ORG for Black Struggle, et al v. John Ashcroft
Defendant: Greene County Clerk's Office, St. Charles County Election Authority, Jackson County Election Board and St. Louis County Election Board
Plaintiff / Appellee: Missouri Faith Voices, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute, National Council of Jewish Women, St. Louis, Organization for Black Struggle and Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Defendant / Appellant: John R. Ashcroft, in his official capacity as Missouri Secretary of State
Amicus Curiae: AARP Foundation and AARP
Case Number: 20-3121
Filed: October 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 23, 2020 Summary Organization for Black Struggle v. Ashcroft

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4964615-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Anthony E. Rothert for Appellees Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women, Organization for Black Struggle and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute , w/service 10/12/2020. [4964628] [20-3121] (AER) [Entered: 10/12/2020 10:03 PM]
October 12, 2020 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Dean John Sauer for Appellant Mr. John R. Ashcroft w/service 10/12/2020. [4964615] [20-3121] (DJS) [Entered: 10/12/2020 02:48 PM]
October 11, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 10/9/20, and Docket Text Order dated 10/10/20. [4964582] [20-3121] (EDG) [Entered: 10/11/2020 10:59 AM]
October 11, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4964581] [20-3121] (EDG) [Entered: 10/11/2020 10:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: ORG for Black Struggle, et al v. John Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Election Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Election Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Election Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Missouri Faith Voices
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: National Council of Jewish Women, St. Louis
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Organization for Black Struggle
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John R. Ashcroft, in his official capacity as Missouri Secretary of State
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?