Steven Hastings v. Alec Wilbur, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Steven Kozmur, Food Service Supervisor, NCU, Shawn Richard, Psychiatrist, Wellpath, Keith Day, Chief of Security, NCU, Lori Reaves, Mental Health Supervisor, Wellpath, Jeremy Wilson, Mental Health, Wellpath, Robert L. Pierce, Deputy Warden, NCU, Justin Nathaniel Peter, ADC Inmate Grievance Coordinator, NCU Law Library Supervisor, ADC North Central Unit, Rick Gillespie, Food Service, NCU, Ian W Ward, Sergeant, NCU, Marjorie Hall, Health Service Administrator, Wellpath, Tillman Treat, Food Service, NCU, Nurzuhal Faust, Warden, ADC North Central Unit, Andrew Schubert, Mental Health, Wellpath, Kimberly Brown, LPN, Wellpath, Reed D Marshall, Chief Deputy Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections, Steven R Puckett, Corporal, North Central Unit, Gary W Qucon, Sr., Sergeant, NCU, Kyle J Lebouef, Corporal, NCU, Marty Hearyman, Doctor, NCU, Alex Bentley, Head Food Supervisor, NCU, Alec J Wilbur, Corrections Sergeant, North Central Unit, Val Green, Food Service Supervisor, NCU and Gary W. Queen, Sr., Sergeant, NCU
Plaintiff / Appellant: Steven R. Hastings
Case Number: 20-3669
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 MEMORANDUM of Appellant Mr. Steven R. Hastings in support of motion for appointment of counsel filed by Mr. Steven R. Hastings in 20-3669 , Doc No. [ # 4997134-2 ], w/service 02/09/2021. [5002860] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:48 PM]
January 22, 2021 CLERK ORDER: Affidavit/Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Steven R. Hastings in 20-3669 , [ # 4997134-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL. [4997138] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:56 PM]
January 22, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 01/04/2021, Regarding Calculation and Collection of Appellate Filing Fees. [4997149] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:02 PM]
January 22, 2021 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 20-3669: plra] [4997150] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:03 PM]
January 22, 2021 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Steven R. Hastings, w/service 01/22/2021. [4997134] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:54 PM]
December 29, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Amanda Land for Appellees Mr. Steven R Puckett, Mr. Alec J Wilbur and Mr. Jeremy Wilson w/service 12/29/2020 [4989299] [20-3669] (AL) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:08 PM]
December 23, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 11/09/2020, Order 11/20/2020, and Order 12/18/2020. [4987967] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:07 AM]
December 23, 2020 CLERK ORDER:for limited remand This case is remanded to district court for calculation and collection of appellate filing fees pursuant to Henderson v. Norris, 129F.3d 418 (8th Cir. 1997). [4987996] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:35 AM]
December 23, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4988009] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:43 AM]
December 23, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4987953] [20-3669] (CJO) [Entered: 12/23/2020 09:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Hastings v. Alec Wilbur, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven Kozmur, Food Service Supervisor, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shawn Richard, Psychiatrist, Wellpath
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Day, Chief of Security, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lori Reaves, Mental Health Supervisor, Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeremy Wilson, Mental Health, Wellpath
Represented By: Amanda Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert L. Pierce, Deputy Warden, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Justin Nathaniel Peter, ADC Inmate Grievance Coordinator, NCU Law Library Supervisor, ADC North Central Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rick Gillespie, Food Service, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ian W Ward, Sergeant, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marjorie Hall, Health Service Administrator, Wellpath
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tillman Treat, Food Service, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nurzuhal Faust, Warden, ADC North Central Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Schubert, Mental Health, Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kimberly Brown, LPN, Wellpath
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Reed D Marshall, Chief Deputy Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven R Puckett, Corporal, North Central Unit
Represented By: Amanda Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gary W Qucon, Sr., Sergeant, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kyle J Lebouef, Corporal, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marty Hearyman, Doctor, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex Bentley, Head Food Supervisor, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alec J Wilbur, Corrections Sergeant, North Central Unit
Represented By: Amanda Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Val Green, Food Service Supervisor, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gary W. Queen, Sr., Sergeant, NCU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven R. Hastings
Represented By: Steven R. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?