Ronald Ragan, Jr. v. Berkshire Hathaway Auto, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 22-3355
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.. w/service 12/29/2022 [5231390] [22-3355] (RJS) [Entered: 12/29/2022 06:05 PM]
December 20, 2022 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. - w/service 12/20/2022. [5229163] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 12/20/2022 09:04 PM]
December 20, 2022 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr.. No Transcript needed because there were no oral hearings below. [5229162] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 12/20/2022 09:03 PM]
December 19, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr.. w/service 12/19/2022 [5228737] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 12/19/2022 11:22 PM]
December 19, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5228315-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Andrew Benedict Grimm. Brief of Ronald Ragan Jr. due 01/18/2023. Appendix due on 01/18/2023. [5228421] [22-3355] (HAG) [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:24 AM]
December 17, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/18/2023, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Benedict Grimm for Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. w/service 12/17/2022. [5228315] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 12/17/2022 12:11 AM]
November 30, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Michael Hayes for Appellee Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. w/service 11/30/2022 [5222611] [22-3355] (MH) [Entered: 11/30/2022 03:29 PM]
November 30, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Michael Hayes for Appellee Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. w/service 11/30/2022. **LOCKED-Counsel instructed to re-file form with correct party designation box checked**[5222518] [22-3355]--[Edited 11/30/2022 by HAG to indicate locked] (MH) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:10 PM]
November 23, 2022 RESPONSE with no opposition to form [ # 5216652-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Benedict Grimm for Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. , w/service 11/23/2022. [5221105] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:58 PM]
November 23, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Gregory Keenan for Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. w/service 11/23/2022 [5221103] [22-3355] (GWK) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:14 PM]
November 23, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Grimm for Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. w/service 11/23/2022 [5221102] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:12 PM]
November 23, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ronald Ragan, Jr. - Separate Appendix - w/service 11/23/2022 [5221104] [22-3355] (ABG) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:37 PM]
November 17, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Ryan J. Schletzbaum for Appellee Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. w/service 11/17/2022 [5218736] [22-3355] (RJS) [Entered: 11/17/2022 09:21 AM]
November 17, 2022 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5218739] [22-3355] (RJS) [Entered: 11/17/2022 09:23 AM]
November 9, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 03/10/2022, Order 10/11/2022, and Judgment 10/11/2022. [5216653] [22-3355] (CJO) [Entered: 11/09/2022 02:37 PM]
November 9, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/19/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Ronald Ragan Jr. due 12/19/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5216657] [22-3355] (CJO) [Entered: 11/09/2022 02:42 PM]
November 9, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5216652] [22-3355] (CJO) [Entered: 11/09/2022 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ronald Ragan, Jr. v. Berkshire Hathaway Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth N. Caldwell
Represented By: Edward N. Foster
Represented By: Andrew Benedict Grimm
Represented By: Gregory William Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Schletzbaum
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Represented By: Michael Hayes
Represented By: Ryan Justin Schletzbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?