Alberto Hernandez v. William P. Barr
Petitioner: Alberto Dominguez Hernandez
Respondent: William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 20-3575
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Administrative Record due 01/25/2021. Appendix due on 02/08/2021. Brief of Alberto Dominguez Hernandez due on 02/08/2021. Responsive brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief.[4985067] [20-3575] (MMH) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:16 AM]
December 14, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Rachel P. Berman-Vaporis for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr w/service 12/14/2020 [4984490] [20-3575] (RB) [Entered: 12/14/2020 07:55 AM]
December 11, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Brian J. Blackford for Petitioner Alberto Dominguez Hernandez w/service 12/11/2020 [4984476] [20-3575] (BJB) [Entered: 12/11/2020 09:48 PM]
December 11, 2020 FEE PAID FOR PETITION FOR REVIEW/ENFORCEMENT - Fee Amount: $500.00 Receipt Number: A08-31983-59. by Mr. Brian J. Blackford for Alberto Dominguez Hernandez [4984470] [20-3575] (BJB) [Entered: 12/11/2020 05:04 PM]
December 10, 2020 PETITION for Review of an order of the Board of Immigration Appeals (Electronic) filed by Petitioner Alberto Dominguez Hernandez w/service 12/10/2020 [4984319] [20-3575] (MMH) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:42 PM]
December 10, 2020 Agency case docketed [4984317] [20-3575] (MMH) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alberto Hernandez v. William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Peter B. Berg
Represented By: Oil Oil
Represented By: Carl H. McIntyre
Represented By: Rachel Berman-Vaporis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alberto Dominguez Hernandez
Represented By: Brian J. Blackford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?