Michael Faulk v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Brian Gonzales, Officer, in his individual capacity, City of St. Louis, Missouri, Robert Stuart, Officer, in his individual capacity, Gerald Leyshock, Col., in his individual capacity, John Gentilini, Officer, in his individual capacity, Anthony Wozniak, Sgt., in his individual capacity, James Wood, Officer, in his individual capacity, Scott Boyher, Lt., in his individual capacity, Brian Rossomanno, Sgt., in his individual capacity, James Harris, III, Officer, in his individual capacity, Timothy Sachs, Lt., in his individual capacity, Lawrence O'Toole, LT. COL., in his individual capacity, Matthew T. Karnowski, Sgt., in his individual capacity, Randy Jemerson, Sgt., in his individual capacity, Tom Long, Sgt., in his individual capacity, Andrew Wismar, Individual Capacity and Bryan Barton, Officer, in his individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellee: Michael Faulk
Case Number: 21-1116
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5005946-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton. Brief of Bryan Barton, Scott Boyher, City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Gentilini, Brian Gonzales, James Harris III, Randy Jemerson, Matthew T. Karnowski, Gerald Leyshock, Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Brian Rossomanno, Timothy Sachs, Robert Stuart, Andrew Wismar, James Wood and Anthony Wozniak due 03/26/2021. Appendix due on 03/26/2021. [5006070] [21-1116] (CMD) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:43 AM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/26/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellants Mr. Bryan Barton, Mr. Scott Boyher, City of St. Louis, Missouri, Mr. John Gentilini, Mr. Brian Gonzales, Mr. James Harris, III, Mr. Randy Jemerson, Mr. Matthew T. Karnowski, Mr. Gerald Leyshock, Mr. Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Mr. Brian Rossomanno, Mr. Timothy Sachs, Mr. Robert Stuart, Mr. Andrew Wismar, Mr. James Wood and Mr. Anthony Wozniak w/service 02/18/2021. [5005946] [21-1116] (ADW) [Entered: 02/18/2021 06:00 PM]
January 29, 2021 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Barton, Mr. Scott Boyher, Mr. John Gentilini, Mr. Brian Gonzales, Mr. James Harris, III, Mr. Randy Jemerson, Mr. Matthew T. Karnowski, Mr. Gerald Leyshock, Mr. Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Mr. Brian Rossomanno, Mr. Timothy Sachs, Mr. Robert Stuart, Mr. Andrew Wismar, Mr. James Wood and Mr. Anthony Wozniak - w/service 01/29/2021. [4999618] [21-1116] (ADW) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:31 PM]
January 29, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Barton, Mr. Scott Boyher, Mr. John Gentilini, Mr. Brian Gonzales, Mr. James Harris, III, Mr. Randy Jemerson, Mr. Matthew T. Karnowski, Mr. Gerald Leyshock, Mr. Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Mr. Brian Rossomanno, Mr. Timothy Sachs, Mr. Anthony Wozniak, Mr. James Wood and Mr. Andrew Wismar - Joint Appendix - w/service 01/29/2021 [4999616] [21-1116] (ADW) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:29 PM]
January 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Wheaton for Appellants Mr. Bryan Barton, Mr. Scott Boyher, Mr. John Gentilini, Mr. Brian Gonzales, Mr. James Harris, III, Mr. Randy Jemerson, Mr. Matthew T. Karnowski, Mr. Gerald Leyshock, Mr. Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Mr. Brian Rossomanno, Mr. Timothy Sachs, Mr. Robert Stuart, Mr. Andrew Wismar, Mr. James Wood and Mr. Anthony Wozniak w/service 01/19/2021 [4995427] [21-1116] (ADW) [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:44 AM]
January 15, 2021 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 02/24/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bryan Barton, Scott Boyher, City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Gentilini, Brian Gonzales, James Harris III, Randy Jemerson, Matthew T. Karnowski, Gerald Leyshock, Tom Long, Lawrence O'Toole, Brian Rossomanno, Timothy Sachs, Robert Stuart, Andrew Wismar, James Wood and Anthony Wozniak due 02/24/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4995204] [21-1116] (CJO) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:56 PM]
January 15, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 01/05/2021, and Order 01/08/2021. [4995198] [21-1116] (CJO) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:48 PM]
January 15, 2021 Civil case docketed. [4995190] [21-1116] (CJO) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Faulk v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Brian Gonzales, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of St. Louis, Missouri
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Robert Stuart, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Gerald Leyshock, Col., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Gentilini, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Anthony Wozniak, Sgt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: James Wood, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Scott Boyher, Lt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Brian Rossomanno, Sgt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: James Harris, III, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Timothy Sachs, Lt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lawrence O'Toole, LT. COL., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Matthew T. Karnowski, Sgt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Randy Jemerson, Sgt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Tom Long, Sgt., in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Andrew Wismar, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Robert Henry Dierker Jr.
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Bryan Barton, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Erin K. McGowan
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Faulk
Represented By: John McCann Waldron
Represented By: Maureen Hanlon
Represented By: David Curtis Nelson
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Carroll
Represented By: Michael-John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?