Terry Watson v. Karey Witty, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Geeneen Wilhite, MCC Manager of Health Services, George Lombardi, DIRECTOR OF MDOC, Karey L. Witty, Corizon Corrections Health Inc. CEO, Matt Strumm, MDOC Division Director, Michael Bowersox, Warden SCCC, Michele Buckner, Assist. Warden, SCCC, Governor Michael L. Parson, CO II D. Kattelman, Assistant Director Deloise Williams, Assistant Director of Health Services, Anne L. Precythe, MODOC Director, Ralf Sulke, Vice President of Operations, Asst. Warden Chantay Godert, Lori Lewis, Deputy Warden and ADA Site Director, Chris Sweeten, MDOC Director of ADA, FNP Tamra L. Crouch, Cari D. Collins, ADA Site Coordinator, Dr. Paul Jones, Doctor, Dean Minor, Warden MCC, Dr. Aschok Chada, MD, Cathy Barton, Manager of Nurses, Lisa Pogue, Asst. Warden, MCC, Renee Tradaro, SCCC Manager of Health Services, Jeff Allen and Will Jones, ADA Site Coordinator
Plaintiff / Appellant: Terry G. Watson
Case Number: 21-1963
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Edward V. Crites for Appellees Mr. Jeff Allen, Michele Buckner, Lisa Pogue, Cari D. Collins, Mr. Will Jones, Mr. Chris Sweeten, Lori Lewis, Michael L. Parson, Anne L. Precythe and Chantay Godert w/service 06/22/2021 [5047732] [21-1963] (EVC) [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:20 PM]
June 22, 2021 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 21-1963: paid - cs]. Fee paid in full in district court. [5047560] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 06/22/2021 11:42 AM]
June 3, 2021 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 21-1963: plra] [5041574] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:27 AM]
June 3, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of originating district court order of 05/24/2021 for the calculation and collection of the appellate filing fees. [5041573] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:26 AM]
May 10, 2021 MOTION to correct caption error on appeal by adding Gina Watson as an appellant, filed by Appellant Mr. Terry G. Watson w/service 05/11/2021. [5034454] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:59 PM]
April 30, 2021 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 21-1963: pending] [5030765] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:23 AM]
April 30, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5030760] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:21 AM]
April 30, 2021 CLERK ORDER: This case is remanded to district court for calculation and collection of appellate filing fees pursuant to Henderson v. Norris, 129F.3d 418 (8th Cir. 1997). [5030755] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:18 AM]
April 30, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order filed 4/7/2021 and Order filed 4/21/2021. [5030747] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:11 AM]
April 30, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5030729] [21-1963] (CMH) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terry Watson v. Karey Witty, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geeneen Wilhite, MCC Manager of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: George Lombardi, DIRECTOR OF MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karey L. Witty, Corizon Corrections Health Inc. CEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matt Strumm, MDOC Division Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Bowersox, Warden SCCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michele Buckner, Assist. Warden, SCCC
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Governor Michael L. Parson
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CO II D. Kattelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistant Director Deloise Williams, Assistant Director of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anne L. Precythe, MODOC Director
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ralf Sulke, Vice President of Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Asst. Warden Chantay Godert
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lori Lewis, Deputy Warden and ADA Site Director
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Sweeten, MDOC Director of ADA
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNP Tamra L. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cari D. Collins, ADA Site Coordinator
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Paul Jones, Doctor
Represented By: John Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dean Minor, Warden MCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Aschok Chada, MD
Represented By: John Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cathy Barton, Manager of Nurses
Represented By: John Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lisa Pogue, Asst. Warden, MCC
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Renee Tradaro, SCCC Manager of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Allen
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Will Jones, ADA Site Coordinator
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Terry G. Watson
Represented By: Terry G. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?