State of Washington, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: STATE OF WASHINGTON and STATE OF MINNESOTA
Intervenor - Pending,: DAVID GOLDEN
Defendant - Appellant,: DONALD J. TRUMP, President of the United States, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, REX W. TILLERSON, Secretary of State, JOHN F. KELLY, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Amicus Curiae,: STATE OF HAWAII
Amicus Curiae - Pending,: TECHNOLOGY COMPANIES AND OTHER BUSINESSES, FRED KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY, LAW PROFESSORS AND CLINICIANS, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, ACLU OF WASHINGTON, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, CONSTITUTIONAL SCHOLARS, HIAS, INC., SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER, ASISTA, LAW PROFESSORS, UNITED STATES JUSTICE FOUNDATION, CITIZENS UNITED, CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION, ENGLISH FIRST FOUNDATION, ENGLISH FIRST, PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, U.S. BORDER CONTROL FOUNDATION, POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER, WASHINGTON STATE LABOR COUNCIL, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, AMERICAN MUSLIM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, COUNCIL FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSLIM PROFESSIONALS, ISLAMIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, MUPPIES, INC., NATIONAL ARAB AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, NETWORK OF ARAB-AMERICAN PROFESSIONALS, FREEDOM WATCH, INC., JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER SEATTLE, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD, NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT, HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, KIND (KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE), TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA and PARTICIPATING LAW FIRMS OF THE EMPLOYMENT LAW ALLIANCE
Case Number: 17-35105
Filed: February 4, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
February 9, 2017 Summary Washington v. Trump
February 16, 2017 Summary Washington v. Trump
March 15, 2017 Summary Washington v. Trump
March 17, 2017 Summary STATE OF WASHINGTON V. DONALD J. TRUMP

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 192 MANDATE ISSUED. (WCC, RRC and MTF) [10370007] (CW) [Entered: 03/24/2017 07:55 AM]
March 17, 2017 191 Filed Order for PUBLICATION Amending Order Filed 3/15/17 (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) (Concurrence by Judge Reinhardt, Concurrence by Judge Berzon, Dissent by Judge Kozinski, Dissent by Judge Bybee and Dissent by Judge Bea - (SEE ATTACHED FOR FULL TEXT)) This court in a published order previously denied a motion of the government for a stay of a restraining order pending appeal. 847 F.3d 1151 (9th Cir. 2017). That order became moot when this court granted the government’s unopposed motion to dismiss its underlying appeal. Order, Mar. 8, 2017. No party has moved to vacate the published order. A judge of this court called for a vote to determine whether the court should grant en banc reconsideration in order to vacate the published order denying the stay. The matter failed to receive a majority of the votes of the active judges in favor of en banc reconsideration. Vacatur of the stay order is denied. See U.S. Bancorp Mortgage Co. v. Bonner Mall Partnership, 513 U.S. 18 (1994) (holding that the “extraordinary remedy of vacatur” is ordinarily unjustified when post-decision mootness is caused by voluntary action of the losing party). This order is being filed along with a concurrence from Judge Reinhardt, a concurrence from Judge Berzon, a dissent from Judge Kozinski, a dissent from Judge Bybee, and a dissent from Judge Bea. No further opinions will be filed. [10362285]--[Edited: Attached Webcite. 03/24/2017 by RY] (RMM) [Entered: 03/17/2017 05:57 PM]
March 15, 2017 190 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) (Concurrence by Judge Reinhardt, Dissent by Judge Bybee) This court in a published order previously denied a motion of the government for a stay of a restraining order pending appeal. 847 F.3d 1151 (9th Cir. 2017). That order became moot when this court granted the government's unopposed motion to dismiss its underlying appeal. Order, Mar. 8, 2017. No party has moved to vacate the published order. A judge of this court called for a vote to determine whether the court should grant en banc reconsideration in order to vacate the published order denying the stay. The matter failed to receive a majority of the votes of the active judges in favor of en banc reconsideration. Vacatur of the stay order is denied. See U.S. Bancorp Mortgage Co. v. Bonner Mall Partnership, 513 U.S. 18, (1994) (holding that the "extraordinary remedy of vacatur" is ordinarily unjustified when post-decision mootness is caused by voluntary action of the losing party). This order is being filed along with the concurrence of Judge Reinhardt and the dissent of Judge Bybee. Filings by other judges may follow. [10358462] (RMM) [Entered: 03/15/2017 05:36 PM]
March 13, 2017 189 Mail returned on 03/13/2017 addressed to Kim Blandino, re: Court order [180] filed on 02/27/2017. Returned envelope notes: return to sender - not at this address. Resending to: c/o 441 N. 16th St., Las Vegas, NV 89101. [10353948] (LA) [Entered: 03/13/2017 02:01 PM]
March 10, 2017 188 Received original and 0 copies of Intervenor - Pending James J. O'Hagan proposed intervenor brief (entitled "reply brief of real party in interest") of 15 pages. Major deficiencies: case is closed. (motion to intervene filed at DE [150]) [10352257] (LA) [Entered: 03/10/2017 02:12 PM]
March 8, 2017 187 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) Appellants’ unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. [186]) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). By agreement of the parties, costs in the amount of $126.36 are taxed to appellants. DISMISSED. [10348237] (ME) [Entered: 03/08/2017 11:33 AM]
March 7, 2017 186 Filed (ECF) Appellants USDHS, USA, Donald J. Trump, Rex W. Tillerson and John F. Kelly Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 03/07/2017. [10347147] [17-35105] (Swingle, Sharon) [Entered: 03/07/2017 03:12 PM]
March 6, 2017 185 Filed Intervenor - Pending James J. O'Hagan motion to reconsider allowing him to join lawsuit as a real party in interest. Deficiencies:party has a pending motion to intervene at DE 150. Served on 02/24/2017. [10346420] (CW) [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:18 PM]
March 6, 2017 184 Filed (ECF) Appellants Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, USA, USDHS and John F. Kelly citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/06/2017. [10343708] [17-35105] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 03/06/2017 10:08 AM]
March 6, 2017 183 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Citation attached to Correct Entry: [184]. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, USA and USDHS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/06/2017. [10343697] [17-35105] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 03/06/2017 10:05 AM]
March 3, 2017 182 Mail returned on 03/03/2017 addressed to Kim Blandino, re: Court orders [156], [157], [158] filed on 02/16/2017. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not at this address. Resending to: c/o 441 N. 16th St., Las Vegas, NV 89101. [10342391] (LA) [Entered: 03/03/2017 01:32 PM]
February 27, 2017 181 Mail returned on 02/27/2017 addressed to Kim Blandino, re: Court order [152] filed on 02/15/2017. Returned envelope notes: return to sender - not at this address. Resending to: c/o 441 N. 16th St., Las Vegas, NV 89101. [10334295]--[Edited: address updated. 02/27/2017 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 02/27/2017 12:24 PM]
