WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 189.9 rods in Twsp. 149, et al
Plaintiff: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Defendant: 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across, Leonard W. Hoffmann, Trustee of the Hoffmann Living Trust dated March 8, 2002, David L. Hoffmann, Denae M. Hoffmann, Margaret A. Hoffmann, Trustee of the Hoffmann Living Trust dated March 8, 2002, Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP, Randall D. Stevenson and All other Unknown Owners, of the above lands
Case Number: 24-1693
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Krista L. Christopherson for Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. w/service 05/29/2024 [5398497] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 05/29/2024 01:10 PM]
May 28, 2024 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies. [5397908] [24-1693] (BNW) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:33 PM]
May 28, 2024 Paper copies Appellant Brief, [ # 5396630-2 ] filed by WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. [5397907] [24-1693] (BNW) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:32 PM]
May 22, 2024 APPELLANT brief of WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5396611] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 05/22/2024 02:26 PM]
May 22, 2024 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5396613] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 05/22/2024 02:31 PM]
May 22, 2024 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. w/service 05/22/2024. Length: 7,904 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. due 05/28/2024 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, All other Unknown Owners, David L. Hoffmann, Denae M. Hoffmann, Leonard W. Hoffmann, Margaret A. Hoffmann, Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP and Randall D. Stevenson due on 06/21/2024. [5396630] [24-1693] (BNW) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:02 PM]
May 22, 2024 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. w/service 05/22/2024. [5396633] [24-1693] (BNW) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:03 PM]
April 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Derrick L. Braaten for Appellees 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota, 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota and David L. Hoffmann w/service 04/18/2024 [5384890] [24-1693] (DB) [Entered: 04/18/2024 01:45 PM]
April 16, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.. No Transcript[5384093] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 04:40 PM]
April 16, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. - w/service 04/16/2024. [5384090] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 04:34 PM]
April 16, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Derrick L. Braaten for Appellees Denae M. Hoffmann, Leonard W. Hoffmann, Margaret A. Hoffmann, Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP and Randall D. Stevenson w/service 04/16/2024 [5383896] [24-1693] (DB) [Entered: 04/16/2024 12:36 PM]
April 16, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/16/2024 [5384092] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 04/16/2024 04:38 PM]
April 2, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, Order filed 11/1/2022, Order filed 3/5/2024, Judgment filed 3/5/2024, and Notice of Appeal filed 4/1/2024. [5379667] [24-1693] (CBO) [Entered: 04/02/2024 12:26 PM]
April 2, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/13/2024. Appendix due 05/22/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. due 05/22/2024 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5379670] [24-1693] (CBO) [Entered: 04/02/2024 12:28 PM]
April 2, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5379813] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 04/02/2024 04:59 PM]
April 2, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5379663] [24-1693] (CBO) [Entered: 04/02/2024 12:21 PM]
April 2, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Paul J. Forster for Appellant WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. w/service 04/02/2024 [5379812] [24-1693] (PJF) [Entered: 04/02/2024 04:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 189.9 rods in Twsp. 149, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Forster
Represented By: Casey Ann Furey
Represented By: Krista L. Christopherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 189.9 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: W1/2SE1/4 Section 14: NW1/4NE1/4 McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 227.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 11: N1/2SW1/4, W1/2SE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 242.0 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 2: SW1/4SE1/4 Section 11: NE1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 335.3 rods, more or less, located in Township 150 North, Range 98 W Section 35: W1/2E1/2 McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 223.8 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 28: S1/2N1/2, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 83.6 rods, more or less, located in Township 149 North, Range 98 W Section 14: NW1/4, McKenzie County, North Dakota, An easement and right-of-way across
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard W. Hoffmann, Trustee of the Hoffmann Living Trust dated March 8, 2002
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Hoffmann
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denae M. Hoffmann
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret A. Hoffmann, Trustee of the Hoffmann Living Trust dated March 8, 2002
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky & Jonilla Farms, LLP
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall D. Stevenson
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other Unknown Owners, of the above lands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?