Catherine Wang Anderson v. State of Nebraska, et al
Defendant: Amanda Gurock, Sarita Ruma, Amy Schuchman, Janine F. Ucchino, Douglas Weinberg, Alegent Creighton Clinic, John Does, 1-15, Martin Harrington, M.D., Michael Vance, Camas Steuter, Shashi Bhatia, M.B.B.S., Mercedes Brown, Elizabeth Crnkovich, Courtney Phillips, Judy McAuliffe-Treinen, Tina Anderson, Kersten Borer, Christina Johnson-Gunn, Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C., Lisa A. Johnson, Childrens Hospital and Medical Center, Kara Beals and Komi Amededji
Defendant / Appellee: Nebraska Families Collaborative, Nicole Paul, Sonia Derr, Chad A. Miller, Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc., Papillion LaVista Community Schools, Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, Project Harmony, Melissa Nance, Anne Petzel, Christian Heritage Children's Home, Carla Heathershaw-Risko, Gregory Tiemann, Nancy E. Parke, Anna Richardson, County of Douglas, David Newell, State of Nebraska, Brenda Wheeler, Suzanne Haney, M.D., Jennice Reid-Hansen, KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska, Inc., Sara Smith, Jennifer White, Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc., Mark Gentile, Evan Winans, Deanna "Nina" Sheller, Tyler Hansen, Jennifer Richey, Millard Public Schools, Daniel Little, Matthew Heys, Susan Hancock and Susan Boyles
Plaintiff / Appellant: Catherine Yang Wang Anderson
Case Number: 20-2751
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Daniel Little, Melissa Nance, Nebraska Families Collaborative, David Newell, Nicole Paul, Anne Petzel, Anna Richardson, Jennifer Richey, Deanna "Nina" Sheller, Sara Smith and Evan Winans. w/service 10/01/2020 [4961639] [20-2751] (DHK) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:16 PM]
September 30, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Granting in Part [ # 4960892-3 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joshua D. Barber. Brief of Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 10/30/2020. Appendix due on 10/30/2020. [4961048] [20-2751] (HAG) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:41 AM]
September 29, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/30/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 09/29/2020. [4960892] [20-2751]--[Edited to revise dkt txt 09/30/2020 by HAG] (JDB) [Entered: 09/29/2020 06:55 PM]
September 19, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson. w/service 09/19/2020 [4957512] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/19/2020 01:58 PM]
September 18, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Sonia Derr should be included as an appellee to this matter. [4957450] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:57 PM]
September 18, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Upon further review, it was determined the following parties should not have been included as appellees at case opening: Sonia Derr, Courtney Phillips, Douglas Weinberg, Camas Steutter, Judy McAuliffe-Treinen, Amanda Gurock, Komi Amededji, Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.c., Martin Harrington, MD, Kara Beals, Children's Hospital and Medical Center, Sarita Ruma, Michael Vance. [4957381] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:58 PM]
September 16, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Ryan S. Post for Appellees Carla Heathershaw-Risko, Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, State of Nebraska and Jennifer White w/service 09/16/2020 [4956585] [20-2751] (RP) [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:31 PM]
September 4, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/04/2020 [4952573] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:35 AM]
September 3, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson. No Transcript[4952545] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:17 PM]
September 3, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson - w/service 09/03/2020. [4952544] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:05 PM]
September 2, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4952014] [20-2751] (JAM) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:35 PM]
September 2, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by John A. McWilliams for Appellees Susan Boyles and Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc. w/service 09/02/2020 [4952008] [20-2751] (JAM) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:32 PM]
August 31, 2020 LETTER from Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson regarding designation of appellees in this matter. w/service 08/31/2020 [4950871] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:47 AM]
August 27, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C.. - FOR CAL [4950126] [20-2751] (SGO) [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:59 PM]
August 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen G. Olson, II for Appellees Komi Amededji, Amanda Gurock, Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C. and Judy McAuliffe-Treinen w/service 08/27/2020 [4949964] [20-2751] (SGO) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:31 AM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska. - FOR CAL [4949662] [20-2751] (CT) [Entered: 08/26/2020 02:43 PM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Papillion LaVista Community Schools. - FOR CAL [4949432] [20-2751] (CLB) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:00 AM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4949397] [20-2751] (MSW) [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:20 AM]
August 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Schmidt for Not Party Tina Anderson w/service 08/26/2020 [4949393] [20-2751] (CMS) [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:06 AM]
August 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Randall L. Goyette for Not Party Tina Anderson w/service 08/26/2020 [4949390] [20-2751] (RLG) [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:04 AM]
August 25, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Patrick G. Vipond for Appellees Childrens Hospital and Medical Center, Suzanne Haney, Martin Harrington, Michael Vance, Kara Beals and Sarita Ruma w/service 08/25/2020 [4949248] [20-2751] (PGV) [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:39 PM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Nebraska Families Collaborative. - FOR CAL [4949217] [20-2751] (DHK) [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:06 PM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Childrens Hospital and Medical Center. - FOR CAL [4949107] [20-2751] (SMD) [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:56 PM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Susan Hancock, Matthew Heys, Millard Public Schools and Gregory Tiemann. - FOR CAL [4948974] [20-2751] (DAY) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:10 AM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Project Harmony. - FOR CAL [4948867] [20-2751] (MBR) [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:35 AM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Christian Heritage Children's Home. - FOR CAL [4948864] [20-2751] (MBR) [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:34 AM]
