Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Co., LLC, et al v. Michelle Crows Heart, et al
Plaintiff: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, a part of the United States Department of the Interior, United States of America and United States Department of the Interior
Movant: Lezlie Johnson, Muriel Jackson, Todd Hall, Leslie Durando, Arnold Youngbird, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson, Laurel Shaw, Kevyn Heck, Darrin Pegram, Richard Brown, Theophile Eagle, Keith Heck, Michelle Crows Heart, Valorie Brady, LaVerne Eagle, Frank Eagle, Lawrence Pleets, Sherry Baker, Eunice Lone Bear and Cheryl Sears
Case Number: 24-2860
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2024 CLERK ORDER: Appellee's motion to dismiss case has been taken with the case pursuant to the Order dated 11/4/2024. The following briefing schedule is established: Brief of Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird due 12/04/2024 [5453129] [24-2860] (DNS) [Entered: 11/04/2024 02:00 PM]
November 4, 2024 JUDGE ORDER: The motion to dismiss case filed by Jeffrey A. Webb in 24-2860, [ # 5440372-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL Adp Oct 2024 [5453125] [24-2860] (DNS) [Entered: 11/04/2024 01:47 PM]
October 29, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jeremy J. Patterson for Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird w/service 10/29/2024 [5451342] [24-2860] (JJP) [Entered: 10/29/2024 03:06 PM]
October 14, 2024 REPLY to motion to dismiss case [ # 5440372-2 ] filed by Appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC w/service 10/14/2024. [5445788] [24-2860] - FOR CAL (JAW) [Entered: 10/14/2024 12:56 PM]
October 7, 2024 RESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss case [ # 5440372-2 ] filed by Attorney Jeffrey S. Rasmussen for Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird , w/service 10/07/2024. [5443876] [24-2860]. - FOR CAL (JSR) [Entered: 10/07/2024 10:38 PM]
October 7, 2024 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC's motion to dismiss case. [5443451] [24-2860] (DNS) [Entered: 10/07/2024 08:09 AM]
September 27, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/27/2024 [5440742] [24-2860] (MWH) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:39 PM]
September 27, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird. No Transcript[5440752] [24-2860] (MWH) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:52 PM]
September 27, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird - w/service 09/27/2024. [5440748] [24-2860] (MWH) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:45 PM]
September 27, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird. w/service 09/27/2024 [5440746] [24-2860] (MWH) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:43 PM]
September 26, 2024 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Jeffrey A. Webb for Appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC w/service 09/26/2024. [5440372] [24-2860] (JAW) [Entered: 09/26/2024 05:55 PM]
September 23, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Michael W. Holditch for Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird w/service 09/23/2024 [5438711] [24-2860] (MWH) [Entered: 09/23/2024 10:38 AM]
September 20, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson, Arnold Youngbird, Leslie Durando, Keith Heck and Kevyn Heck. - FOR CAL [5438355] [24-2860] (JSR) [Entered: 09/20/2024 03:10 PM]
September 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Mark Thomas Emery for Appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC w/service 09/20/2024 [5438354] [24-2860] (ME) [Entered: 09/20/2024 03:09 PM]
September 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey S. Rasmussen for Appellants Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson, Arnold Youngbird, Keith Heck and Kevyn Heck w/service 09/20/2024 [5438265] [24-2860] (JSR) [Entered: 09/20/2024 01:22 PM]
September 20, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. - FOR CAL [5438178] [24-2860] (JAW) [Entered: 09/20/2024 11:40 AM]
September 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey A. Webb for Appellee Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC w/service 09/20/2024 [5438131] [24-2860] (JAW) [Entered: 09/20/2024 10:59 AM]
September 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by John L. Smeltzer for Appellees United States Department of the Interior, United States of America and Bureau of Indian Affairs w/service 09/20/2024 [5437952] [24-2860] (JLS) [Entered: 09/20/2024 08:59 AM]
September 13, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 9/9/2024, Order filed 7/10/2024, and docket entries, [5435370] [24-2860] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2024 10:28 AM]
September 13, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/23/2024. Appendix due 11/04/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Sherry Baker, Valorie Brady, Richard Brown, Michelle Crows Heart, Leslie Durando, Frank Eagle, LaVerne Eagle, Theophile Eagle, Todd Hall, Keith Heck, Kevyn Heck, Muriel Jackson, Lezlie Johnson, Eunice Lone Bear, Darrin Pegram, Lawrence Pleets, Cheryl Sears, Laurel Shaw, Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson and Arnold Youngbird due 11/04/2024 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5435376] [24-2860] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2024 10:36 AM]
September 13, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5435365] [24-2860] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2024 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Co., LLC, et al v. Michelle Crows Heart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lezlie Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Muriel Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Todd Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Leslie Durando
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Arnold Youngbird
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jordan Spotted Bear Gunderson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Laurel Shaw
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kevyn Heck
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Darrin Pegram
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Richard Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Theophile Eagle
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Keith Heck
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Michelle Crows Heart
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Valorie Brady
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LaVerne Eagle
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Frank Eagle
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lawrence Pleets
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sherry Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Eunice Lone Bear
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Debra Lynn Hoffarth
Represented By: Ashleigh B. Ensrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Cheryl Sears
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Patterson
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Represented By: Mark Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, a part of the United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: John Luther Smeltzer
Represented By: Michael David Schoepf
Represented By: Cody Taylor Knapp
Represented By: Samuel Gollis
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John Luther Smeltzer
Represented By: Michael David Schoepf
Represented By: Cody Taylor Knapp
Represented By: Samuel Gollis
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: John Luther Smeltzer
Represented By: Michael David Schoepf
Represented By: Cody Taylor Knapp
Represented By: Samuel Gollis
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?