Ricky Ashley v. Ruth Ginsburg, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Does, All Active U.S. District Court Judges, Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas, Jane Kelly, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Sonia Sotomayor, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Samuel A. Alito, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Elena Kagan, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Duane Benton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, J Thomas Ray, United States Magistrate Judge, Ralph R. Erickson, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Gary M. Arnold, Saline County Circuit Judge, Neil M. Gorsuch, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Brett M. Kavanaugh, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Lavenski R. Smith, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Raymond W. Gruender, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Lee P. Rudofsky, United States District Judge, Steven M. Colloton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Stephen G. Breyer, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Jonathan A. Kobes, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, James B. Loken, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Clarence Thomas, U.S. Supreme Court Justice, John G. Roberts, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court Justice, Roger L. Wollman, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge, Ruth Bader Ginsburg, U.S. Supreme Court Justice and Susan Webber Wright, U.S. District Court Judge
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ricky Ashley
Case Number: 20-3558
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Ricky Ashley due 02/03/2021. [4996048] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 01/20/2021 12:26 PM]
January 20, 2021 CLERK ORDER: Appellant's motion for summary judgment [ # 4987272-2 ], the motion for transfer to any other appellate court of competent jurisdiction [ # 4989887-3 ] are hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4996047] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 01/20/2021 12:20 PM]
December 30, 2020 MOTION for transfer to any other appellate court of competent jurisdiction, And RESPONSE in objection to clerk order case proceeding on of (need file) , [ # 4983319-2 ], issued on 12/8/2020 requesting original file of district court filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley w/service 12/30/2020. [4989887] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:55 PM]
December 21, 2020 CLERK LETTER sent regarding to Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley regarding using the correct caption and acase number on all future filing with this court. [4987281] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:38 PM]
December 21, 2020 MOTION for entry of Summary Judgment.under Rule 56(a), filed by Appellant Mr. Ricky Ashley in 20-3544, 20-3558 w/service 12/21/2020. [4987272] [20-3544, 20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:28 PM]
December 17, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - copies of miscellaneous district court documents filed by Mr. Ricky Ashley w/service 12/18/2020. [4986361] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:30 AM]
December 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4983319] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:29 PM]
December 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 01/07/2021. [4983317] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:27 PM]
December 8, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 12/7/2020. [4983313] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:24 PM]
December 8, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4983309] [20-3558] (CMH) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Ashley v. Ruth Ginsburg, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, All Active U.S. District Court Judges, Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Kelly, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sonia Sotomayor, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel A. Alito, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elena Kagan, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Duane Benton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J Thomas Ray, United States Magistrate Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ralph R. Erickson, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gary M. Arnold, Saline County Circuit Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Neil M. Gorsuch, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brett M. Kavanaugh, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lavenski R. Smith, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raymond W. Gruender, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lee P. Rudofsky, United States District Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven M. Colloton, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen G. Breyer, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan A. Kobes, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James B. Loken, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clarence Thomas, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John G. Roberts, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roger L. Wollman, Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruth Bader Ginsburg, U.S. Supreme Court Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Webber Wright, U.S. District Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ricky Ashley
Represented By: Ricky Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?