Jackie Lackie v. Eric Noe, et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Lackie
Defendant: United States Department of the Army, Eric M. Noe, Colonel, in his official capacity as District Engineer, Little Rock District, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and United States Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 24-3239
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2024 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 5464841-2 ], submitted by Martin Aaron Kasten in 24-3239 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [24-3239] (MTB) [Entered: 12/10/2024 02:00 PM]
December 10, 2024 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/06/2025, filed by Attorney Martin Aaron Kasten for Appellant Jackie Lackie w/service 12/10/2024. [5464841] [24-3239] (MAK) [Entered: 12/10/2024 01:40 PM]
December 10, 2024 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Martin Aaron Kasten for Appellant Jackie Lackie correcting [ # 5464841-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5465030] [24-3239] (MAK) [Entered: 12/10/2024 04:19 PM]
December 10, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5464841-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Martin Aaron Kasten. Brief of Jackie Lackie due 01/06/2025. Appendix due on 01/06/2025. [5465037] [24-3239] (MTB) [Entered: 12/10/2024 04:23 PM]
November 21, 2024 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Transcript of Oral Argument - District Court document #47 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / EA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/05/2023, No. of Pgs.: 42, Court Reporter: Dellinger, Karen [5459239] [24-3239] (STL) [Entered: 11/21/2024 03:12 PM]
November 13, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Jackie Lackie. w/service 11/13/2024 [5456288] [24-3239] (MAK) [Entered: 11/13/2024 02:42 PM]
November 13, 2024 CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Designation of Record , Doc No. [ # 5456288-2 ], appendix notification , Doc No. [ # 5455860-2 ], filed by Appellant Jackie Lackie [5456292] [24-3239]--[Edited to connect to two entries 11/13/2024 by MTB] (MAK) [Entered: 11/13/2024 02:44 PM]
November 12, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Jackie Lackie - Joint Appendix - w/service 11/12/2024 [5455860] [24-3239] (MAK) [Entered: 11/12/2024 04:17 PM]
November 7, 2024 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 24-3239: paid - cs] [5454194] [24-3239] (RDB) [Entered: 11/07/2024 08:49 AM]
November 4, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5453299] [24-3239] (RDB) [Entered: 11/04/2024 04:29 PM]
November 4, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 4/25/2024, Order dated 9/6/2024 [5453300] [24-3239] (RDB) [Entered: 11/04/2024 04:31 PM]
November 4, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/16/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Jackie Lackie due 12/16/2024. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5453301] [24-3239] (RDB) [Entered: 11/04/2024 04:32 PM]
November 4, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Martin A. Kasten for Appellant Jackie Lackie w/service 11/04/2024 [5453314] [24-3239] (MAK) [Entered: 11/04/2024 04:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jackie Lackie v. Eric Noe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Richard Martin Pence Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M. Noe, Colonel, in his official capacity as District Engineer, Little Rock District, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Richard Martin Pence Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Richard Martin Pence Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Lackie
Represented By: Bruce Bob Tidwell
Represented By: Martin Aaron Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?