Leann Dykes v. National Institutes of Health, et al
Plaintiff: Leann M. Dykes
Defendant: National Institutes of Health, NatIonal Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, United States and Ecohealth Alliance
Case Number: 24-1446
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Robert Bruce Kips for Appellant Leann M. Dykes correcting [ # 5386478-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5386695] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 04/24/2024 11:23 AM]
April 24, 2024 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 5386478-2 ], submitted by Robert Bruce Kips in 24-1446 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [24-1446] (JMB) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:02 AM]
April 24, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5386478-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Robert Bruce Kips. Brief of Leann M. Dykes due 05/28/2024. Appendix due on 05/28/2024. [5386717] [24-1446] (JMB) [Entered: 04/24/2024 11:41 AM]
April 23, 2024 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/28/2024, filed by Attorney Robert Bruce Kips for Appellant Leann M. Dykes w/service 04/23/2024. [5386478] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 04/23/2024 03:57 PM]
March 19, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Leann M. Dykes - w/service 03/19/2024. [5374881] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 03/19/2024 01:15 PM]
March 19, 2024 CERTIFICATE of transcript filed by Appellant Leann M. Dykes w/service 03/19/2024. Transcript ordered- 10-20-2023 hearing. [5374891] [24-1446]--[Edited 03/19/2024 by BNW to correct event and docket text.] (RBK) [Entered: 03/19/2024 01:30 PM]
March 19, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Leann M. Dykes - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/19/2024 [5375039] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 03/19/2024 04:55 PM]
March 19, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Leann M. Dykes. w/service 03/19/2024 [5374880] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 03/19/2024 01:12 PM]
March 18, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Ecohealth Alliance. - FOR CAL [5374392] [24-1446] (BJM) [Entered: 03/18/2024 01:48 PM]
March 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Michael J. Grudberg for Appellee Ecohealth Alliance w/service 03/18/2024 [5374389] [24-1446] (BJM) [Entered: 03/18/2024 01:46 PM]
March 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Brian J. Madden for Appellee Ecohealth Alliance w/service 03/18/2024 [5374387] [24-1446] (BJM) [Entered: 03/18/2024 01:44 PM]
March 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Juan Olivo for Appellee Ecohealth Alliance w/service 03/18/2024 [5374390] [24-1446] (BJM) [Entered: 03/18/2024 01:47 PM]
March 13, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jared B. Fish for Appellees National Institutes of Health, NatIonal Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases and United States w/service 03/13/2024 [5373095] [24-1446] (JF) [Entered: 03/13/2024 02:32 PM]
March 6, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by R. Bruce Kips for Appellant Leann M. Dykes w/service 03/06/2024 [5370752] [24-1446] (RBK) [Entered: 03/06/2024 03:54 PM]
March 5, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, two orders of 1/4/24, judgment 1/5/24. [5369972] [24-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:17 AM]
March 5, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/15/2024. Appendix due 04/25/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Leann M. Dykes due 04/25/2024 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5369975] [24-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:19 AM]
March 5, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5369967] [24-1446] (CAH) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leann Dykes v. National Institutes of Health, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann M. Dykes
Represented By: Robert Bruce Kips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institutes of Health
Represented By: Jared Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatIonal Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases
Represented By: Jared Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Emily Kelley
Represented By: Matthew N. Sparks
Represented By: Jared Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecohealth Alliance
Represented By: Michael J. Grudberg
Represented By: Brian J. Madden
Represented By: Juan Olivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?