R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al v. City of Edina, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Scott Neal, in his official capacity as City Manager of the City of Edina, Edina City Council and City of Edina
Plaintiff / Appellant: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., doing business as Vernon BP and Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., doing business as Lang's One Stop Market
Case Number: 20-2852
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Paper copies [ # 4970738-2 ], Addendum filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. 10 paper copies received. [4971293] [20-2852] (BNW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:53 AM]
October 30, 2020 Paper copies Appellants Brief, [ # 4970737-2 ] filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. 10 paper copies received. [4971291] [20-2852] (BNW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:52 AM]
October 30, 2020 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes. Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies. [4971290] [20-2852] (BNW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:51 AM]
October 29, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., w/service 10/29/2020. [4970738] [20-2852] (HAG) [Entered: 10/29/2020 08:27 AM]
October 29, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., w/service 10/29/2020. Length: 12,960 words . 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. due 11/03/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of City of Edina, Edina City Council and Scott Neal due on 11/30/2020. [4970737] [20-2852] (HAG) [Entered: 10/29/2020 08:25 AM]
October 28, 2020 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Christian G. Vergonis for Appellants R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, American Snuff Company, LLC, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II, Inc. and Lang's Automotive Service, Inc.. New electronic copy of addendum due on 11/02/2020. [4970569] [20-2852] (HAG) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:26 PM]
October 28, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4970551] [20-2852] (CGV) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:07 PM]
October 28, 2020 APPELLANT brief of American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4970549] [20-2852] (CGV) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:06 PM]
October 27, 2020 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Christian G. Vergonis for Appellants R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, American Snuff Company, LLC, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II, Inc. and Lang's Automotive Service, Inc.. [4970179] [20-2852] (BNW) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:59 PM]
October 26, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4969658] [20-2852] --[Edited 10/27/2020 by BNW] DOCUMENT LOCKED. ATTORNEY WILL RESUBMIT ADDENDUM WITH STATUTES ATTACHED. (CGV) [Entered: 10/26/2020 04:30 PM]
October 26, 2020 APPELLANT brief of American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4969655] [20-2852] (CGV) [Entered: 10/26/2020 04:28 PM]
September 18, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. Transcript ordered[4957156] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:56 AM]
September 18, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/18/2020 [4957153] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:54 AM]
September 15, 2020 RESPONSE with no opposition to Court Record [4953774-2] filed by Ms. Shana Nicole Conklin for Appellees City of Edina, Edina City Council and Mr. Scott Neal and Mr. David S. Kendall for Appellees City of Edina, Edina City Council and Mr. Scott Neal , w/service 09/15/2020. **LOCKED - Doc to be filed in DC** [4955712] [20-2852]--[Edited to indicate locked 09/15/2020 by HAG] (DSK) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:03 AM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Lang's Automotive Service, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4953985] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:04 PM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Cousins II, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4953983] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:03 PM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4953982] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:02 PM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant American Snuff Company, LLC. - FOR CAL [4953981] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:01 PM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. - FOR CAL [4953979] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:00 PM]
September 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. - FOR CAL [4953973] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/09/2020 02:56 PM]
September 9, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Shana N. Conklin for Appellees City of Edina, Edina City Council and Mr. Scott Neal w/service 09/09/2020 [4953873] [20-2852] (SNC) [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:44 PM]
September 9, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #53 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/20/2020, No. of Pgs.: 81, Court Reporter: Beauvais, Debra [4953774] [20-2852] (STL) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:23 AM]
September 9, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by David S. Kendall for Appellees City of Edina, Edina City Council and Mr. Scott Neal w/service 09/09/2020 [4953762] [20-2852] (DSK) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:12 AM]
September 4, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Lisa L. Beane for Appellants American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. w/service 09/04/2020 [4952948] [20-2852] (LLB) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:36 PM]
September 4, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Ryan J. Watson for Appellants American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. w/service 09/04/2020 [4952943] [20-2852] (RJW) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:34 PM]
September 4, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/14/2020. Appendix due 10/26/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II, Inc., Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. due 10/26/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4952747] [20-2852] (CBO) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:08 PM]
September 4, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order filed 8/31/2020, judgment filed 8/31/2020, and notice of appeal filed 9/3/2020. [4952745] [20-2852] (CBO) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:06 PM]
September 4, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4952741] [20-2852] (CBO) [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al v. City of Edina, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Neal, in his official capacity as City Manager of the City of Edina
Represented By: David S. Kendall
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edina City Council
Represented By: David S. Kendall
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Edina
Represented By: David S. Kendall
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: American Snuff Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cousins II, Inc., doing business as Vernon BP
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lang's Automotive Service, Inc., doing business as Lang's One Stop Market
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Represented By: Christian G. Vergonis
Represented By: Andrew J. M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?