February 27, 2017 180 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) Appellants’ motion to hold this appeal in abeyance is denied (Docket Entry No. [178]). On our own motion, we extend the briefing schedule for this appeal. The opening brief is due March 10, 2017; the answering brief is due March 31, 2017; and the optional reply brief is due April 5, 2017. [10334017] (ME) [Entered: 02/27/2017 10:52 AM]
February 24, 2017 179 Filed (ECF) Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota response opposing motion ([178] Motion (ECF Filing), [178] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay appellate proceedings). Date of service: 02/24/2017. [10333108] [17-35105] (Egeler, Anne) [Entered: 02/24/2017 03:39 PM]
February 24, 2017 178 Filed (ECF) Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, USA and USDHS Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 02/24/2017. [10331849] [17-35105] (Swingle, Sharon) [Entered: 02/24/2017 09:06 AM]
February 22, 2017 177 Received original and 0 copies of Amicus Curiae - Pending Anthony P. Keyter amicus brief of 8 pages (brief combined with motion). Served on 02/16/2017. Deficiencies: None. Reason not filed: motion to become amicus is pending. [10329735] (LA) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:45 PM]
February 22, 2017 176 Filed Amicus Curiae - Pending Anthony P. Keyter motion to become amicus curiae (motion contained within amicus brief). Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/16/2017. [10329705] (LA) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:38 PM]
February 17, 2017 175 Added attorney Eileen Morrison, Joshua M. Daniels, Kevin Paul Martin, Nicholas Mitrokostas, William B. Brady for Iranian Alliances Across Borders Foundation for the Children of Iran, in case 17-35105. [10324757] (CW) [Entered: 02/17/2017 01:54 PM]
February 17, 2017 174 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Eileen L. Morrison for Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10324514] [17-35105] (Morrison, Eileen) [Entered: 02/17/2017 12:44 PM]
February 17, 2017 173 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua M. Daniels for Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10324504] [17-35105] (Daniels, Joshua) [Entered: 02/17/2017 12:41 PM]
February 17, 2017 172 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William B. Brady for Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10324496] [17-35105] (Brady, William) [Entered: 02/17/2017 12:38 PM]
February 17, 2017 171 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nicholas K. Mitrokostas for Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10324492] [17-35105] (Mitrokostas, Nicholas) [Entered: 02/17/2017 12:35 PM]
February 17, 2017 170 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin P. Martin for Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10324483] [17-35105] (Martin, Kevin) [Entered: 02/17/2017 12:29 PM]
February 17, 2017 169 Received 20 paper copies of Amicus Brief [155] filed by U.S. Justice Foundation, et al. [10324260] (LA) [Entered: 02/17/2017 11:04 AM]
February 17, 2017 168 Received 20 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [154] filed by Donald J. Trump, et al. [10324248] (LA) [Entered: 02/17/2017 11:00 AM]
February 17, 2017 167 Received 20 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [153] filed by State of Minnesota and State of Washington. [10324232] (LA) [Entered: 02/17/2017 10:57 AM]
February 17, 2017 166 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Constitutional Scholars Correspondence: Providing copy of brief filed in Darweesh v. Trump, 17-cv-480 (E.D.N.Y.). Date of service: 02/17/2017 [10323844] [17-35105] (Shields, Rasha) [Entered: 02/17/2017 09:04 AM]
February 16, 2017 165 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Professor Victor Williams, Pro Se, Chair of America First Lawyers Association. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10323638]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entries [162] and [163].] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 06:12 PM]
February 16, 2017 164 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Victor K. Williams. [10323637] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 06:07 PM]
February 16, 2017 163 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [165]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professor Victor Williams, Pro Se, Chair of America First Lawyers Association. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10323628] [17-35105] (Williams, Victor) [Entered: 02/16/2017 05:46 PM]
February 16, 2017 162 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [165]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Professor Victor Williams, Pro Se, Chair of America First Lawyers Assocatiion Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10323626] [17-35105] (Williams, Victor) [Entered: 02/16/2017 05:42 PM]
February 16, 2017 161 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS): The United States has represented to the Court that the President intends to issue a new Executive Order and has urged the Court to “hold its consideration of the case until the President issues the new Order.” The United States has further represented that it will inform the Court of any new developments. En banc proceedings before this Court are stayed pending further Order of this Court. [10323604] --[Edited: Order corrected to add "For Publication". 02/17/2017 by TYL] (SVG) [Entered: 02/16/2017 05:32 PM]
February 16, 2017 160 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. [10322667] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 01:16 PM]
February 16, 2017 159 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by The Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10322616] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/16/2017 by LA] (Martin, Kevin) [Entered: 02/16/2017 12:39 PM]
February 16, 2017 158 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [155] submitted by U.S. Justice Foundation, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, English First Foundation, English First, Public Advocate of the United States, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, U.S. Border Control Foundation, and Policy Analysis Center is filed. Amici are ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time on Friday, February 17, 2017, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10322411] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 11:23 AM]
February 16, 2017 157 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [154] submitted by Donald J. Trump, et al. is filed. Appellants are ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time on Friday, February 17, 2017, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10322383] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 11:13 AM]
February 16, 2017 156 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [153] submitted by State of Minnesota and State of Washington is filed. Appellees are ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time on Friday, February 17, 2017, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10322335] (LA) [Entered: 02/16/2017 11:01 AM]
February 16, 2017 155 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by U.S. Justice Foundation, et al.. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10322327] [17-35105] (Titus, Herbert) [Entered: 02/16/2017 10:59 AM]
February 16, 2017 154 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants USDHS, USA, Donald J. Trump, Rex W. Tillerson and John F. Kelly. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10322287] [17-35105] (Swingle, Sharon) [Entered: 02/16/2017 10:49 AM]
February 16, 2017 153 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10322280] [17-35105] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/16/2017 10:47 AM]
