
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Phillip Wayne Senecal
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Luanne Santoro Voght
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Peter B. Oh
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Loman Hutchings
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara Ann Scoby
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Mancuso
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Johnny Keith White
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeremy Alfred Bennett
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Reia Winn
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Heath Daniel Reams
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory D. Trent
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Latoshia Denise Anderson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brian Pankz, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: D'Andre LeMare Handy
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Darran LaVan Lewis
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brandon Richard
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Wood
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Franklin Scott
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Guertho Lemorin
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brandon Roldan
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Henry Barentine
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark C. Eure
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rayo Emmiito Robinson
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Calvert
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bryan James Pratt
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joel Castaneda-Dominguez
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George A. Tapia
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Curtis Ryals
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Scott Davis
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Blane Arthur
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeffrey S. Torsrud
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Norrek McCarty
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gail Marie Hess
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Noel Ramirez
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Byron Huffin
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Anthony Morris
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Pusateri
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Perry A. Deeke
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William James Petty, Jr.
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles Shackelford
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Michael Cullity
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nicholas Brown
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Douglas Allen Elbon
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jasbir Singh, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Allen Jones
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Andrew Pertle
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kevin L. Maehrer
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roman Stelter
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Samuel Ray McMillian
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Represented By: Thomas N. Sweeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Joseph L. Messa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |