Curtis Abbott, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: John Buzbee, Timothy Urtz, Christopher Sovey, Jason Wilson, Tommy Garcia, Stephen Bergeron, Kyle George, Brian Carroll, Chad Langlois, Eric Gibson, Essie Ross, Ronald LeBlanc, Greg Hamm, Christopher Shepherd, Leequinace Turner, Kip Corrigan, Allen Mier, Josh Bohnenkamp, Steve Strouts, Jason Parsons, Kyle Bond, Elisabeth Knuth, Wesley Dallas, David Hurley, Curtis Abbott, Jason Hansen, Otha Johnson, Colleen Patta, Edward Short, Peter Jensen, Leonidas Gialousis, William Walker, Jacob Theriot, Lizanne Baxter, William Hamilton, Richard Hines, Randy Vasquez, Alvin Gill, Mark Kamerzell, John Efird, Stephen Barron, Anthony Schrader, Larry Young, Olan Lowry, Jeffery Slade, Jon Hatten, Andrew McGraw, James Haskell, Stanley Lee, Robert Kurpius, Shonna Bizzell, John Jones, David Lewis, James Franks, Kelly Sutherland, Irvin Fulks, Dennis McPherson, Chad Dunlap, Patrick Keyes, Ricky Mize, Michael Marcel, Jeremy Gibson, Eric Della Bartolomea, Kenneth Benson, Emede Chavera, James Burger, Dustin Collins, Herman Compton, Gerald Matthews, Jason Davis, Paul James, Stacey Manley, Nicholas Sinko, Chance Hansen, Darrell Thompson, Rosendo Mendoza, William Byrd, Nora Clutter, Jason Burchick, Kevin Flynn, Paul Nielsen, Ronnie Dale, Jessica Lawson, John Stacey, II, Bobby Yarber, Carlos Burciaga, David Curyea, John Kokenge, Louis Basilicata, Phillip Walker, James Watson, Russell Yost, Charles Ballard, Valentino Salinas and Jeffrey Ravenscraft
Defendant / Appellant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 20-3636
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317. No Transcript[5004688] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:33 AM]
February 16, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317 - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/16/2021 [5004680] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:29 AM]
February 16, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317. - FOR CAL [5004677] [21-1307, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (AC) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:26 AM]
February 10, 2021 CLERK LETTER from Clerk of Court sent regarding holding briefing in abeyance. [5003383] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649, 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317] (MMH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:07 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993942] [20-3636] (JB) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:12 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993864] [20-3636] (AC) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:35 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 01/13/2021 [4993821] [20-3636] (BWH) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:00 AM]
January 7, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Curtis Abbott, Charles Ballard, Stephen Barron, Eric Della Bartolomea, Louis Basilicata, Lizanne Baxter, Kenneth Benson, Stephen Bergeron, Shonna Bizzell, Josh Bohnenkamp, Kyle Bond, Jason Burchick, Carlos Burciaga, James Burger, John Buzbee, William Byrd, Brian Carroll, Emede Chavera, Nora Clutter, Dustin Collins, Herman Compton, Kip Corrigan, David Curyea, Ronnie Dale, Wesley Dallas, Jason Davis, Chad Dunlap, John Efird, Kevin Flynn, James Franks, Irvin Fulks, Tommy Garcia, Kyle George, Leonidas Gialousis, Eric Gibson, Jeremy Gibson, Alvin Gill, William Hamilton, Greg Hamm, Chance Hansen, Jason Hansen, James Haskell, Jon Hatten, Richard Hines, David Hurley, Paul James, Peter Jensen, Otha Johnson, John Jones, Mark Kamerzell, Patrick Keyes, Elisabeth Knuth, John Kokenge, Robert Kurpius, Chad Langlois, Jessica Lawson, Ronald LeBlanc, Stanley Lee, David Lewis, Olan Lowry, Stacey Manley, Michael Marcel, Gerald Matthews, Andrew McGraw, Dennis McPherson, Rosendo Mendoza, Allen Mier, Ricky Mize, Paul Nielsen, Jason Parsons, Colleen Patta, Jeffrey Ravenscraft, Essie Ross, Valentino Salinas, Anthony Schrader, Christopher Shepherd, Edward Short, Nicholas Sinko, Jeffery Slade, Christopher Sovey, John Stacey, II, Steve Strouts, Kelly Sutherland, Jacob Theriot, Darrell Thompson, Leequinace Turner, Timothy Urtz, Randy Vasquez, Phillip Walker, William Walker, James Watson, Jason Wilson, Bobby Yarber, Russell Yost and Larry Young w/service 01/07/2021 [4992080] [20-3636] (DEG) [Entered: 01/07/2021 01:32 PM]
December 28, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. No Transcript[4988810] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:36 PM]
December 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant 3M Company in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649. - FOR CAL [4988808] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:34 PM]
December 28, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649 - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/28/2020 [4988803] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (AC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:31 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #27 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01933-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988275] [20-3649, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:05 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #31 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01757-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988272] [20-3645, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:59 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01747-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988260] [20-3644, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #32 (District Court case 0:20-CV-01763-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988249] [20-3648, 20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:48 PM]
December 23, 2020 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #33 (District Court case 0:20-CV-1772-JRT-KMM) [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/23/2020, No. of Pgs.: 24, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [4988241] [20-3613, 20-3607, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (STL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:44 PM]
December 22, 2020 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/01/2021. Appendix due 02/10/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 02/10/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4987532] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:44 AM]
