Robbie Amburgey, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Jesse Spears, Thomas Williams, Ronald Carmouche, Victor Salinas, Nathan Tuner, Robbie Amburgey, Scott Cooper, Dennis Clark, Arthur Henry, Jerry Myers, Kenneth Jennings, Charles Johnson, Donnie Norman, Joseph Krumeich, Manuel Rodriguez, James Wylie, Scott Taylor, Eduardo Salazar, Thaddeus Joyner, Zachary Solis, Richard Gillian, Chris Olvera, Scott Sonnier, Daniel Lopez, Howard Feather, Jeremey Byfield, Dennis Sheppard, James Partridge, Anthony Dibenedetto, Logan Luecht, Kris Satterfield and Meredith Smith
Defendant / Appellant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 20-3634
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317 - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/16/2021 [5004680] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:29 AM]
February 16, 2021 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317. No Transcript[5004688] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:33 AM]
February 16, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317. - FOR CAL [5004677] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:26 AM]
February 10, 2021 CLERK LETTER from Clerk of Court sent regarding holding briefing in abeyance. [5003383] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (MMH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:07 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993819] [20-3634] (BWH) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:58 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993858] [20-3634] (AC) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:30 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993941] [20-3634] (JB) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:11 AM]
January 7, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Robbie Amburgey, Jeremey Byfield, Ronald Carmouche, Dennis Clark, Scott Cooper, Anthony Dibenedetto, Howard Feather, Richard Gillian, Arthur Henry, Kenneth Jennings, Charles Johnson, Thaddeus Joyner, Joseph Krumeich, Daniel Lopez, Logan Luecht, Jerry Myers, Donnie Norman, Chris Olvera, James Partridge, Manuel Rodriguez, Eduardo Salazar, Victor Salinas, Kris Satterfield, Dennis Sheppard, Meredith Smith, Zachary Solis, Scott Sonnier, Jesse Spears, Scott Taylor, Nathan Tuner, Thomas Williams and James Wylie w/service 01/07/2021 [4992089] [20-3634] (DEG) [Entered: 01/07/2021 01:41 PM]
December 28, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. No Transcript[4988810] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:36 PM]
December 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant 3M Company in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. - FOR CAL [4988808] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:34 PM]
December 28, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649 - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/28/2020 [4988803] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:31 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #33 (District Court case 0:20-CV-1772-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988241] [20-3613, 20-3607, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:44 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01763-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988249] [20-3648, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:48 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01747-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988260] [20-3644, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #31 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01757-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988272] [20-3645, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:59 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #27 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01933-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988275] [20-3649, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:05 PM]
December 22, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4987498] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:06 AM]
December 22, 2020 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/01/2021. Appendix due 02/10/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 02/10/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4987532] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:44 AM]
December 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 12/3/20 [4986879] [20-3634] (MMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robbie Amburgey, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jesse Spears
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronald Carmouche
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Victor Salinas
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nathan Tuner
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robbie Amburgey
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Cooper
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dennis Clark
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Arthur Henry
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jerry Myers
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenneth Jennings
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donnie Norman
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joseph Krumeich
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Manuel Rodriguez
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Wylie
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Taylor
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eduardo Salazar
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thaddeus Joyner
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Zachary Solis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Gillian
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chris Olvera
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Sonnier
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Howard Feather
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeremey Byfield
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dennis Sheppard
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Partridge
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Dibenedetto
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Logan Luecht
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kris Satterfield
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Meredith Smith
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M Company
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris A. Rashid
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?