Vanessa Smith v. John Kendricks, et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa C. Smith
Defendant: Dr. John Kendricks, M.D., Primary Care Physician and John S. LaTour, Tax Law
Case Number: 24-1716
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 JUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A. BOBBY E. SHEPHERD, DAVID R. STRAS and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp May 2024 [5394435] [24-1716] (NDG) [Entered: 05/16/2024 10:27 AM]
May 6, 2024 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Bobby E. Shepherd, David R. Stras, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [5394434] [24-1716] (NDG) [Entered: 05/16/2024 10:24 AM]
April 5, 2024 CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5380642] [24-1716] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2024 07:35 AM]
April 5, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report & Recommendation 3/12/2024, and Order 4/1/2024. [5380640] [24-1716] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2024 07:35 AM]
April 5, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5380636] [24-1716] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2024 07:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vanessa Smith v. John Kendricks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa C. Smith
Represented By: Vanessa C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Kendricks, M.D., Primary Care Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. LaTour, Tax Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?