December 22, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4987498] [20-3607, 20-3613, 20-3614, 20-3616, 20-3617, 20-3620, 20-3627, 20-3634, 20-3636, 20-3642, 20-3643, 20-3644, 20-3645, 20-3647, 20-3648, 20-3649] (MMH) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:06 AM]
December 21, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 12/4/20 [4987005] [20-3636] (MMH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 11:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Curtis Abbott, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Buzbee
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Timothy Urtz
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher Sovey
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tommy Garcia
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kyle George
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian Carroll
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chad Langlois
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Gibson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Essie Ross
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronald LeBlanc
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Greg Hamm
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher Shepherd
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Leequinace Turner
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kip Corrigan
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Allen Mier
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Josh Bohnenkamp
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steve Strouts
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Parsons
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kyle Bond
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elisabeth Knuth
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wesley Dallas
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Hurley
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Curtis Abbott
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Hansen
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Otha Johnson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Colleen Patta
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Edward Short
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter Jensen
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Leonidas Gialousis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Walker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jacob Theriot
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lizanne Baxter
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Hamilton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Hines
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Randy Vasquez
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alvin Gill
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mark Kamerzell
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Efird
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Barron
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Schrader
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Larry Young
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Olan Lowry
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeffery Slade
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jon Hatten
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Andrew McGraw
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Haskell
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stanley Lee
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Kurpius
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shonna Bizzell
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Jones
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Lewis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Franks
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kelly Sutherland
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Irvin Fulks
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dennis McPherson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chad Dunlap
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patrick Keyes
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ricky Mize
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Marcel
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeremy Gibson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Della Bartolomea
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenneth Benson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Emede Chavera
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Burger
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dustin Collins
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Herman Compton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gerald Matthews
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Davis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paul James
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stacey Manley
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nicholas Sinko
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chance Hansen
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darrell Thompson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rosendo Mendoza
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Byrd
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nora Clutter
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Burchick
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kevin Flynn
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paul Nielsen
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronnie Dale
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jessica Lawson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Stacey, II
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bobby Yarber
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carlos Burciaga
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Curyea
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Kokenge
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Louis Basilicata
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Phillip Walker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Watson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Russell Yost
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Ballard
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Valentino Salinas
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeffrey Ravenscraft
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M Company
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris A. Rashid
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?