Al Otro Lado, et al v. Chad Wolf, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: VICTORIA DOE, MARIA DOE, JOSE DOE, AL OTRO LADO, a California corporation, BEATRICE DOE, URSULA DOE, ABIGAIL DOE, EMILIANA DOE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, CAROLINA DOE, BIANCA DOE, CESAR DOE, DINORA DOE, ROBERTO DOE, INGRID DOE and JUAN DOE
Defendant / Appellant: TODD C. OWEN, Executive Assistant Commissioner, Office of Field Operations, United States Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity, MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection and CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 19-56417
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 20, 2019 Summary AL OTRO LADO V. CHAD WOLF

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alexander James Halaska (U.S. Department of Justice, P.O. Box, 868, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellants Mark A. Morgan, Todd C. Owen and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 12/07/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11524651] [19-56417] (Halaska, Alexander) [Entered: 12/07/2019 06:13 AM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction, C.R. 3-3. [11522115] (JBS) [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Otro Lado, et al v. Chad Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTORIA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AL OTRO LADO, a California corporation
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEATRICE DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: URSULA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABIGAIL DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMILIANA DOE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLINA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIANCA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CESAR DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DINORA DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERTO DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INGRID DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUAN DOE
Represented By: Karolina Joanna Walters
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Sarah Rich
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TODD C. OWEN, Executive Assistant Commissioner, Office of Field Operations, United States Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Katherine Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?