C.B.S., et al v. United States
Plaintiff: C.B.S., a minor by his mother and guardian, Stephanie Hope Smith and Stephanie Hope Smith, individually
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 24-1453
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of receipt for appellate fee paid. [5388876] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:27 PM]
April 30, 2024 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 24-1453: paid - cs] [5388883] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:29 PM]
April 30, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Transcript due on or before 06/10/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT C.B.S. and Stephanie Hope Smith due 06/10/2024. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5388892] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:32 PM]
April 12, 2024 CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT(S) has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. dockt fee due on 05/02/2024. [5382975] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 04/12/2024 12:33 PM]
March 7, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Lucas Draisey for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/07/2024 [5370806] [24-1453] (LBD) [Entered: 03/07/2024 08:18 AM]
March 7, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Tweeten for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/07/2024 [5370803] [24-1453] (AT) [Entered: 03/07/2024 08:14 AM]
March 6, 2024 RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 3 volumes, Comments: District Court documents #98, #99, and #100 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/16/2023 - 05/18/2023, Court Reporter: Mousseau, Kristine [5370637] [24-1453] (STL) [Entered: 03/06/2024 02:14 PM]
March 5, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, Order filed 9/26/2023, Judgment filed 9/27/2023, and Notice of Appeal filed 3/1/2024. *NOTE* Two text only orders granted extension for time to file Notice of Appeal. [5370107] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 03/05/2024 12:19 PM]
March 5, 2024 CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 03/26/2024, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5370138] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 03/05/2024 12:59 PM]
March 5, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5370076] [24-1453] (CBO) [Entered: 03/05/2024 11:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: C.B.S., et al v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.B.S., a minor by his mother and guardian, Stephanie Hope Smith
Represented By: C.B.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hope Smith, individually
Represented By: Stephanie Hope Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lucas B. Draisey
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?