Mary Turner, et al v. Lafayette County School District, et al
Plaintiff: Mary Turner, Individually and as next friend of Torrance Turner, a minor, Lucy Cheatham, Individually and as next friend of Andrew Cheatham, a minor, Mary Rose, Individually and as next friend of Victor Rose, Obie Sasser, Individually and as next friend of Frank Sasser, a minor, Barbara Dudley, Individually and as next friend of Kerri Dudley, a minor, Ida Dudley, Individually and as next friend of Tia Dudley, Rosie Blair, Individually and as next friend of Kimberly Blair, a minor, Johnny Blair, Individually and as next friend of Kimberly Blair, a minor, Robert Wise, Individually and as next friend of Valarie Wise, a minor and Mildred Thompson, Individually and as next friend of Kelona Thompson, a minor
Defendant: Lafayette County School District, Larry Hudson, Individually and in his official capacity as Superintendent of Schools for the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate, Hollis Sasser, Individually and in his official capacity as President of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate, Harry Smith, Individually and in his official capacity as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate, Leslie Nutt, Individually and in his official capacity as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate, Steve Groves, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate, Carolyn Moss, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Body Corporate and Johnny Ross, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Body Corporate
Intervenor: Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education
Case Number: 24-1928
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 MOTION to hold briefing schedule in abeyance, filed by Attorney Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education w/service 05/15/2024. [5393990] [24-1928] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:16 AM]
May 15, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5393990-2 ] motion hold briefing schedule in abeyance filed by Dylan L. Jacobs., The parties are directed to file a status report by 07/15/2024. [5394217] [24-1928] (JMB) [Entered: 05/15/2024 02:46 PM]
May 7, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Whitney F. Moore for Appellee Lafayette County School District w/service 05/07/2024 [5391287] [24-1928] (WFM) [Entered: 05/07/2024 12:19 PM]
May 1, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/10/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education due 06/10/2024. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5389561] [24-1928] (AEV) [Entered: 05/01/2024 04:47 PM]
May 1, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 3/29/24, docket entries, [5389560] [24-1928] (AEV) [Entered: 05/01/2024 04:46 PM]
May 1, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5389559] [24-1928] (AEV) [Entered: 05/01/2024 04:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Turner, et al v. Lafayette County School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Turner, Individually and as next friend of Torrance Turner, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Cheatham, Individually and as next friend of Andrew Cheatham, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rose, Individually and as next friend of Victor Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obie Sasser, Individually and as next friend of Frank Sasser, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dudley, Individually and as next friend of Kerri Dudley, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Dudley, Individually and as next friend of Tia Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Blair, Individually and as next friend of Kimberly Blair, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Blair, Individually and as next friend of Kimberly Blair, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wise, Individually and as next friend of Valarie Wise, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Thompson, Individually and as next friend of Kelona Thompson, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette County School District
Represented By: Whitney F. Moore
Represented By: Allen P. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hudson, Individually and in his official capacity as Superintendent of Schools for the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Sasser, Individually and in his official capacity as President of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Smith, Individually and in his official capacity as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Nutt, Individually and in his official capacity as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Groves, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Moss, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Ross, Individually and as member of the Board of Education of the Lewisville School District No. 1, A Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arkansas Department of Education
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Christine Ann Cryer
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arkansas State Board of Education
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Christine Ann Cryer
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?