Best Academy, et al v. Hanover Insurance Group, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Mastery School, Inc., a Minnesota non-profit corporation and Best Academy, a Minnesota non-profit corporation, individually and as a successor in interest to Harvest Preparatory Charter School, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and The Hanover Insurance Group
Case Number: 20-3560
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4999517-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert. Brief of Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company due 02/16/2021. Appendix due on 02/16/2021. [4999564] [20-3560] (HAG) [Entered: 01/29/2021 03:16 PM]
January 29, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/16/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert for Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company w/service 01/29/2021. [4999517] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:05 PM]
January 13, 2021 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4992919-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert. Brief of Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company due 02/02/2021. Appendix due on 02/02/2021. [4994056] [20-3560] (HAG) [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:51 PM]
January 13, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert for Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company correcting [ # 4992919-2 ] motion filed by Attorney. [4994021] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:25 PM]
January 13, 2021 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 4992919-2 ], submitted by Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert in 20-3560, pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion. [20-3560] (HAG) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:16 AM]
January 11, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/02/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Joel Timothy Wiegert for Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company w/service 01/11/2021. [4992919] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:59 AM]
December 23, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/23/2020 [4988117] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:35 PM]
December 23, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. No Transcript[4988082] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 11:52 AM]
December 11, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Mastery School, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4984445] [20-3560] (KRH) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:02 PM]
December 11, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [4984424] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:29 PM]
December 11, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Hanover Insurance Group. - FOR CAL [4984421] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:27 PM]
December 11, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Joel T. Wiegert for Appellants Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company w/service 12/11/2020 [4984409] [20-3560] (JTW) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:15 PM]
December 11, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Best Academy. - FOR CAL [4984404] [20-3560] (SES) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:11 PM]
December 11, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Aalok K. Sharma for Appellee Best Academy w/service 12/11/2020 [4984399] [20-3560] (SES) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:09 PM]
December 11, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen E. Schemenauer for Appellee Best Academy w/service 12/11/2020 [4984397] [20-3560] (SES) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:06 PM]
December 9, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Kyle R. Hardwick for Appellee Mastery School, Inc. w/service 12/09/2020 [4983692] [20-3560] (KRH) [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:49 PM]
December 9, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/19/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Hanover Insurance Group and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company due 01/19/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4983399] [20-3560] (CYZ) [Entered: 12/09/2020 09:32 AM]
December 9, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 8/14/2020, judgment of 11/23/2020 [4983398] [20-3560] (CYZ) [Entered: 12/09/2020 09:30 AM]
December 9, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4983395] [20-3560] (CYZ) [Entered: 12/09/2020 09:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Best Academy, et al v. Hanover Insurance Group, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mastery School, Inc., a Minnesota non-profit corporation
Represented By: Kyle Roberts Hardwick
Represented By: Brian J. Linnerooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Best Academy, a Minnesota non-profit corporation, individually and as a successor in interest to Harvest Preparatory Charter School, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. Schemenauer
Represented By: Aalok K. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Joel Timothy Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: The Hanover Insurance Group
Represented By: Joel Timothy Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?