Jorge Abascal, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Gregory Stone, Ronnie Whitehead, Dennis Lietzow, Thomas Shoemake, Ryan Bezick, Mark Nate, Justin Dunlap, David Barker, Jamey Brown, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Destin Lawler, Joshua Domanek, Charles Parrish, Robert Arnett, Jorge Abascal, Tony Lewis, Robert Hopkins, Kyle Lindeman, John Mclain, Lamar Islar, Mitchell Alvarado, Randy Watts, Joseph Boudreaux, Steve Andrews, Timmithy Chapman, Aaron Willis, Sheila Barry, Melvin Hanneman, Anthony Mancabelli, Terry Bailey, William Bowman, Dan Fuller, William Dees, Monroe Kemmerling, Eric Risdal, Jeff Bowman, Jon Rider, Michael Wofford, Pedro Lozano, Denver Sizemore, Joshua Ford, Darrell Barclay, Tim Turner, Artie Peavler, Dan Biddle, Rex Pendergrass, Kiajuana Beasley, Jerry Carpenter, Cary Wilson, Richard Ferguson, Jon Hart, Andrew Wolfe, Carlos Gordian, Thomas Williams, Donald Bunker, Rafael Rico, Jeremy Clayton, Michael Root, Michael Bell, Kenneth Clubine, Paul Johnson, Antonio Wyche, Gary Duke, David Romish, Jeffrey Reynolds, Walter Hartman, Robert Granat, Mike McClamrock, Scott Hambly, Rossel Ulloa, Dave Hoefke, Richard Harper, Stanley Sanders, Richard Roy, Zachariah Cornette, Bradley Parker, Michael Eskridge, Chandler Byrd, Mark Elmore, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Danny Alsobrooks, Aaron Petry, Paul Gates, Shone Curole, Jarom Reeves, Scott Mcpherson, David Birch, Jacob Ethridge, Kyle Beier, Manuel Moreno, Darryl Brandon and Jose Garza
Defendant / Appellant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 20-3614
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 CLERK LETTER from Clerk of Court sent regarding holding briefing in abeyance. [5003383] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (MMH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:07 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993922] [20-3614] (JB) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:02 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993844] [20-3614] (AC) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:21 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993807] [20-3614] (BWH) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:45 AM]
January 7, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Jorge Abascal, Danny Alsobrooks, Mitchell Alvarado, Steve Andrews, Robert Arnett, Terry Bailey, Darrell Barclay, David Barker, Sheila Barry, Kiajuana Beasley, Kyle Beier, Michael Bell, Ryan Bezick, Dan Biddle, David Birch, Joseph Boudreaux, Jeff Bowman, William Bowman, Darryl Brandon, Jamey Brown, Donald Bunker, Chandler Byrd, Jerry Carpenter, Timmithy Chapman, Jeremy Clayton, Kenneth Clubine, Zachariah Cornette, Shone Curole, William Dees, Joshua Domanek, Gary Duke, Justin Dunlap, Mark Elmore, Michael Eskridge, Jacob Ethridge, Richard Ferguson, Joshua Ford, Dan Fuller, Jose Garza, Paul Gates, Carlos Gordian, Robert Granat, Josh Green, Tim Greshik, Zachery Griffin, William Guerrero-Pena, Scott Hambly, Melvin Hanneman, Richard Harper, Jon Hart, Walter Hartman, Dave Hoefke, Robert Hopkins, Lamar Islar, Paul Johnson, Monroe Kemmerling, Destin Lawler, Tony Lewis, Dennis Lietzow, Kyle Lindeman, Pedro Lozano, Anthony Mancabelli, Mike McClamrock, John Mclain, Scott Mcpherson, Manuel Moreno, Mark Nate, Bradley Parker, Charles Parrish, Artie Peavler, Rex Pendergrass, Aaron Petry, Jarom Reeves, Jeffrey Reynolds, Rafael Rico, Jon Rider, Eric Risdal, David Romish, Michael Root, Richard Roy, Stanley Sanders, Thomas Shoemake, Denver Sizemore, Gregory Stone, Tim Turner, Rossel Ulloa, Randy Watts, Ronnie Whitehead, Thomas Williams, Aaron Willis, Cary Wilson, Michael Wofford, Andrew Wolfe and Antonio Wyche w/service 01/07/2021 [4992078] [20-3614] (DEG) [Entered: 01/07/2021 01:30 PM]
December 28, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. No Transcript[4988810] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:36 PM]
December 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant 3M Company in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. - FOR CAL [4988808] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:34 PM]
December 28, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649 - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/28/2020 [4988803] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:31 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #27 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01933-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988275] [20-3649, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:05 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #31 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01757-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988272] [20-3645, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:59 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01747-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988260] [20-3644, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01763-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988249] [20-3648, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:48 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #33 (District Court case 0:20-CV-1772-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988241] [20-3613, 20-3607, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:44 PM]
December 22, 2020 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/01/2021. Appendix due 02/10/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 02/10/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4987532] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:44 AM]
December 22, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4987498] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:06 AM]
December 17, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 12/4/20 [4986032] [20-3614] (MMH) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jorge Abascal, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gregory Stone
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronnie Whitehead
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dennis Lietzow
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas Shoemake
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ryan Bezick
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mark Nate
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Justin Dunlap
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Barker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jamey Brown
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Zachery Griffin
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Guerrero-Pena
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Destin Lawler
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joshua Domanek
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Parrish
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Arnett
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jorge Abascal
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tony Lewis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Hopkins
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kyle Lindeman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Mclain
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lamar Islar
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mitchell Alvarado
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Randy Watts
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joseph Boudreaux
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steve Andrews
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Timmithy Chapman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aaron Willis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sheila Barry
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melvin Hanneman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Mancabelli
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Terry Bailey
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Bowman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dan Fuller
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Dees
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Monroe Kemmerling
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Risdal
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeff Bowman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jon Rider
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Wofford
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pedro Lozano
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Denver Sizemore
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joshua Ford
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darrell Barclay
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tim Turner
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Artie Peavler
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dan Biddle
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rex Pendergrass
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kiajuana Beasley
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jerry Carpenter
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cary Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Ferguson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jon Hart
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Andrew Wolfe
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carlos Gordian
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald Bunker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rafael Rico
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeremy Clayton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Root
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Bell
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenneth Clubine
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Antonio Wyche
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gary Duke
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Romish
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeffrey Reynolds
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Walter Hartman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Granat
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mike McClamrock
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Hambly
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rossel Ulloa
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dave Hoefke
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Harper
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stanley Sanders
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Roy
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Zachariah Cornette
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bradley Parker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Eskridge
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chandler Byrd
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mark Elmore
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Josh Green
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tim Greshik
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Danny Alsobrooks
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aaron Petry
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paul Gates
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shone Curole
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jarom Reeves
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Mcpherson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Birch
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jacob Ethridge
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kyle Beier
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Manuel Moreno
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darryl Brandon
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jose Garza
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M Company
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris A. Rashid
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?