February 15, 2017 152 Filed clerk order: The motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. at Docket Entry No. [144] is stricken as unnecessary. See 9th Circuit Rule 29-2(a). The amicus curiae brief in support of en banc review of appellants-defendants’ emergency motion for stay pending appeal submitted by Freedom Watch, Inc. at Docket Entry No. [145] is stricken because a replacement brief was submitted at Docket Entry No. [149]. [10320344] (LA) [Entered: 02/15/2017 10:18 AM]
February 15, 2017 151 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending State of Texas. [10320211] (LA) [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:36 AM]
February 15, 2017 149 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Freedom Watch, Inc.. Date of service: 02/15/2017. [10320156] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:18 AM]
February 15, 2017 148 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Freedom Watch, Inc. Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 02/15/2017. [10320148] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:16 AM]
February 15, 2017 146 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae, Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by State of Texas. Date of service: 02/15/2017. [10320027] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to add second motion relief. 02/15/2017 by LA] (Keller, Scott) [Entered: 02/15/2017 08:28 AM]
February 14, 2017 150 Filed James O'Hagan motion to intervene. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/25/2017. [10320161] (CW) [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:20 AM]
February 14, 2017 147 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending James J. O'Hagan. [10320140] (CW) [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:14 AM]
February 14, 2017 145 STRICKEN PER ORDER [152]. Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Freedom Watch, Inc.. Date of service: 02/14/2017. [10319752] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/14/2017 04:20 PM]
February 14, 2017 144 STRICKEN PER ORDER [152]. Filed (ECF) Freedom Watch, Inc. Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/14/2017. [10319747] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/14/2017 04:18 PM]
February 14, 2017 143 Received original and 0 copies of Amicus Curiae - Pending Kim Blandino amicus brief in 10 pages. Served on 02/13/2017. Deficiencies: None. Reason not filed: motion to become amicus is pending. [10319489] (LA) [Entered: 02/14/2017 03:00 PM]
February 14, 2017 142 Filed Amicus Curiae - Pending Kim Blandino motion to become amicus curiae. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/13/2017. [10319458] (LA) [Entered: 02/14/2017 02:53 PM]
February 13, 2017 141 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending Ali Plaintiffs. [10316507] (CW) [Entered: 02/13/2017 08:58 AM]
February 11, 2017 140 Filed (ECF) Motion to intervene. Date of service: 02/11/2017. [10316343] [17-35105] (Adams, Matt) [Entered: 02/11/2017 03:26 PM]
February 10, 2017 139 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS): A judge on this Court has made a sua sponte request that a vote be taken as to whether the order issued by the three judge motions panel on February 9, 2017, should be reconsidered en banc. A sua sponte en banc call having been made, the parties are instructed to file simultaneous briefs setting forth their respective positions on whether this matter should be reconsidered en banc. The briefs should be filed on or before 11:00 a.m., Pacific time, on Thursday, February 16. The supplemental briefs shall be filed electronically and consist of no more than 14,000 words. See General Order 5.4(c)(3). [10315878] (HH) [Entered: 02/10/2017 02:52 PM]
February 9, 2017 138 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Skycatch, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/09/2017. [10314618] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF. 02/10/2017 by LA] (Dake, Erin-Leigh) [Entered: 02/09/2017 06:01 PM]
February 9, 2017 137 Terminated Intervenor - Pending David Golden in 17-35105 [10313119] (AF) [Entered: 02/09/2017 04:03 PM]
February 9, 2017 136 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by WHOmentors.com, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/09/2017. [10311526] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF, resent notice. 02/09/2017 by LA] (Kimmey, Karen) [Entered: 02/09/2017 03:22 PM]
February 9, 2017 135 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) The motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefs, to file a substitute or amended amicus curiae brief, and for an extension of time to file an amicus curiae brief, are granted (Docket Entry Nos. [19], [20], [22], [24], [26], [43], [49], [53], [55], [58], [62], [65], [66], [68], [69], [76], [79], [82], [87], [90], [91], [103], [113], [132]). In light of the filing of a corrected amicus brief, the motions at Docket Entry Nos. [23] and [25] are denied as moot. David Golden’s motion to intervene is denied (Docket Entry No. [112]). Any motion for reconsideration or reconsideration en banc of the court’s February 9, 2017 order denying the motion for stay is due within 14 days. See 9th Cir. R. 27-10(a)(2). If a motion for reconsideration or reconsideration en banc is filed, a response to the motion shall be filed within 7 days after service of the motion. See 9th Cir. R. 27-10(b). The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal: the opening brief is due March 3, 2017; the answering brief is due March 24, 2017; and the optional reply brief is due March 29, 2017. MOATT [10310977] (SVG) [Entered: 02/09/2017 03:08 PM]
February 9, 2017 134 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) At issue in this emergency proceeding is Executive Order 13769, “Protecting the Nation From Foreign Terrorist Entry Into the United States,” which, among other changes to immigration policies and procedures, bans for 90 days the entry into the United States of individuals from seven countries. Two States challenged the Executive Order as unconstitutional and violative of federal law, and a federal district court preliminarily ruled in their favor and temporarily enjoined enforcement of the Executive Order. The Government now moves for an emergency stay of the district court’s temporary restraining order while its appeal of that order proceeds. ( SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) For the foregoing reasons, the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal is DENIED. [10310971] (RMM) [Entered: 02/09/2017 03:08 PM]
February 9, 2017 133 Received original and 1 copy of Amicus Curiae - Pending Daniel O. Escamilla amicus brief in 11 pages. Served on 02/08/2017. Deficiencies: None. Reason not filed: motion to become amicus is pending. [10309179] (LA) [Entered: 02/09/2017 02:11 PM]
February 9, 2017 132 Filed Amicus Curiae - Pending Daniel O. Escamilla motion to become amicus curiae. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/08/2017. [10309160] (LA) [Entered: 02/09/2017 02:05 PM]
February 9, 2017 131 Filed (ECF) Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota Correspondence: Notice to Court of filing of additional evidence in the district court.. Date of service: 02/09/2017 [10308987] [17-35105] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/09/2017 01:10 PM]
February 9, 2017 130 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Redfin Corporation, joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/09/2017. [10308616] [17-35105] (DeMarchi, Virginia) [Entered: 02/09/2017 10:52 AM]
February 8, 2017 129 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by MongoDB, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/08/2017. [10307838] [17-35105] (Bish, Dale) [Entered: 02/08/2017 03:52 PM]
February 8, 2017 128 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by DiCentral Corporation, joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/08/2017. [10306911] [17-35105] (Le, Huan) [Entered: 02/08/2017 10:18 AM]
