Sarah Molina, et al v. Daniel Book, et al
Defendant: John Doe, I-VI, County of St. Clair, Illinois, Jason C. Chambers and City of St. Louis, Missouri
Plaintiff / Appellee: Peter Groce, Sarah K. Molina and Christina Vogel
Defendant / Appellant: Joseph Mader, in his individual capacity, William Wethington, in his individual capacity, Lance Coats, in his individual capacity, Daniel Book, in his individual capacity, Stephen Dodge, in his individual capacity, Joseph Busso, in his individual capacity, Mark S. Seper, in his individual capacity and Michael D. Mayo, in his individual capacity
Case Number: 21-1830
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5037475-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton. Brief of Daniel Book, Joseph Busso, Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Joseph Mader, Michael D. Mayo, Mark S. Seper and William Wethington due 06/23/2021. Appendix due on 06/23/2021. [5037570] [21-1830] (MVP) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:06 AM]
May 19, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/23/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellants Mr. Daniel Book, Mr. Joseph Busso, Mr. Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Mr. Joseph Mader, Michael D. Mayo, Mr. Mark S. Seper and Mr. William Wethington w/service 05/19/2021. [5037475] [21-1830] (ADW) [Entered: 05/19/2021 06:16 PM]
April 28, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Michael D. Mayo, Mr. Daniel Book, Mr. Joseph Busso, Mr. Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Mr. Joseph Mader, Mr. Mark S. Seper and Mr. William Wethington - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/28/2021 [5030224] [21-1830] (ADW) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:47 PM]
April 28, 2021 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Daniel Book, Mr. Joseph Busso, Mr. Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Mr. Joseph Mader, Michael D. Mayo, Mr. Mark S. Seper and Mr. William Wethington - w/service 04/28/2021. [5030220] [21-1830] (ADW) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:41 PM]
April 27, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Wheaton for Appellants Mr. Daniel Book, Mr. Joseph Busso, Mr. Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Mr. Joseph Mader, Michael D. Mayo, Mr. Mark S. Seper and Mr. William Wethington w/service 04/27/2021 [5029799] [21-1830] (ADW) [Entered: 04/27/2021 04:46 PM]
April 14, 2021 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/24/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Daniel Book, Joseph Busso, Lance Coats, Stephen Dodge, Joseph Mader, Michael D. Mayo, Mark S. Seper and William Wethington due 05/24/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5025589] [21-1830] (CMH) [Entered: 04/14/2021 02:00 PM]
April 14, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Memorandum & Order filed 3/31/2021. [5025585] [21-1830] (CMH) [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:58 PM]
April 14, 2021 Civil case docketed. [5025584] [21-1830] (CMH) [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sarah Molina, et al v. Daniel Book, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter Groce
Represented By: Molly E. Carney
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Omri E. Praiss
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sarah K. Molina
Represented By: Molly E. Carney
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Omri E. Praiss
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christina Vogel
Represented By: Molly E. Carney
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Kayla M. DeLoach
Represented By: Omri E. Praiss
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph Mader, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William Wethington, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lance Coats, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Daniel Book, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Stephen Dodge, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph Busso, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Mark S. Seper, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Michael D. Mayo, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew D. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, I-VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of St. Clair, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?