Eny Mejia Rodriguez v. Dennys Reyes Molina
Plaintiff / Appellee: Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez
Defendant / Appellant: Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina
Case Number: 22-3048
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina. Record Deficiency due on 11/28/2022. [5220748-1] [22-3048] (HAG) [Entered: 11/23/2022 10:33 AM]
November 22, 2022 APPELLANT brief of Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5220511] [22-3048] (BDB) [Entered: 11/22/2022 03:11 PM]
November 21, 2022 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina. [5219616] [22-3048]--[Edited 11/21/2022 by HAG to add ddl] (HAG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 10:20 AM]
November 21, 2022 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina. [5219585] [22-3048] (HAG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 09:36 AM]
November 21, 2022 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 2 volumes, Comments: District Court documents #67 and #68 [Copies do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / SI, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/04/2022 and 08/08/2022, No. of Pgs.: 166, Court Reporter: Mulcahy, Kelli M [5219876] [22-3048] (STL) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:24 PM]
November 18, 2022 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5219418] [22-3048] (BDB) [Entered: 11/18/2022 03:45 PM]
November 18, 2022 APPELLANT brief of Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document.[5219416] [22-3048]--[Edited 11/21/2022 by HAG to correct type of brief submitted] (BDB) [Entered: 11/18/2022 03:43 PM]
October 19, 2022 JUDGE ORDER: Appellant's [ # 5206200-2 ] motion to stay the district court's decision is denied as moot. The [ # 5206520-2 ] motion to expedite the appeal on the merits is denied. Adp Oct 2022 [5209309] [22-3048] (HAG) [Entered: 10/19/2022 11:31 AM]
October 18, 2022 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #35 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / SI, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/17/2022, No. of Pgs.: 10, Court Reporter: Mulcahy, Kelli M [5208646] [22-3048] (STL) [Entered: 10/18/2022 07:27 AM]
October 17, 2022 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5206200-2 ] filed by Attorney Ms. Cara S. Donels for Appellee Ms. Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez , w/service 10/17/2022. [5208580] [22-3048]--[Edited 10/18/2022 by HAG to revise dkt txt] (CSD) [Entered: 10/17/2022 04:16 PM]
October 12, 2022 RECORD FILED - SEALED EXHIBITS to Motion for Stay [5206200], No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: SEALED: Defendant's Evidentiary Hearing Exhibits A-U (R. Doc. 39 & 40) [5207207] [22-3048] [5207207] [22-3048]--[Edited 10/12/2022 by HAG] (HAG) [Entered: 10/12/2022 04:27 PM]
October 12, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5203387-3 ] motion to seal filed by Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Defendant's Evidentiary Hearing Exhibits A-U. [5207203] [22-3048] (HAG) [Entered: 10/12/2022 04:23 PM]
October 11, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Thomas M. Patton for Appellee Ms. Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez w/service 10/11/2022 [5206666] [22-3048] (TMP) [Entered: 10/11/2022 03:50 PM]
October 11, 2022 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for an expedited appeal [ # 5206520-2 ] filed by Attorney Ms. Cara S. Donels for Appellee Ms. Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez , w/service 10/11/2022. [5206677] [22-3048] (CSD) [Entered: 10/11/2022 04:00 PM]
October 11, 2022 MOTION for an expedited appeal, filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina w/service 10/11/2022. [5206520] [22-3048] (BDB) [Entered: 10/11/2022 01:22 PM]
October 10, 2022 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina w/service 10/10/2022. [5206200] [22-3048] (BDB) [Entered: 10/10/2022 08:18 AM]
October 4, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Cara S. Donels for Appellee Ms. Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez w/service 10/04/2022 [5204763] [22-3048] (CSD) [Entered: 10/04/2022 04:25 PM]
September 30, 2022 MOTION to seal exhibits, filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin David Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina w/service 09/30/2022. [5203387] [22-3048]--[Edited 10/12/2022 by HAG to correct relief] (BDB) [Entered: 09/30/2022 09:01 AM]
September 29, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, **SEALED** Order 9/17/2022, and Judgment 9/20/2022. [5203249] [22-3048] (CMH) [Entered: 09/29/2022 03:29 PM]
September 29, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/08/2022. Appendix due 11/18/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina due 11/18/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5203251] [22-3048] (CMH) [Entered: 09/29/2022 03:30 PM]
September 29, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina w/service 09/29/2022 [5203321] [22-3048] (BDB) [Entered: 09/29/2022 05:01 PM]
September 29, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5203240] [22-3048] (CMH) [Entered: 09/29/2022 03:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eny Mejia Rodriguez v. Dennys Reyes Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez
Represented By: Cara S. Donels
Represented By: Thomas Merrill Patton
Represented By: Thomas M. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina
Represented By: Benjamin David Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?