February 8, 2017 127 Added attorney Paul Whitfield Hughes for Technology Companies and Other Businesses, in case 17-35105. [10306665] (CW) [Entered: 02/08/2017 08:38 AM]
February 8, 2017 126 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul Whitfield Hughes for Amicus Curiae - Pending Technology Companies and Other Businesses. Date of service: 02/08/2017. [10306619] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/08/2017 08:11 AM]
February 7, 2017 125 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND. [10306480] (SVG) [Entered: 02/07/2017 05:32 PM]
February 7, 2017 124 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/[10306478] (SVG) [Entered: 02/07/2017 05:22 PM]
February 7, 2017 123 Filed (ECF) Errata to Amicus Brief ([113] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing), [113] Motion (ECF Filing), [113] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus). Filed by Amicus Curiae - Pending Participating Law Firms of the Employment Law Alliance. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10306462] [17-35105] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 02/07/2017 05:06 PM]
February 7, 2017 122 Added attorney Jennifer Robbins for Washington State Labor Council, in case 17-35105. [10306451] (JFF) [Entered: 02/07/2017 04:59 PM]
February 7, 2017 121 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jennifer L. Robbins for Amicus Curiae - Pending Washington State Labor Council. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10306424] [17-35105] (Robbins, Jennifer) [Entered: 02/07/2017 04:44 PM]
February 7, 2017 120 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by GoDaddy, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10306288] [17-35105] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached recorrected letter. 2/7/2017 by TYL] (McKown, Aaron) [Entered: 02/07/2017 03:52 PM]
February 7, 2017 119 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by OneLogin, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10306284] [17-35105] (Martin, Kevin) [Entered: 02/07/2017 03:51 PM]
February 7, 2017 118 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by TECHNOLOGY AND OTHER START-UPS AMICI, joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/02/2017. [10306139] [17-35105] (Calafiore Healy, Valeria) [Entered: 02/07/2017 03:01 PM]
February 7, 2017 117 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Medidata Solutions, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10306109] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 02:51 PM]
February 7, 2017 116 Added attorney Michelle R. Lapointe for Southern Poverty Law Center, in case 17-35105. [10305972] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 02:22 PM]
February 7, 2017 115 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Participating Law Firms of the Employment Law Alliance. [10305951] (LA) [Entered: 02/07/2017 02:18 PM]
February 7, 2017 114 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: PA): CNN applied to live stream and record for later broadcast, the case captioned above, scheduled to be telephonically argued on Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. CNN’s request is GRANTED. CNN will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application to stream live audio. [10305917] (PA) [Entered: 02/07/2017 02:10 PM]
February 7, 2017 113 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Law Firms of the Employment Law Alliance. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305896] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached motion, resent notice. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 02/07/2017 02:02 PM]
February 7, 2017 112 Filed Intervenor - Pending pro se David Golden motion to intervene. Deficiencies: None. Served on. [10305888]--[Edited: removed fax cover sheet and redacted phone number from first page. 02/07/2017 by RY and SVG] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:57 PM]
February 7, 2017 111 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending David Golden. [10305884] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:55 PM]
February 7, 2017 110 Featured Case Received copy of District Court order filed on 02/07/2017 - ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction no later than 11:59pm Pacific Standard Time on 2/9/17; defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiffs' motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/15/17; plaintiffs to file their reply in support of their motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/17/17 by Judge James L. Robart. . [10305858] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:44 PM]
February 7, 2017 109 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michelle R. Lapointe for Amicus Curiae - Pending Southern Poverty Law Center. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305848] [17-35105] (Lapointe, Michelle) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:42 PM]
February 7, 2017 108 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [113]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Participating Law Firms of the Employment Law Alliance Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305658] [17-35105] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:02 PM]
February 7, 2017 107 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending State of New Hampshire and State of North Carolina. [10305612] (LA) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:36 PM]
February 7, 2017 106 Added attorney Jonathan Scott Goldman for State of Pennsylvania, in case 17-35105. [10305606] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:34 PM]
February 7, 2017 105 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan Scott Goldman for Amicus Curiae - Pending State of Pennsylvania. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305569] [17-35105] (Goldman, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:20 PM]
February 7, 2017 104 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by SpotHero, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305547] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached PDF with corrected signature, resent notice. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:11 PM]
February 7, 2017 103 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Iowa, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, New Hampshire, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and the District of Columbia. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305544] [17-35105] (Nadeau, Genevieve) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:09 PM]
February 7, 2017 102 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by SoundCloud, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305526] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF, resent notice. 02/17/2017 by LA] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/07/2017 12:00 PM]
February 7, 2017 101 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305428] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF with incorrect ECF header removed, resent notice. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 11:30 AM]
February 7, 2017 100 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Credo Mobile, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305403] [17-35105] (Grenfell, John) [Entered: 02/07/2017 11:22 AM]
February 7, 2017 99 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Quantcast Corp., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305269] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 10:41 AM]
February 7, 2017 98 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle, American Immigration Council, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), and Tahirih Justice Center. [10305156] (LA) [Entered: 02/07/2017 10:14 AM]
