Casey Baker, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Casey Baker, Don Franklin, Jonathan Knight, Mario Ortiz, Justin Elenes, Garret Troxler, Brian Wilson, Shawn Kiser, Rowdy Huff, Keisha Keller, Mark Whitefield, Thomas Krasky and Albert Duff
Defendant / Appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC and 3M Company
Case Number: 21-1845
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. No Transcript[5042298] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:50 PM]
June 4, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/04/2021 [5042295] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:45 PM]
June 4, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195. - FOR CAL [5042291] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (AC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:43 PM]
May 27, 2021 **CONSOLIDATED** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due 07/16/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 07/16/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5040092] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850, 21-2179, 21-2181, 21-2183, 21-2195] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]
April 29, 2021 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #26 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 03/10/2021, No. of Pgs.: 18, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [5030446] [21-1845] (STL) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:36 PM]
April 22, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/22/2021 [5028257] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:17 PM]
April 22, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC in 21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850. - FOR CAL [5028255] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (BWH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:15 PM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Mr. Casey Baker, Mr. Albert Duff, Mr. Justin Elenes, Mr. Don Franklin, Mr. Rowdy Huff, Ms. Keisha Keller, Mr. Shawn Kiser, Mr. Jonathan Knight, Mr. Thomas Krasky, Mr. Mario Ortiz, Mr. Garret Troxler, Mr. Mark Whitefield and Brian Wilson w/service 04/19/2021 [5026751] [21-1845] (DEG) [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:15 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026691] [21-1845] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:45 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026687] [21-1845] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:43 AM]
April 19, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 04/19/2021 [5026686] [21-1845] (BWH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:42 AM]
April 16, 2021 *CONSOLIDATED* BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2021. Appendix due 06/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 06/07/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026322] [21-1307, 21-1309, 21-1312, 21-1317, 21-1834, 21-1837, 21-1838, 21-1840, 21-1843, 21-1845, 21-1847, 21-1850] (CBO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 10:15 AM]
April 15, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order granting remand filed 3/24/2021, judgment filed 3/25/2021, and notice of appeal filed 4/13/2021. [5026101] [21-1845] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:38 PM]
April 15, 2021 Civil case docketed. [5026094] [21-1845] (CBO) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Casey Baker, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Casey Baker
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Don Franklin
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jonathan Knight
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mario Ortiz
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Justin Elenes
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Garret Troxler
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shawn Kiser
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rowdy Huff
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Keisha Keller
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mark Whitefield
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas Krasky
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Albert Duff
Represented By: Alicia N. Sieben
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Amanda M. Williams
Represented By: William R. Sieben
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M Company
Represented By: S. Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?