August 25, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Dan H. Ketcham for Appellees Melissa Nance, Nebraska Families Collaborative, David Newell, Nicole Paul, Anne Petzel, Anna Richardson, Jennifer Richey, Deanna Nina Sheller, Sara Smith, Evan Winans and Daniel Little w/service 08/25/2020 [4948860] [20-2751] (DHK) [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:31 AM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Duncan A. Young for Appellees Susan Hancock, Matthew Heys, Millard Public Schools and Gregory Tiemann w/service 08/24/2020 [4948736] [20-2751] (DAY) [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:23 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Carly L. Bahramzad for Appellee Papillion LaVista Community Schools w/service 08/24/2020 [4948731] [20-2751] (CLB) [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:20 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Sarah M. Dempsey for Appellees Childrens Hospital and Medical Center, Suzanne Haney, Martin Harrington, Michael Vance, Kara Beals and Sarita Ruma w/service 08/24/2020 [4948606] [20-2751] (SMD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:49 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Brien M. Welch for Appellees Susan Boyles and Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc. w/service 08/24/2020 [4948551] [20-2751] (BMW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:10 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Kathryn J. Cheatle for Appellees Susan Boyles and Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc. w/service 08/24/2020 [4948543] [20-2751] (KJC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:03 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Catherine L. Stegman for Not Party Shashi Bhatia and Alegent Clinic w/service 08/24/2020 [4948515] [20-2751] (CLS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:42 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Charles E. Wilbrand for Appellee Papillion LaVista Community Schools w/service 08/24/2020 [4948509] [20-2751] (CEW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:39 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Matthew B. Reilly for Appellees Christian Heritage Children's Home and Project Harmony w/service 08/24/2020 [4948505] [20-2751] (MBR) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:34 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy K. Dolan for Appellees County of Douglas, Mark Gentile, Chad A. Miller and Ms. Brenda Wheeler w/service 08/24/2020 [4948366] [20-2751] (TKD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:55 AM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Megan S. Wright for Appellees Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc. and Nancy E. Parke w/service 08/24/2020 [4948237] [20-2751] (MSW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:32 AM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy K. Dolan for Appellees Ms. Brenda Wheeler, Chad A. Miller, Mark Gentile, County of Douglas and Not Party Amy Schuchman w/service 08/24/2020 **LOCKED - Counsel to refile w/o A. Schuchman listed** [4948194] [20-2751]--[Edited to indicate locked 08/24/2020 by HAG] (TKD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:53 AM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Cathy S. Trent-Vilim for Appellee KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska w/service 08/24/2020 [4948168] [20-2751] (CT) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:22 AM]
August 24, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios for Appellees Tyler Hansen and Jennice Reid-Hansen w/service 08/24/2020 [4948137] [20-2751] (MJW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:02 AM]
August 21, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 08/21/2020 [4948054] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:29 PM]
August 21, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 09/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4948018] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:12 PM]
August 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order and Findings and Recommendation 6/15/20, Memorandum and Order 7/21/20, Judgment 7/21/20, docket entries, [4948014] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:10 PM]
August 21, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4947997] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Catherine Wang Anderson v. State of Nebraska, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nebraska Families Collaborative
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicole Paul
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sonia Derr
Represented By: Barry S. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chad A. Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Chrystal-Clark
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Megan S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Papillion LaVista Community Schools
Represented By: Carly L. Bahramzad
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Represented By: Charles Edward Wilbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Danielle Rowley
Represented By: Ryan Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Project Harmony
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Melissa Nance
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anne Petzel
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christian Heritage Children's Home
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carla Heathershaw-Risko
Represented By: Danielle Rowley
Represented By: Ryan Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Tiemann
Represented By: Duncan Alexander Young Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy E. Parke
Represented By: Megan S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anna Richardson
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: County of Douglas
Represented By: Jennifer Chrystal-Clark
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Newell
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Danielle Rowley
Represented By: Ryan Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brenda Wheeler
Represented By: Jennifer Chrystal-Clark
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Suzanne Haney, M.D.
Represented By: Sarah M. Dempsey
Represented By: Patrick G. Vipond I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennice Reid-Hansen
Represented By: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska, Inc.
Represented By: Cathy Trent-Vilim
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sara Smith
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer White
Represented By: Danielle Rowley
Represented By: Ryan Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc.
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Brien McLeod Welch
Represented By: Kathryn Joyce Cheatle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Gentile
Represented By: Jennifer Chrystal-Clark
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Evan Winans
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deanna "Nina" Sheller
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tyler Hansen
Represented By: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer Richey
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Millard Public Schools
Represented By: Duncan Alexander Young Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Little
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Alberto Hernandez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matthew Heys
Represented By: Duncan Alexander Young Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Hancock
Represented By: Duncan Alexander Young Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Boyles
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Brien McLeod Welch
Represented By: Kathryn Joyce Cheatle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gurock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarita Ruma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Schuchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine F. Ucchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alegent Creighton Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Harrington, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camas Steuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shashi Bhatia, M.B.B.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Crnkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy McAuliffe-Treinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kersten Borer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Johnson-Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childrens Hospital and Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Beals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komi Amededji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Catherine Yang Wang Anderson
Represented By: Joshua D. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?