February 7, 2017 97 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Molecule Software, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305087] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 09:55 AM]
February 7, 2017 96 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Fitbit, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10305081] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 09:53 AM]
February 7, 2017 95 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Postmates Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10304892] [17-35105] (Hughes, Paul) [Entered: 02/07/2017 08:46 AM]
February 7, 2017 94 Added attorney August E. Flentje for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS Donald J. Trump, in case 17-35105. [10304781] (CW) [Entered: 02/07/2017 07:16 AM]
February 7, 2017 93 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of August E. Flentje for Appellants USA, USDHS, Donald J. Trump, Rex W. Tillerson and John F. Kelly. Date of service: 02/07/2017. [10304771] [17-35105] (Flentje, August) [Entered: 02/07/2017 06:51 AM]
February 7, 2017 92 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Exhibits attached to entry with brief [91]. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [91]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Immigration Council, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), and Tahirih Justice Center. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304763] [17-35105] (Mincer, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/07/2017 01:48 AM]
February 6, 2017 91 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Immigration Council, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, Human Rights First, KIND (Kids in Need of Defense), and Tahirih Justice Center. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304762] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached exhibits (originally submitted in entry [92]), resent notice. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Mincer, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:59 PM]
February 6, 2017 90 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304753] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached separate PDF files of motion and brief. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Udo, Chandler) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:05 PM]
February 6, 2017 89 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MCD): The previous order regarding live streaming of the oral argument scheduled for February 7, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. PST is clarified as follows: The live audio stream can be accessed on the court’s public web site at the bottom of the page under the subheading “Live Streaming Oral Arguments,” or from the “Cases of Interest Page” nearer the top through the following link: http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/view_video.php?pk_vid=0000010884 Because the hearing will be conducted telephonically, the stream is audio only and there will be no courtroom proceedings or associated video feed. [10304733] (SVG) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:22 PM]
February 6, 2017 88 Terminated Claire Loebs Davis for Law Professors and Clinicians (added in error due to incorrect notice of appearance [47]), Jessica Walder for Law Professors and Clinicians (added in error due to incorrect notice of appearance [51], Jennifer Lee Robbins for Washington State Labor Council (for failure to register for CM/ECF). [10304670] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 05:20 PM]
February 6, 2017 87 Filed (ECF) Freedom Watch, Inc. Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304659] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/06/2017 05:08 PM]
February 6, 2017 86 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Council for the Advancement of Muslim Professionals, Islamic Medical Association of North America, Muppies, Inc., National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab-American Professionals, and Freedom Watch, Inc. [10304644] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 04:58 PM]
February 6, 2017 85 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MD): The oral argument scheduled for Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. PST will be available for live streaming through the court’s public website, https://www.ca9.uscourts.gov. [10304546] (ME) [Entered: 02/06/2017 04:26 PM]
February 6, 2017 84 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Freedom Watch, Inc.. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304535] [17-35105] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/06/2017 04:23 PM]
February 6, 2017 83 Added attorney Richard D. Barton for Anti-Defamation League, in case 17-35105. [10304488] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 04:10 PM]
February 6, 2017 82 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Council for the Advancement of American Muslim Professionals, Islamic Medical Association of North America, Muppies, Inc. National Arab American Medical Association, et al.. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304360] [17-35105] (Ware, Anton) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:37 PM]
February 6, 2017 81 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending USJF, Citizens United, CUF, English First Foundation, English First, Public Advocate of the United States, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, U.S. Border Control Foundation, Policy Analysis Center, and Washington State Labor Council. [10304318] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:29 PM]
February 6, 2017 80 COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [44]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS-APPELLEES. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304229] [17-35105] (Barton, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:09 PM]
February 6, 2017 79 Filed (ECF) Anti-Defamation League Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 02/06/2017. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304213] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached declaration (incorrectly filed in entry [80]), updated docket text to include name of amicus, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Barton, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:06 PM]
February 6, 2017 78 Added attorney Edwin Smiley Kneedler for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS Donald J. Trump, in case 17-35105. [10304201] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:04 PM]
February 6, 2017 77 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) The State of Hawaii’s emergency motion to intervene (Docket Entry No. [21]) is denied for the purposes of this appeal only. The State of Hawaii’s motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief (Docket Entry No. [21]) is granted. The State of Hawaii’s amicus brief has been filed. Appellants and appellees shall appear by telephone for oral argument on Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. PST. Each side will be permitted 30 minutes of argument time. Call-in instructions will be provided to the appearing parties. A recording of the oral argument will be made available to the public promptly following the conclusion of oral argument. All other pending motions will be addressed by separate order. [10304200] (ME) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:04 PM]
February 6, 2017 76 Filed (ECF) Anti-Defamation League Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304197] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to include name of amicus. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Barton, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:03 PM]
