Brake Plus NWA, Inc., et al v. TRAN, et al
Plaintiff: Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC
Defendant: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration and United States Department of Transportation
Case Number: 24-2951
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5455038-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Katherine Church Campbell and Stephen J. Obermeier. Brief of Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC due 12/05/2024. Appendix due on 12/05/2024. [5455187] [24-2951] (HAG) [Entered: 11/08/2024 03:21 PM]
November 8, 2024 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix, filed by Stephen J. Obermeier for Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Katherine Church Campbell for Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC w/service 11/08/2024. [5455038] [24-2951]--[Edited 11/08/2024 by HAG to correct relief] (SJO) [Entered: 11/08/2024 01:39 PM]
October 22, 2024 JUDGE ORDER: Appellants' [ # 5441375-2 ] motion for an injunction pending appeal and for an administrative stay is denied. Adp Oct 2024 [5448670] [24-2951] (HAG) [Entered: 10/22/2024 08:52 AM]
October 17, 2024 REPLY to response in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5445205-2 ] filed by Attorney Stephen J. Obermeier for Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc. w/service 10/17/2024. [5447378] [24-2951]--[Edited 10/17/2024 by HAG to link to correct dkt entry] (SJO) [Entered: 10/17/2024 01:40 PM]
October 11, 2024 LETTER from Appellees National Highway Traffic Safety Administration and TRAN regarding government's response to plaintiffs' motion for an injunction pending appeal. w/service 10/11/2024 [5445660] [24-2951] (CR) [Entered: 10/11/2024 03:14 PM]
October 11, 2024 **LOCKED-COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE DOCUMENT USING CORRECT FILING EVENT** 28(j) citation filed by Appellees National Highway Traffic Safety Administration and TRAN w/service 10/11/2024 [5445557] [24-2951]--[Edited 10/11/2024 by HAG to lock] (CR) [Entered: 10/11/2024 01:32 PM]
October 10, 2024 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5441375-2 ] filed by Attorney Casen Ross for Appellees National Highway Traffic Safety Administration and TRAN , w/service 10/10/2024. [5445205] [24-2951] (CR) [Entered: 10/10/2024 03:12 PM]
October 9, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC. No Transcript[5444673] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 10/09/2024 03:13 PM]
October 9, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC - w/service 10/09/2024. [5444698] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 10/09/2024 03:28 PM]
October 9, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC. w/service 10/09/2024 [5444691] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 10/09/2024 03:23 PM]
October 9, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/09/2024 [5444680] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 10/09/2024 03:17 PM]
September 30, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Williams & Lake, LLC. - FOR CAL [5441376] [24-2951] (KCC) [Entered: 09/30/2024 06:23 PM]
September 30, 2024 MOTION (EMERGENCY) for Injunction Pending Appeal and Administrative Stay, filed by Stephen J. Obermeier for Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Katherine Church Campbell for Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC w/service 09/30/2024. [5441375] [24-2951] --[Edited to correct filing relief 10/01/2024 by AMT] (SJO) [Entered: 09/30/2024 06:21 PM]
September 30, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5441265] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 09/30/2024 03:32 PM]
September 30, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Bradshaw Rost for Appellant Williams & Lake, LLC w/service 09/30/2024 [5441165] [24-2951] (BR) [Entered: 09/30/2024 02:13 PM]
September 30, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jeremy J. Broggi for Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc. w/service 09/30/2024 [5440967] [24-2951] (JJB) [Entered: 09/30/2024 10:40 AM]
September 30, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen J. Obermeier for Appellant Brake Plus NWA, Inc. w/service 09/30/2024 [5440959] [24-2951] (SJO) [Entered: 09/30/2024 10:35 AM]
September 27, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Katherine C. Campbell for Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC w/service 09/27/2024 [5440728] [24-2951] (KCC) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:19 PM]
September 27, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Marshall S. Ney for Appellants Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC w/service 09/27/2024 [5440722] [24-2951] (MSN) [Entered: 09/27/2024 03:17 PM]
September 25, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 9/24/2024, Judgment dated 9/24/2024 [5439928] [24-2951] (RDB) [Entered: 09/25/2024 04:02 PM]
September 25, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Casen B. Ross for Appellees National Highway Traffic Safety Administration and TRAN w/service 09/25/2024 [5439979] [24-2951] (CR) [Entered: 09/25/2024 04:33 PM]
September 25, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/04/2024. Appendix due 11/14/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Brake Plus NWA, Inc. and Williams & Lake, LLC due 11/14/2024 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5439929] [24-2951] (RDB) [Entered: 09/25/2024 04:03 PM]
September 25, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5439914] [24-2951] (RDB) [Entered: 09/25/2024 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brake Plus NWA, Inc., et al v. TRAN, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brake Plus NWA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Obermeier
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams & Lake, LLC
Represented By: Bradshaw Rost
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Pardis Gheibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Casen Ross
Represented By: Pardis Gheibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?