Oliver Bolotin, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Clarence Gallinger, Lawanda Drayton, Maurice Saxton, Charles Wilkerson, Theron Graham, Frank Segoviano, Jr., Anthony Brazil, Benjamin El, Jeffrey Bradley, David Riggins, William Smith, Lisa Lunsford, Shamailla White, Alan McKittrick, Sergio Flores, Donald Tapley, Kenny Irizarry, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Gino Socciarelli, Oliver Bolotin, Joseph Moriarty, Todd Wilson, Raymond Lapollo, Nichalaus Franco, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Jason Vaughan, Daniel Taylor, Kenya Clinton, Steven Yorkey, Curtis King and Henry Jepsen
Defendant / Appellant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 21-1838
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. No Transcript[5042298] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:50 PM]
June 4, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/04/2021 [5042295] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:45 PM]
June 4, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. - FOR CAL [5042291] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:43 PM]
May 27, 2021 **CONSOLIDATED** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due 07/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 07/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040092] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]
April 22, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/22/2021 [5028257] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:17 PM]
April 22, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850. - FOR CAL [5028255] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:15 PM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Mr. Oliver Bolotin, Mr. Jeffrey Bradley, Mr. Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Mr. Glenn Collins, Mr. Bobby Davis, Ms. Lawanda Drayton, Mr. Benjamin El, Mr. Sergio Flores, Mr. Nichalaus Franco, Mr. Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Mr. Kenny Irizarry, Mr. Henry Jepsen, Mr. Curtis King, Mr. Raymond Lapollo, Ms. Lisa Lunsford, Mr. Alan McKittrick, Mr. Joseph Moriarty, Mr. David Riggins, Mr. Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Mr. Maurice Saxton, Mr. Frank Segoviano, Jr., William Smith, Mr. Gino Socciarelli, Mr. Donald Tapley, Mr. Daniel Taylor, Mr. Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Mr. Charles Wilkerson, Mr. Todd Wilson and Mr. Steven Yorkey w/service 04/19/2021 [5026748] [21-1838] (DEG) [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:10 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026672] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:32 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026670] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:30 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026668] [21-1838] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:29 AM]
April 16, 2021 *CONSOLIDATED* BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2021. Appendix due 06/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 06/07/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026322] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (CBO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:15 AM]
April 15, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order granting remand filed 3/24/2021, judgment filed 3/26/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/13/2021. [5025942] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:19 PM]
April 15, 2021 Civil case docketed. [5025936] [21-1838] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Oliver Bolotin, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Clarence Gallinger
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lawanda Drayton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maurice Saxton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Wilkerson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Theron Graham
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Frank Segoviano, Jr.
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Brazil
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Benjamin El
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeffrey Bradley
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Riggins
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Smith
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lisa Lunsford
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shamailla White
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alan McKittrick
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sergio Flores
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald Tapley
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenny Irizarry
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Glenn Collins
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bobby Davis
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gino Socciarelli
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oliver Bolotin
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joseph Moriarty
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Todd Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Raymond Lapollo
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nichalaus Franco
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kelvin Robinson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Guadalupe Sandoval
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jason Vaughan
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenya Clinton
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steven Yorkey
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Curtis King
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Henry Jepsen
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M Company
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris A. Rashid
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?