February 6, 2017 75 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Groupon, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304196] [17-35105] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:03 PM]
February 6, 2017 74 Added attorney Jessica Walder for Law Professors, in case 17-35105. [10304188] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 03:01 PM]
February 6, 2017 73 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edwin S. Kneedler for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304160] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:54 PM]
February 6, 2017 72 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica N. Walder for Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304155] [17-35105] (Davis, Claire) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:53 PM]
February 6, 2017 71 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Claire Loebs Davis for Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304151] [17-35105] (Davis, Claire) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:52 PM]
February 6, 2017 70 Filed (ECF) Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, USA and USDHS reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304146] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:52 PM]
February 6, 2017 69 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Washington State Labor Council. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304141] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached separate PDFs of motion and brief, updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Iglitzin, Dmitri) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:51 PM]
February 6, 2017 68 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by US Justice Fndn, Citizens United, Citizens United Fndn, English First Fndn, English First, Public Advocate of the US, Gun Owners Fndn, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, US Border Control Fndn & Policy Analysis Center. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304130] [17-35105] (Titus, Herbert) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:48 PM]
February 6, 2017 67 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending NIJC, ASISTA and Law Professors. [10304120] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:46 PM]
February 6, 2017 66 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Law Professors. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304086] [17-35105] (Davis, Claire) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:38 PM]
February 6, 2017 65 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by National Immigrant Justice Center and ASISTA. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304057] [17-35105] (Roth, Charles) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:31 PM]
February 6, 2017 64 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Additional Technology Companies and Other Businesses, joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10304032] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to clarify filers. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:26 PM]
February 6, 2017 63 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending American Center for Law and Justice. [10304031] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:26 PM]
February 6, 2017 62 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Center for Law and Justice. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303974] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/06/2017 by LA]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected motion. 02/07/2017 by SLM] (Zimmerman, Erik) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:13 PM]
February 6, 2017 61 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending HIAS, Inc., Service Employees International Union, State of New York, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, and District of Columbia. [10303973] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 02:13 PM]
February 6, 2017 60 Added attorney Jessica Walder for Law Professors and Clinicians, in case 17-35105. [10303866] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:40 PM]
February 6, 2017 59 Added attorney Robert A. Johnson for Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality, in case 17-35105. [10303857] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:37 PM]
February 6, 2017 58 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, District of Columbia, Iowa, Illinois, Maryland, Maine, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Virginia, and Vermont. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303835] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDFs with signatures added, resent notice. 02/07/2017 by LA] (Nadeau, Genevieve) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:32 PM]
February 6, 2017 57 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert Alan Johnson for Amicus Curiae - Pending Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303799] [17-35105] (Johnson, Robert) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:20 PM]
February 6, 2017 56 Filed (ECF) joinder letter in lieu of amicus brief pursuant to Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 29-1. Filed by Pivotal Software, Inc., joining in brief(s) [19]. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303796] [17-35105] (Block, Micah) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:20 PM]
February 6, 2017 55 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Service Employees International Union. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303775] [17-35105] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:14 PM]
February 6, 2017 54 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Genevieve Clair Nadeau for Amici Curiae - Pending Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, District of Columbia, Iowa, Illinois, Maryland, Maine, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Virginia, and Vermont. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303720] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers (see [61]). 02/06/2017 by SLM] (Nadeau, Genevieve) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:04 PM]
February 6, 2017 53 Filed (ECF) HIAS, INC Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303671] [17-35105] (Stein, Robert) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:41 PM]
February 6, 2017 52 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Anti-Defamation League and Constitutional Scholars. [10303663] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:38 PM]
February 6, 2017 51 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Per filer's request, wrong party selected. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [72]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica N. Walder for Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors and Clinicians. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303615] [17-35105] (Walder, Jessica) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:11 PM]
February 6, 2017 50 Added Attorney Noel Francisco for DHS USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson Donald J. Trump, in case 17-35105. [10303583] (RY) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:02 PM]
February 6, 2017 49 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors and Clinicians Motion for miscellaneous relief [Unopposed Motion to Substitute Corrected Amici Brief and Corrected Motion for Leave to File Amici Brief on behalf of Law Professors and Clinicians]. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303575] [17-35105] (Marouf, Fatma) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:00 PM]
February 6, 2017 48 Added attorney Claire Loebs Davis for Law Professors and Clinicians, in case 17-35105. [10303550] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:53 AM]
February 6, 2017 47 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Per filer's request, wrong party selected. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [71]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Claire Loebs Davis for Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors and Clinicians. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303525] [17-35105] (Davis, Claire) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:47 AM]
February 6, 2017 46 Added attorney Robert Seungchul Chang for Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality, in case 17-35105. [10303519] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:46 AM]
February 6, 2017 45 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert S. Chang for Amicus Curiae - Pending Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303491] [17-35105] (Chang, Robert) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:42 AM]
February 6, 2017 44 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Anti-Defamation League. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303410] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of brief (motion removed and refiled in entry [79]), updated docket text to clarify filer, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Hall, Kendra) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:24 AM]
February 6, 2017 43 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Constitutional Scholars. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303342] [17-35105] (Shields, Rasha) [Entered: 02/06/2017 11:01 AM]
February 6, 2017 42 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending ACLU. [10303315] (LA) [Entered: 02/06/2017 10:50 AM]
February 6, 2017 41 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica M. Weisel for Amicus Curiae - Pending Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303299] [17-35105] (Weisel, Jessica) [Entered: 02/06/2017 10:43 AM]
February 6, 2017 40 Added attorney Alan I. Gilbert for State of Minnesota, in case 17-35105. [10303184] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 09:59 AM]
February 6, 2017 39 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan Isaac Gilbert for Appellee State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303153] [17-35105] (Gilbert, Alan) [Entered: 02/06/2017 09:50 AM]
February 6, 2017 38 Added attorney Jacob Campion for State of Minnesota, in case 17-35105. [10303124] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 09:39 AM]
February 6, 2017 37 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jacob Daniel Campion for Appellee State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10303118] [17-35105] (Campion, Jacob) [Entered: 02/06/2017 09:35 AM]
February 6, 2017 36 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending ACLU-WA. [10302967] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:30 AM]
February 6, 2017 35 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Americans United For Separation Of Church And State, Southern Poverty Law Center. [10302962] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:26 AM]
February 6, 2017 34 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Professors and Clinicians. [10302955] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:22 AM]
February 6, 2017 33 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. [10302948] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:19 AM]
February 6, 2017 32 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Fred Korematsu Center For Law and Equality. [10302945] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:15 AM]
February 6, 2017 31 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Technology Companies and Other Businesses. [10302939] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 08:11 AM]
February 6, 2017 30 Added attorney Noah G. Purcell for State of Washington, in case 17-35105. [10302903] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2017 07:17 AM]
February 6, 2017 29 Filed (ECF) Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota Correspondence: Declaration and exhibits in support of response to motion [28]. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302893] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 02/06/2017 by SLM] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:59 AM]
February 6, 2017 28 Filed (ECF) Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota response opposing motion ([14] Motion (ECF Filing), [14] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302892] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of exhibits with redacted version. 02/07/2017 by RY] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:51 AM]
February 6, 2017 27 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by HIAS, INC.. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302891] [17-35105] (Stein, Robert) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:47 AM]
February 6, 2017 26 Filed (ECF) Americans United for Separation of Church and State; Southern Poverty Law Center Second Corrected Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302890] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Katskee, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:44 AM]
February 6, 2017 25 Filed (ECF) Americans United for Separation of Church and State; Southern Poverty Law Center Corrected Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302889] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Katskee, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:32 AM]
February 6, 2017 24 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Washington. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302888] [17-35105] (Chiang, Emily) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:30 AM]
February 6, 2017 23 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Americans United for Separation of Church and State; Southern Poverty Law Center. Date of service: 02/06/2017. [10302887] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Katskee, Richard) [Entered: 02/06/2017 12:23 AM]
February 5, 2017 22 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Law Professors and Clinicians. Date of service: 02/05/2017. [10302885] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by LA] (Marouf, Fatma) [Entered: 02/05/2017 09:56 PM]
February 5, 2017 21 Filed (ECF) State of Hawai'i Motion to intervene and response opposing motion (motion to stay lower court action) [14]. Date of service: 02/05/2017. [10302884] [17-35105]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 02/06/2017 by ASW] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 02/05/2017 09:55 PM]
February 5, 2017 20 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Fred T. Korematsu Center For Law And Equity. Date of service: 02/05/2017. [10302882] [17-35105] (Weisel, Jessica) [Entered: 02/05/2017 09:42 PM]
February 5, 2017 19 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Technology Companies and Other Businesses. Date of service: 02/05/2017. [10302881] [17-35105] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 02/05/2017 09:38 PM]
February 5, 2017 18 Appellant DHS in 17-35105 substituted by Appellant Department of Homeland Security in 17-35105 [10302857] (SVG) [Entered: 02/05/2017 01:41 PM]
February 5, 2017 17 Added attorney Marsha J. Chien, Patricio Antonio Marquez for State of Washington State of Minnesota, in case 17-35105. [10302856] (SVG) [Entered: 02/05/2017 01:30 PM]
February 5, 2017 16 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MD): Due to regularly scheduled maintenance of the court’s electronic filing system (CM/ECF) on Sundays from 10:00 p.m. until midnight, appellees may file their opposition to the pending emergency motion no later than 1:00 a.m. P.S.T on Monday, February 6, 2017. Appellees’ reply remains due on Monday, February 6, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. P.S.T. [10302855] (KD) [Entered: 02/05/2017 01:05 PM]
February 4, 2017 15 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND): The court has received appellants’ emergency motion (Docket Entry No. 14). Appellants’ request for an immediate administrative stay pending full consideration of the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal is denied. Appellees’ opposition to the emergency motion is due Sunday, February 5, 2017 at 11:59 p.m. PST. Appellants’ reply in support of the emergency motion is due Monday, February 6, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. PST. [10302848] (AT) [Entered: 02/04/2017 11:46 PM]
February 4, 2017 14 Filed (ECF) Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302845] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/04/2017 09:17 PM]
February 4, 2017 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Patricio A. Marquez for Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302844] [17-35105] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/04/2017 08:32 PM]
February 4, 2017 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marsha Chien for Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302843] [17-35105] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/04/2017 08:30 PM]
February 4, 2017 11 Added attorney Catherine H. Dorsey, Lowell Sturgill Jr., Sharon Swingle, Douglas Neal Letter, H. Thomas Byron III for DHS USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson Donald J. Trump, in case 17-35105. [10302842] (SVG) [Entered: 02/04/2017 08:15 PM]
February 4, 2017 10 Added attorney Anne E. Egeler, Noah G. Purcell for State of Washington State of Minnesota, in case 17-35105. [10302841] (SVG) [Entered: 02/04/2017 08:11 PM]
February 4, 2017 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of H. Thomas Byron for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302838] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:56 PM]
February 4, 2017 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Douglas N. Letter for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302837] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:54 PM]
February 4, 2017 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Catherine H. Dorsey for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302836] [17-35105] (Dorsey, Catherine) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:53 PM]
February 4, 2017 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sharon Swingle for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302835] [17-35105] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:48 PM]
February 4, 2017 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302834] [17-35105] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:46 PM]
February 4, 2017 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Noel J. Francisco for Appellants DHS, John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302833] [17-35105] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 02/04/2017 06:45 PM]
February 4, 2017 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anne E. Egeler for Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302832] [17-35105] (Egeler, Anne) [Entered: 02/04/2017 05:58 PM]
February 4, 2017 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Noah G. Purcell for Appellees State of Washington and State of Minnesota. Date of service: 02/04/2017. [10302830] [17-35105] (Purcell, Noah) [Entered: 02/04/2017 05:44 PM]
February 4, 2017 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The briefing schedule will be established by separate order pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3. [10302823] (SVG) [Entered: 02/04/2017 04:53 PM]

Search for this case: State of Washington, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Represented By: Anne E. Egeler
Represented By: Patricio Antonio Marquez
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Represented By: Anne E. Egeler
Represented By: Patricio Antonio Marquez
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Jacob Campion
Represented By: Alan I. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor - pending,: DAVID GOLDEN
Represented By: David Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: DONALD J. TRUMP, President of the United States
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron
Represented By: Catherine H. Dorsey
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Noel Francisco
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron
Represented By: Catherine H. Dorsey
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Noel Francisco
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: REX W. TILLERSON, Secretary of State
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron
Represented By: Catherine H. Dorsey
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Noel Francisco
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: JOHN F. KELLY, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron
Represented By: Catherine H. Dorsey
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Noel Francisco
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron
Represented By: Catherine H. Dorsey
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Noel Francisco
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: TECHNOLOGY COMPANIES AND OTHER BUSINESSES
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: FRED KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Robert A. Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Weisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: LAW PROFESSORS AND CLINICIANS
Represented By: Fatma Essam Marouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ACLU OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Shelley A. Carder
Represented By: Kendra J. Hall
Represented By: Richard D. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: CONSTITUTIONAL SCHOLARS
Represented By: Meir Feder
Represented By: Rasha Gerges Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: HIAS, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Represented By: Erik Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ASISTA
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: UNITED STATES JUSTICE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: CITIZENS UNITED
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ENGLISH FIRST FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ENGLISH FIRST
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: U.S. BORDER CONTROL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: WASHINGTON STATE LABOR COUNCIL
Represented By: Kathleen Phair Barnard
Represented By: Dmitri Iglitzin
Represented By: Jennifer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: MUSLIM ADVOCATES
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: AMERICAN MUSLIM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: COUNCIL FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSLIM PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: ISLAMIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: MUPPIES, INC.
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: NATIONAL ARAB AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: NETWORK OF ARAB-AMERICAN PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: Anton A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: FREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER SEATTLE
Represented By: Matthew P. Bergman
Represented By: Chandler H. Udo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: KIND (KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE)
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jonathan Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: PARTICIPATING LAW FIRMS OF THE EMPLOYMENT LAW ALLIANCE
Represented By: Natasha Julie Baker
Represented By: Alison Megan Hamer
Represented By: Patricia Kay Runkles-Pearson
Represented By: Mary Ellen Simonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?